MARTINEZ LOPEZ v. TSOUKARIS et al
Petitioner: ERIC MARTINEZ LOPEZ
Respondent: JOHN TSOUKARIS, GUY CIRRILO, Acting Secretary of Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick Garland, U.S Department of Homeland Security, U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Antone Moniz
Not Classified By Court: prose tracking nefpsSRC
Case Number: 1:2021cv11540
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 26 BRIEF by ERIC MARTINEZ LOPEZ to 25 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Reply - Leave Granted 11/02/2021. (Holper, Mary)
November 2, 2021 Filing 25 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #22 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (McKillop, Matthew)
October 28, 2021 Filing 24 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #2 (Brizius, Erin)
October 22, 2021 Filing 23 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion to Seal. Counsel will receive an email within twenty-four (24) hours of this order with instructions for submitting sealed documents for which leave has been granted in accordance with the Local Rules of the U.S. District Court of Massachusetts. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (McKillop, Matthew)
October 21, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by ERIC MARTINEZ LOPEZ.(Holper, Mary)
October 14, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Seal (Unopposed) by Antone Moniz.(Brizius, Erin)
October 14, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, by Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Brizius, Erin)
October 8, 2021 Filing 19 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Assented to MOTION Student Appearance Rohena Rajbhandari (McKillop, Matthew)
October 8, 2021 Filing 18 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Assented to MOTION Student Appearance Elizabeth Harrington (McKillop, Matthew)
October 5, 2021 Filing 17 Assented to MOTION Student Appearance Rohena Rajbhandari by ERIC MARTINEZ LOPEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Holper, Mary)
October 5, 2021 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION Student Appearance Elizabeth Harrington by ERIC MARTINEZ LOPEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Holper, Mary)
September 30, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT Leave granted 9/29/2021 against Antone Moniz, filed by ERIC MARTINEZ LOPEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit)(Holper, Mary)
September 29, 2021 Filing 14 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion to Amend (McKillop, Matthew)
September 27, 2021 Filing 13 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Halley, Taylor)
September 27, 2021 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION to Amend #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), by ERIC MARTINEZ LOPEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit)(Holper, Mary)
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Brizius on behalf of GUY CIRRILO, Merrick Garland (Brizius, Erin)
September 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary P. Holper on behalf of ERIC MARTINEZ LOPEZ (Holper, Mary)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:21-cv-13036.
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the Clerk shall TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order upon the parties electronically, and shall CLOSE the file. etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 9/16/2021. (qa, )
September 16, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (qa, )
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from the parties requesting transfer of venue. (KURUVILLA, BEN)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by GUY CIRRILO, MERRICK GARLAND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NTA, #2 Exhibit B - Judgment of Conviction, #3 Exhibit C - I-213, #4 Exhibit D - IJ Oral Decision, #5 Exhibit E - Interpol Red Notice, #6 Declaration of Nikisha Scott, #7 Declaration of Alfaro Ortiz, #8 Certificate of Service)(KURUVILLA, BEN)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Respondents Tsoukaris, Mayorkas, the United States Department of Homeland Security, and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement are dismissed with prejudice. Within 45 days after the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall electronically file a full and complete answer to said Petition, which responds to the factual and legal allegations of the Petition paragraph by paragraph. Petitioner may file and serve a reply in support of the Petition within 30 days after the answer is filed. Petitioner's motion seeking a temporary restraining order #2 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. etc. (N/M) Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 6/29/2021. (qa, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by BEN KURUVILLA on behalf of GUY CIRRILO, MERRICK GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, JOHN TSOUKARIS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (KURUVILLA, BEN)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by ERIC MARTINEZ LOPEZ. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Certificate of Service)(WEINER, JORDAN)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ANJDC-12583229.), filed by ERIC MARTINEZ LOPEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A - Screenshot of Global Tel Links GettingOut Inmate Messaging Service, #4 Exhibit B - Executive Office for Immigration Review Case Portal: Board of Immigration Appeals Case Appeal, #5 Certificate of Service)(WEINER, JORDAN)
June 28, 2021 Judge Stanley R. Chesler added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTINEZ LOPEZ v. TSOUKARIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ERIC MARTINEZ LOPEZ
Represented By: JORDAN WEINER
Represented By: Mary P. Holper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN TSOUKARIS
Represented By: Ben Kuruvilla
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GUY CIRRILO
Represented By: Ben Kuruvilla
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Secretary of Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Ben Kuruvilla
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Ben Kuruvilla
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Ben Kuruvilla
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Ben Kuruvilla
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: prose tracking nefpsSRC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?