UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. American Airlines Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, State of Arizona, State of California, District of Columbia, State of Florida, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and Commonwealth of Virginia
Defendant: American Airlines Group Inc. and JetBlue Airways Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv11558
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Filing 103 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. #67 )The Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 67) is DENIED. (Dore, Samantha)
June 9, 2022 Filing 102 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. (Dore, Samantha)
June 9, 2022 Filing 101 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re #100 Joint MOTION for Order to Govern Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. ALLOWED. (Dore, Samantha)
June 8, 2022 Filing 100 Joint MOTION for Order to Govern Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information)(McDonough, Sarah)
April 20, 2022 Filing 99 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Dore, Samantha) (Main Document 99 replaced on 4/20/2022) (Dore, Samantha).
April 20, 2022 Filing 98 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re #97 Joint Motion for Entry of a Stipulated Protective Order. ALLOWED. (Dore, Samantha)
April 19, 2022 Filing 97 Joint Motion for Entry of a Stipulated Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Riggs, Kate) Modified on 4/19/2022: Updated docketing event used. (Dore, Samantha).
March 31, 2022 Filing 96 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER GOVERNING FACT DEPOSITIONS.(Dore, Samantha)
March 30, 2022 Filing 95 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Joint Motion for Entry of an Order Governing Fact Depositions by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Congdon, James)
March 28, 2022 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Robert Lewis on behalf of American Airlines Group Inc. (Lewis, Marc)
March 28, 2022 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Bona on behalf of American Airlines Group Inc. (Bona, Olivia)
March 23, 2022 Filing 92 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #91 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Marc R. Lewis and Olivia Bona. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha)
March 23, 2022 Filing 91 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Marc R. Lewis and Olivia Bona Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number AMADC-9239524 by American Airlines Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Marc R. Lewis, #2 Certification of Olivia Bona)(Tolley, David)
February 17, 2022 Filing 90 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. In a recent status report (Doc. No. 88), the parties presented a dispute to the Court over whether the plaintiffs fully answered two of the defendants interrogatories. After careful review of the well-prepared papers presenting both sides positions, the Court concludes that resolution of this dispute does not require a hearing. The two disputes are resolved as follows. First, the plaintiffs answered Interrogatory Number 1 with an objection, stating the interrogatory seeks information conveyedor factsfrom persons who were interviewed in the course of the pre-suit investigation, but upon whom the plaintiffs do not intend to rely at trial. Both parties support their position as to this interrogatory by pointing to reasoned decisions resolving similar disputes in analogous situations. Having considered those decisions and the facts presented here, the Court ALLOWS in part and DENIES in part the defendants motion to compel a further answer to Interrogatory Number 1. Though facts are not shielded from discovery, the Court concludes that responding to this interrogatory as the defendants propose would necessarily reveal attorney work product, including the evolution and focus of the investigation, both generally and specifically as to individual persons and/or issues. However, the Court finds that such protected information is not implicated by the plaintiffs providing to the defendants a list of any persons interviewed in the course of the investigation who were not included in the automatic disclosures made pursuant to Rule 26. Nothing prevents the defendants from doing what the plaintiffs did that is, contacting and interviewing the individuals on that list. Thus, the motion to compel a further answer to Interrogatory Number 1 is ALLOWED insofar as the plaintiffs must provide the list of names described herein and shall do so within 21 days of this Order; the motion is otherwise DENIED as to Interrogatory Number 1.Second, the defendants seek a further answer to that portion of Interrogatory Number 6 seeking information and facts currently known to You... indicating that the Northeast Alliance has caused significant harms to consumers. Specifically, the defendants complain that the plaintiffs have not identified any facts showing that the NEA has harmed consumers, yet they simultaneously refuse to acknowledge that they have no such evidence. Doc. No. 88 at 6. This the interrogatory does not require. It is a contention interrogatory asking for two types of information, one of which is in dispute. The plaintiffs answered by disclosing the responsive information presently known to them and explaining that they intend to supplement their response after further discovery. The answer speaks for itself. The motion to compel a further answer to Interrogatory Number 6 is DENIED. The Motion to Dismiss remains under advisement.(Dore, Samantha)
February 15, 2022 Filing 89 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered allowing #87 MOTION to Seal Confidential Information. Counsel will receive an email within twenty-four (24) hours of this order with instructions for submitting sealed documents for which leave has been granted in accordance with the Local Rules of the U.S. District Court of Massachusetts. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Dore, Samantha)
February 14, 2022 Filing 88 STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery Dispute (Joint) by American Airlines Group Inc., JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Wall, Daniel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/15/2022) (Dore, Samantha). (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/15/2022) (Dore, Samantha). (Attachment 4 replaced on 2/15/2022) (Dore, Samantha).
February 14, 2022 Filing 87 MOTION to Seal Confidential Information (Unopposed) by American Airlines Group Inc., JetBlue Airways Corporation.(Wall, Daniel)
February 8, 2022 Filing 86 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Sarah Oxenham Allen (Allen, Sarah)
January 24, 2022 Filing 85 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Coppola, Katelyn)
January 24, 2022 Filing 84 Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on November 29, 2021, before Judge Leo T. Sorokin. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com. Redaction Request due 2/14/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/24/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2022. (Coppola, Katelyn)
January 21, 2022 Filing 83 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER GOVERNING EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURES AND DEPOSITIONS entered. re #82 Joint submission filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Simeone, Maria)
January 21, 2022 Filing 82 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Motion for Order Governing Expert Witness Disclosures and Depositions by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Riggs, Kate)
December 27, 2021 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by American Airlines Group Inc., JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Wall, Daniel)
December 13, 2021 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of Arizona, State of California, State of Florida, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Jones, William)
December 2, 2021 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha Elena Vega-Gonzalez on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (Vega-Gonzalez, Martha)
December 1, 2021 Filing 78 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #77 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Martha E. Vega-Gonzalez. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha)
December 1, 2021 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Martha E. Vega-Gonzalez Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9078236 by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MacKinlay, Glenn)
November 30, 2021 Filing 76 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: SCHEDULING ORDER entered. (Simeone, Maria) (Main Document 76 replaced on 11/30/2021) (Simeone, Maria).
November 29, 2021 Filing 75 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. This case is hereby scheduled for a bench trial to begin on Monday, September 26, 2022. Trial will proceed from day to day thereafter, except that the Court will not sit in the afternoon on October 4, 2022 and will not sit at all on October 5, 2022. Otherwise, the exact schedule will be determined closer to the commencement of trial. Upon consideration, the Court ALLOWS the Joint Motion for Entry of a Scheduling and Case Management Order (Doc. No. 65) and, as to the disputed issues, ADOPTS the proposals made by the Plaintiffs.( Bench Trial set for 9/26/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13 (In person only) before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin.,(Simeone, Maria)
November 29, 2021 Filing 74 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Scheduling Conference held on 11/29/2021. Scheduling Conference held on 11/29/2021. The court hears counsel on the status of the case regarding the proposed schedule, agreed upon and disputed discovery issues and agreed upon trial dates. Counsel anticipates a 3-week bench trial with post trial filings. The court goes over the trial schedule and will consider the trial dates 9/26/22 through 10/14/22. The court finds the proposed schedule reasonable and will adopt the schedule as to everything agreed upon and will consider the remainder of the disputed issues and issue and a scheduling order. (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.) (Simeone, Maria) Modified on 11/29/2021 (Simeone, Maria).
November 24, 2021 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Liz A Brady on behalf of State of Florida (Brady, Liz)
November 23, 2021 Filing 72 Set deadline: Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2021 02:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin(Simeone, Maria)
November 23, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference has been set for 11/29/2021 02:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2021 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 scheduling order sample, #2 Standing Order on Summary Judgment)(Simeone, Maria) Modified on 11/23/2021 (Simeone, Maria).
November 23, 2021 Filing 70 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #66 Motion to Seal. Counsel will receive an email within twenty-four (24) hours of this order with instructions for submitting sealed documents for which leave has been granted in accordance with the Local Rules of the U.S. District Court of Massachusetts. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Simeone, Maria)
November 22, 2021 Filing 69 AFFIDAVIT of Elizabeth C. Gettinger in Support re #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by American Airlines Group Inc., JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Wall, Daniel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/29/2021) (Pacho, Arnold). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/29/2021) (Pacho, Arnold). Modified on 11/29/2021 to attach sealed exhibits. (Pacho, Arnold).
November 22, 2021 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM in Support re #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by American Airlines Group Inc., JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Wall, Daniel)
November 22, 2021 Filing 67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American Airlines Group Inc., JetBlue Airways Corporation.(Wall, Daniel)
November 22, 2021 Filing 66 MOTION to Seal Confidential Information (Unopposed) by American Airlines Group Inc., JetBlue Airways Corporation.(Wall, Daniel)
November 19, 2021 Filing 65 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (Motion for Entry of Scheduling and Case Mangement Order) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Initial Scheduling and Case Management Order), #2 Exhibit 2 (Plaintiffs' Proposed Supplemental Scheduling and Case Management Order), #3 Exhibit 3 (Defendants' Proposed Supplemental Scheduling and Case Management Order)(Jones, William)
November 18, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Dunn on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Dunn, Eric)
November 18, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant A. Bermann on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Bermann, Grant)
November 17, 2021 Filing 62 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Allowed. Motion to Dismiss limited to 35 pages due by 11/22/21. Opposition limited to 35 pages due by 12/13/21. Reply limited to 10 pages due 12/27/21. re #61 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and for an Extension of the Opposition and reply in the Briefing Schedule by American Airlines Group Inc., JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Simeone, Maria)
November 15, 2021 Filing 61 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and for an Extension of the Briefing Schedule by American Airlines Group Inc., JetBlue Airways Corporation.(Wall, Daniel)
October 22, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Bernheim on behalf of State of Arizona (Bernheim, Robert)
October 20, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie L Miller on behalf of State of California (Miller, Jamie)
October 20, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B McNary on behalf of State of California (McNary, Robert)
October 19, 2021 Filing 57 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Robert A. Bernheim. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha)
October 19, 2021 Filing 56 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert A. Bernheim Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9015456 by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Leff, Daniel)
October 18, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah P. McDonough on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (McDonough, Sarah)
October 18, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Congdon on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Congdon, James)
October 15, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Oxenham Allen on behalf of Commonwealth of Virginia (Allen, Sarah)
October 14, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Henry on behalf of Commonwealth of Virginia (Henry, Tyler)
October 13, 2021 Filing 51 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #50 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sarah O. Allen and Tyler T. Henry. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha)
October 12, 2021 Filing 50 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sarah O. Allen and Tyler T. Henry Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number AMADC-9003979 by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Leff, Daniel)
October 8, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Wright Wertz on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania (Wertz, Tracy)
October 7, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ann Thomson on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania (Thomson, Jennifer)
October 6, 2021 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. JetBlue Airways Corporation waiver sent on 9/21/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Riggs, Kate)
October 6, 2021 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. American Airlines Group Inc. waiver sent on 9/21/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Riggs, Kate)
October 6, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin G. Fraser on behalf of State of Florida (Fraser, Colin)
October 6, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Brackett on behalf of State of Florida (Brackett, Rachel)
October 6, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Hauser on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (Hauser, Brian)
October 6, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Craner on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (Craner, Matthew)
October 6, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Delbaum on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (Delbaum, Jessica)
October 6, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard F. Schwed on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (Schwed, Richard)
October 4, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Thomas Durst on behalf of District of Columbia (Durst, Arthur)
October 4, 2021 Filing 38 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Arthur T. Durst and Catherine A. Jackson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha)
October 1, 2021 Filing 37 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: New Civil Cases General Procedural ORDER entered. (Simeone, Maria)
October 1, 2021 Filing 36 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Arthur T. Durst and Catherine A. Jackson Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number AMADC-8987570 by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Leff, Daniel)
September 30, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Stephen Betsko, Sr on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania (Betsko, Joseph)
September 30, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate M. Riggs on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Riggs, Kate)
September 30, 2021 Filing 33 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joseph S. Betsko, Jennifer A. Thomson, and Tracy W. Wertz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha)
September 29, 2021 Filing 32 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph S. Betsko, Jennifer A. Thomson, and Tracy W. Wertz Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number AMADC-8983765 by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Leff, Daniel)
September 29, 2021 Filing 31 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Richard Schwed, Matthew L. Craner, Jessica K. Delbaum and Brian C. Hauser. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha)
September 29, 2021 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (MacKinlay, Glenn)
September 29, 2021 Filing 29 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard Schwed, Matthew L. Craner, Jessica K. Delbaum, and Brian C. Hauser Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number AMADC-8983520 by JetBlue Airways Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(MacKinlay, Glenn)
September 29, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn A. MacKinlay on behalf of JetBlue Airways Corporation (MacKinlay, Glenn)
September 29, 2021 Filing 27 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Rachel S. Brackett, Lizabeth A. Brady, and Colin G. Fraser. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha)
September 29, 2021 Filing 26 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael Jorgenson, Natalie S. Manzo, Robert B. McNary, and Jamie Miller. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha)
September 29, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel H. Leff on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of Arizona, State of California, State of Florida (Leff, Daniel)
September 29, 2021 Filing 24 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rachel S. Brackett, Lizabeth A. Brady, and Colin G. Fraser Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number AMADC-8982123 by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Leff, Daniel)
September 29, 2021 Filing 23 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael Jorgenson, Natalie S. Manzo, Robert B. McNary, and Jamie Miller Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number AMADC-8982028 by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit)(Leff, Daniel)
September 23, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian R. Conner on behalf of American Airlines Group Inc. (Conner, Ian)
September 23, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Allyson M. Maltas on behalf of American Airlines Group Inc. (Maltas, Allyson)
September 23, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Farrell J. Malone on behalf of American Airlines Group Inc. (Malone, Farrell)
September 23, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth C. Gettinger on behalf of American Airlines Group Inc. (Gettinger, Elizabeth)
September 23, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Seung Wan Paik on behalf of American Airlines Group Inc. (Paik, Seung)
September 23, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Egge on behalf of American Airlines Group Inc. (Egge, Michael)
September 23, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara L. Tavernia on behalf of American Airlines Group Inc. (Tavernia, Tara)
September 23, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Marguerite M. Sullivan on behalf of American Airlines Group Inc. (Sullivan, Marguerite)
September 23, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Wall on behalf of American Airlines Group Inc. (Wall, Daniel)
September 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by William T. Matlack on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Matlack, William)
September 23, 2021 Filing 12 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Allyson M. Maltas, Elizabeth C. Gettinger, Seung Wan Paik, and Tara L. Tavernia. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha)
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael G. Egge, Farrell J. Malone, Marguerite M. Sullivan and Ian R. Conner. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha)
September 22, 2021 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Allyson M. Maltas, Elizabeth C. Gettinger, Seung Wan Paik, Tara L. Tavernia Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number AMADC-8969500 by American Airlines Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 PHV Certification - Maltas, #2 PHV Certification - Gettinger, #3 PHV Certification - Paik, #4 PHV Certification - Tavernia)(Tolley, David)
September 22, 2021 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael G. Egge, Farrell J. Malone, Marguerite M. Sullivan, Ian R. Conner Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number AMADC-8969496 by American Airlines Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 PHV Certification - Egge, #2 PHV Certification - Malone, #3 PHV Certification - Sullivan, #4 PHV Certification - Conner)(Tolley, David)
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Daniel M. Wall. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel H. Leff on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS (Leff, Daniel)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daniel M. Wall Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-8966219 by American Airlines Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Certification)(Tolley, David)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Airlines Group Inc.. (Tolley, David)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Tolley on behalf of American Airlines Group Inc. (Tolley, David)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of Arizona, State of California, State of Florida, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. American Airlines Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: William H. Jones, II
Represented By: James H. Congdon
Represented By: Kate M. Riggs
Represented By: Sarah P. McDonough
Represented By: Eric Dunn
Represented By: Grant A. Bermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arizona
Represented By: Daniel H. Leff
Represented By: Robert Bernheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Daniel H. Leff
Represented By: Jamie L Miller
Represented By: Robert B McNary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District of Columbia
Represented By: Arthur Thomas Durst
Represented By: Catherine A. Jackson
Represented By: Daniel H. Leff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Florida
Represented By: Colin G. Fraser
Represented By: Daniel H. Leff
Represented By: Rachel S. Brackett
Represented By: Liz A Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: William T. Matlack
Represented By: Daniel H. Leff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Daniel H. Leff
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Thomson
Represented By: Joseph Stephen Betsko, Sr
Represented By: Tracy Wright Wertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Sarah Oxenham Allen
Represented By: Tyler Henry
Represented By: Daniel H. Leff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Group Inc.
Represented By: David C. Tolley
Represented By: Allyson M. Maltas
Represented By: Daniel M. Wall
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Gettinger
Represented By: Farrell J. Malone
Represented By: Ian R. Conner
Represented By: Marguerite M. Sullivan
Represented By: Michael G. Egge
Represented By: Seung Wan Paik
Represented By: Tara L. Tavernia
Represented By: Marc Robert Lewis
Represented By: Olivia Bona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetBlue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Glenn A. MacKinlay
Represented By: Matthew L. Craner
Represented By: Richard F. Schwed
Represented By: Brian Hauser
Represented By: Jessica Delbaum
Represented By: Martha Elena Vega-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?