Knox et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Knox, Rosemarie Knox and Bayer Cropscience Inc., Successor in interest to Amchem Products, Inc.
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Alliance Laundry Systems LLC Individually and as successor-in-interest to American Laundry Machinery Co., Armstrong International, Inc., Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., A Division of Weir Power & Industrial, Aurora Pump, Burnham Corporation, Carrier Corporation, f/k/a Bryant Heating & Cooling Systems, Inc., CBS Corporation, Successor in interest to Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks Company, Inc., COPES VULCAN INC., Dezurik, Inc., Eaton Corporation as Successor-in-Interest to American Laundry Machinery Inc., & Ajax, EFCO, INC., Electrolux Home Products, Inc., f/k/a White Consolidated Industries, Inc., f/k/a Copes Vulcan Inc., f/k/a Davis Valve and Jerguson Gage and Valve Company, Flowserve US, Inc. solely as successor to Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc. and Rockwell Manufacturing Company, FMC Corporation On behalf of its former Northern Pump, Peerless Pump, and Chicago Pump, Honeywell International, Inc., f/k/a AlliedSignal, Inc., f/k/a The Bendix Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to DeLaval Turbine, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, f/k/a Carborundum Corporation, ITT Corporation, As success-in-interest to Bell & Gossett, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., Morse Tec LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, and successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation, Riley Power Inc., f/k/a Babcock Borsig Power, Inc., f/k/a D.B. Riley, Inc., f/k/a Riley Stoker Corporation, Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., f/k/a Norton Company, Sid E. Parker Boiler Company, Inc., Spence Engineering Co., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC. f/k/a Peerless Pumps, Tingue, Brown, & Co., Union Carbide Corporation, United States Steel Corp., f/k/a The American Steel & Wire Co., ZF Active Safety US, Inc, f/k/a Kelsey-Hayes Co., 831 South First Street, Inc., f/k/a Cissell Manufacturing Co., Carrier Corporation, Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Industrial Holdings Corporation, Morse TEC LLC, Riley Power Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, United States Steel Corp., ZF Active Safety US, Inc, 831 South First Street, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alliance Laundry Systems LLC, Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., Bayer CropScience Inc., Bryant Heating & Cooling Systems, Inc., CBS Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Copes Vulcan, Inc., Eaton Corporation, White Consolidated Industries, Inc., Davis Valve and Jerguson Gage and Valve Company, Flowserve US, Inc., FMC Corporation, AlliedSignal, Inc., The Bendix Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., Carborundum Corporation, ITT Corporation, BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, Babcock Borsig Power, Inc., D.B. Riley, Inc., Riley Stoker Corporation, Norton Company, Peerless Pumps, The American Steel & Wire Co., Kelsey-Hayes Co. and Cissell Manufacturing Co.
Cross Defendant: Columbia Boiler Company, Crane Co., Crosby Valve, LLC, Fulton Boiler Works, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Greene, Tweed & Co, Inc., H.B. Smith Co., Inc., Hoffman/New Yorker Inc., HOMASOTE COMPANY, The Nash Engineering Company, Neles-Jamesbury, Inc., Pellerin Milnor Corporation, Pneumo Abex Corporation, Qualitex Company, Reed Manufacturing Company, Resillo Press Pad Co., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Uniroyal, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weil-McLain United Dominion Co. and The William Powell Company
Cross Claimant: General Electric Company
Interested Party: Defendants Liaison Counsel
Case Number: 1:2021cv11695
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Referring Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 62 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to Middlesex Superior Court. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 9, 2021 Filing 60 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc.. (Martin, Adam)
December 9, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam C. Martin on behalf of Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc. n/k/a Milwauke Valve Company, LLC (Martin, Adam) Modified docket text on 12/9/2021 in accordance with notice of appearance filed . (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
December 9, 2021 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Martin, Adam)
December 9, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam C. Martin on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. (Martin, Adam)
December 8, 2021 Filing 61 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered ALLOWED re #41 Assented to MOTION to Remand. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 7, 2021 Filing 56 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Patti B. Saris added. Judge William G. Young no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
December 7, 2021 Filing 55 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Paine, Matthew)
December 6, 2021 Filing 54 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge William G. Young added. Judge Allison D. Burroughs no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
December 6, 2021 Filing 53 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL. I hereby disqualify myself in this proceeding pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ' 455 (a). The case will be redrawn to another district judge in the Eastern Division. (McManus, Caetlin)
December 6, 2021 Filing 52 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs added. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
December 6, 2021 Filing 51 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL. I hereby RECUSE from this matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455(b)(4). The Clerk shall randomly reassign this matter to another district judge.(Simeone, Maria)
December 6, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Robbie on behalf of Crane Co. (Robbie, Eric)
December 6, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of Crane Co. (Goldman, David)
December 3, 2021 Filing 48 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin added. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV no longer assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
December 2, 2021 Filing 47 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL. ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, I recuse myself from participation in this matter and direct the Clerk to reassign the case randomly.(McKillop, Matthew)
December 1, 2021 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crane Co.. (Robbie, Eric)
December 1, 2021 Filing 45 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV added. Judge George A. OToole, Jr no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
December 1, 2021 Filing 44 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, I recuse myself from participation in this matter and direct the Clerk to reassign the case randomly.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 17, 2021 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Spence Engineering Co. identifying Corporate Parent CIRCOR International, Inc. for Spence Engineering Co... (Robbie, Eric)
November 17, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Robbie on behalf of Spence Engineering Co. (Robbie, Eric)
November 11, 2021 Filing 41 Assented to MOTION to Remand by Rosemarie Knox, Thomas Knox.(O'Donnell, Erika)
November 11, 2021 Filing 40 First MOTION to Remand by Thomas Knox.(O'Donnell, Erika)
November 8, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc., ITT Corporation (Tayyab, J.)
November 8, 2021 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Goulds Pumps, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco Inc. for Goulds Pumps, Inc... (George, Wayne)
November 8, 2021 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ITT Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco Inc. for ITT Corporation.. (George, Wayne)
November 8, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne E. George on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc., ITT Corporation (George, Wayne)
November 5, 2021 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., f/k/a Norton Company for Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc... (Naegely, Jessica)
November 5, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L. Naegely on behalf of Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. (Naegely, Jessica)
November 5, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Whelan on behalf of Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. (Whelan, Jennifer)
November 4, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Stesha A. Emmanuel on behalf of General Electric Company (Emmanuel, Stesha)
November 4, 2021 Filing 31 STATE COURT Record. (Mohan, Catherine)
November 4, 2021 Filing 30 STATE COURT Record. (Mohan, Catherine)
November 4, 2021 Filing 29 STATE COURT Record. (Mohan, Catherine)
November 4, 2021 Filing 28 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
November 4, 2021 Filing 27 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (First Amended Complaint), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Mohan, Catherine)
November 4, 2021 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
November 4, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
November 4, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Dwyer, Paul)
November 4, 2021 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC. (Dwyer, Paul)
November 4, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Dwyer, Paul)
November 4, 2021 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FMC Corporation. (Dwyer, Paul)
November 3, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Defendants Liaison Counsel (Armato, Stephen)
November 3, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Defendants Liaison Counsel (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
November 3, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint D. Watts on behalf of Weil-McLain United Dominion Co. (Watts, Clint)
November 3, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint D. Watts on behalf of Industrial Holdings Corporation (Watts, Clint)
November 3, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint D. Watts on behalf of Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC (Watts, Clint)
November 3, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Clint D. Watts on behalf of FMC Corporation (Watts, Clint)
November 3, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Boivin on behalf of Weil-McLain United Dominion Co. (Boivin, Mark)
November 3, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Boivin on behalf of Industrial Holdings Corporation (Boivin, Mark)
November 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Boivin on behalf of Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC (Boivin, Mark)
November 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Boivin on behalf of FMC Corporation (Boivin, Mark)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of Weil-McLain United Dominion Co. (Dwyer, Paul)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC (Dwyer, Paul)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of Industrial Holdings Corporation (Dwyer, Paul)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of FMC Corporation (Dwyer, Paul)
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flowserve US, Inc.. (Claflin, Mark)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Claflin on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc. (Claflin, Mark)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joni K. Mackler on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc. (Mackler, Joni)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McManus, Caetlin)
October 18, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Electric Company ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9012714 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit A Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit B Disclosure Form, #5 Exhibit C Hobson Affidavit, #6 Exhibit D Lehman Affidavit, #7 Exhibit E Case Law, #8 Exhibit F Betts Affidavit, #9 Exhibit G State Court Record, #10 Exhibit H Notice to State Court)(Mohan, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Knox
Represented By: Erika A. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Knox
Represented By: Erika A. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayer Cropscience Inc., Successor in interest to Amchem Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Laundry Systems LLC Individually and as successor-in-interest to American Laundry Machinery Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., A Division of Weir Power & Industrial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation, f/k/a Bryant Heating & Cooling Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation, Successor in interest to Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COPES VULCAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dezurik, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation as Successor-in-Interest to American Laundry Machinery Inc., & Ajax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EFCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc., f/k/a White Consolidated Industries, Inc., f/k/a Copes Vulcan Inc., f/k/a Davis Valve and Jerguson Gage and Valve Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc. solely as successor to Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc. and Rockwell Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation On behalf of its former Northern Pump, Peerless Pump, and Chicago Pump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc., f/k/a AlliedSignal, Inc., f/k/a The Bendix Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc., Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to DeLaval Turbine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation, f/k/a Carborundum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation, As success-in-interest to Bell & Gossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse Tec LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, and successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power Inc., f/k/a Babcock Borsig Power, Inc., f/k/a D.B. Riley, Inc., f/k/a Riley Stoker Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., f/k/a Norton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid E. Parker Boiler Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spence Engineering Co.
Represented By: Eric J. Robbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC. f/k/a Peerless Pumps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tingue, Brown, & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel Corp., f/k/a The American Steel & Wire Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF Active Safety US, Inc, f/k/a Kelsey-Hayes Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 831 South First Street, Inc., f/k/a Cissell Manufacturing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Represented By: Clint D. Watts
Represented By: Mark T. Boivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse TEC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer A. Whelan
Represented By: Jessica L. Naegely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Represented By: Clint D. Watts
Represented By: Mark T. Boivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF Active Safety US, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 831 South First Street, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Laundry Systems LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Heating & Cooling Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes Vulcan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Consolidated Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Valve and Jerguson Gage and Valve Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Represented By: Mark J. Claflin
Represented By: Joni K. Mackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Represented By: Clint D. Watts
Represented By: Mark T. Boivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AlliedSignal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bendix Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carborundum Corporation
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Represented By: Clint D. Watts
Represented By: Mark T. Boivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: J. Yasmin Tayyab
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babcock Borsig Power, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.B. Riley, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Stoker Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norton Company
Represented By: Jennifer A. Whelan
Represented By: Jessica L. Naegely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Pumps
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Represented By: Clint D. Watts
Represented By: Mark T. Boivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The American Steel & Wire Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelsey-Hayes Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cissell Manufacturing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Columbia Boiler Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Crosby Valve, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Fulton Boiler Works, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Greene, Tweed & Co, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: H.B. Smith Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Hoffman/New Yorker Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: HOMASOTE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: The Nash Engineering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Neles-Jamesbury, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Pellerin Milnor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Qualitex Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Reed Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Resillo Press Pad Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Rheem Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Weil-McLain United Dominion Co.
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Represented By: Clint D. Watts
Represented By: Mark T. Boivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: The William Powell Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Catherine Mohan
Represented By: Stesha A. Emmanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Defendants Liaison Counsel
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Stephen T. Armato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?