Sandler v. Philip Morris USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elliot Sandler
Defendant: Philip Morris USA Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company and Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv11542
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Referring Judge: Angel Kelley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 31 Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Philip Morris USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Lyons, John)
November 8, 2021 Filing 30 District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #28 Motion for a Stay of Deadline to File Responses. (Lara, Miguel)
November 8, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Lyons on behalf of Philip Morris USA Inc., Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC (Lyons, John)
November 5, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION to Stay deadlines to respond to pending motions by Elliot Sandler.(Tein, Michael)
November 2, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE by Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC Consent to Removal (Davis, Melissa)
November 2, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE by Philip Morris USA Inc. of Filing Liggett Consent to Removal (Davis, Melissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2021: #1 Exhibit A) (McManus, Caetlin).
November 1, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company Consent to Removal (Morrison, Christopher)
October 28, 2021 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I II & III filed by Philip Morris USA Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (McManus, Caetlin)
October 28, 2021 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC. (Davis, Melissa)
October 28, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC.(Davis, Melissa)
October 28, 2021 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Koninklijke Ahold Delhaize, N.V. for Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC.. (Davis, Melissa)
October 28, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I II & III by Philip Morris USA Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company.(Davis, Melissa) Modified on 10/29/2021 attachment removed, see ECF #24 (McManus, Caetlin).
October 28, 2021 Filing 19 Filed in error. See ECF #22 and 23. Modified on 10/29/2021 (McManus, Caetlin).
October 28, 2021 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (Morrison, Christopher)
October 26, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Elliot Sandler . (Tein, Michael)
October 26, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Elliot Sandler . (Tein, Michael)
October 26, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Elliot Sandler . (Tein, Michael)
October 26, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Morrison on behalf of R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company (Morrison, Christopher)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Elliot Sandler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tein, Michael)
October 19, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. District Judge Angel Kelley added. Judge Denise J. Casper no longer assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
October 7, 2021 Filing 11 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Allan B. Kaiser. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Currie, Haley)
September 29, 2021 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Davis, Melissa)
September 27, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Philip Morris USA Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 Letter/request (non-motion) from Michael Tein . (Tein, Michael)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Allan B. Kaiser Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-8971211 by Elliot Sandler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tein, Michael)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Kelly, Danielle)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Philip Morris USA Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal -- Consent to Removal by Philip Morris (Davis, Melissa)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Philip Morris USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc., for Philip Morris USA Inc... (Davis, Melissa)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Nott Davis on behalf of Philip Morris USA Inc. (Davis, Melissa)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Philip Morris USA Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-8960555 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Action Coversheet, #2 Category Form)(Davis, Melissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2021: #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B) (Kelly, Danielle). (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/20/2021) (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandler v. Philip Morris USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliot Sandler
Represented By: Michael R. Tein
Represented By: Allan Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Nott Davis
Represented By: John M. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Nott Davis
Represented By: John M. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?