Integrated Facilities Construction Corp. v. Commonwealth of Massachusetts et al
Plaintiff: Integrated Facilities Construction Corp.
Defendant: Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance, Carol W Gladstone, Charles W Kelsey, III, Kathleen Twomey, Matthew H Ryan and Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Case Number: 1:2021cv11607
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Angel Kelley
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF JURISICTION filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Carol W Gladstone, Charles W Kelsey, III, Matthew H Ryan, Kathleen Twomey. (D'Angelo, Dennis)
November 24, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF JURISICTION by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Carol W Gladstone, Charles W Kelsey, III, Matthew H Ryan, Kathleen Twomey.(D'Angelo, Dennis)
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due for all defendants by 11/24/21. (Lara, Miguel)
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/24/2021 to Respond to Complaint (second) by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Carol W Gladstone, Charles W Kelsey, III, Matthew H Ryan, Kathleen Twomey.(D'Angelo, Dennis) Modified on 11/19/2021 to change ECF event used. (Lara, Miguel).
October 29, 2021 Filing 12 District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #7 Motion for Extension of Time. The Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED. All Defendants shall respond to the Complaint by November 19, 2021. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 27, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Integrated Facilities Construction Corp.. Matthew H Ryan served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Integrated Facilities Construction Corp.. (Semple, Scott) Modified docket text on 11/1/2021 to correct date of service (Pacho, Arnold).
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Integrated Facilities Construction Corp.. Kathleen Twomey served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Integrated Facilities Construction Corp.. (Semple, Scott)
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Integrated Facilities Construction Corp.. Commonwealth of Massachusetts served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Integrated Facilities Construction Corp.. (Semple, Scott)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Integrated Facilities Construction Corp.. Charles W Kelsey, III served on 10/14/2021, answer due 11/4/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Integrated Facilities Construction Corp.. (Semple, Scott) Modified docket text on 11/1/2021 (Pacho, Arnold).
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 19, 2021 to Respond to Complaint by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Carol W Gladstone, Charles W Kelsey, III, Matthew H Ryan, Kathleen Twomey.(D'Angelo, Dennis) Modified on 10/27/2021 (Jones, Sherry).
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis N. D'Angelo on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Carol W Gladstone, Charles W Kelsey, III, Matthew H Ryan, Kathleen Twomey (D'Angelo, Dennis)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 Set Deadlines: Carol W Gladstone 10/29/2021. (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Carol W Gladstone served on 10/8/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. (Semple, Scott) Modified on 10/21/2021 to fix docket text and set answer date (Vieira, Leonardo).
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-8983733 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Integrated Facilities Construction Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Category Form)(Semple, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integrated Facilities Construction Corp. v. Commonwealth of Massachusetts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integrated Facilities Construction Corp.
Represented By: Scott K. Semple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol W Gladstone
Represented By: Dennis N. D'Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W Kelsey, III
Represented By: Dennis N. D'Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Twomey
Represented By: Dennis N. D'Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew H Ryan
Represented By: Dennis N. D'Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Dennis N. D'Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?