Bucciarelli et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Plaintiff: John Bucciarelli and Judy Bucciarelli
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage LLC as Successor-in-Interest to Seterus, Inc. doing business as Mr. Cooper and Kyanite Services Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv11757
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2021 Filing 15 Additional STATE COURT Record. (Russo, Noreen)
December 7, 2021 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Assented-to Motion to Add Documents to the State Court Record. (Lovett, Jarrett)
December 6, 2021 Filing 13 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by All Defendants. (Swisher, Meredith)
December 6, 2021 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION to Add Documents to State Court Record with Certificate of Service by John Bucciarelli, Judy Bucciarelli. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Counsel, #2 Exhibit additional state court record)(Tretter, Thomas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 STATE COURT Record. (Swisher, Meredith)
November 5, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nationstar Mortgage LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group, Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage LLC.. (Swisher, Meredith)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kyanite Services Inc.. (Swisher, Meredith)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Swisher, Meredith)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Federal National Mortgage Association, Kyanite Services Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC.. (Swisher, Meredith)
October 29, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/6/2021 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Federal National Mortgage Association, Kyanite Services Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Russo, Noreen)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/6/2021 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Federal National Mortgage Association, Kyanite Services Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Swisher, Meredith) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/28/2021) (McDonagh, Christina).
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Burgos, Sandra)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal National Mortgage Association, Kyanite Services Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9029971 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Swisher, Meredith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bucciarelli et al v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bucciarelli
Represented By: Thomas C. Tretter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Bucciarelli
Represented By: Thomas C. Tretter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Meredith A. Swisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC as Successor-in-Interest to Seterus, Inc. doing business as Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Meredith A. Swisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyanite Services Inc.
Represented By: Meredith A. Swisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?