Lux, et al. v. LivaNova Deutschland, GMBH, et al
Plaintiff: Mary Elizabeth Lux and Robert Lux
Defendant: LivaNova Deutschland, GMBH, LivaNova Holding USA, Inc., Sorin Group Deutschland, GmbH, Sorin Group USA, Inc., The General Hospital Corporation doing business as Massachusetts General Hospital, Serguei Melnitchouk, MD, MPH and Chief Perfusionist at Massachusetts General Hospital
Case Number: 1:2021cv11789
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE from the MDL Panel vacating conditional transfer order. (Jones, Sherry)
December 7, 2021 Filing 15 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to the State Court(Hourihan, Lisa)
December 7, 2021 Filing 14 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #13 Response to Motion filed by Mary Elizabeth Lux, Robert Lux. Stipulation to Remand entire case APPROVED.(Hourihan, Lisa)
December 6, 2021 Filing 13 Second RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand Stipulation and Request for Order of Remand filed by Mary Elizabeth Lux, Robert Lux. (O'Donnell, Erika)
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND as to defendant LivaNova Holding USA, Inc. ONLY to the State Court(Hourihan, Lisa)
November 30, 2021 Filing 11 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/23/2021 to File Answer (Hourihan, Lisa)
November 29, 2021 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/23/2021 to File Answer by Serguei Melnitchouk, MD, MPH, The General Hospital Corporation.(Riley, Richard)
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Riley on behalf of Serguei Melnitchouk, MD, MPH (Riley, Richard)
November 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi M. Oh on behalf of Serguei Melnitchouk, MD, MPH (Oh, Heidi)
November 24, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION and REQUEST for Remand re #1 Notice of Removal, with Certificate of Service by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.. (Breen, William) Modified on 11/29/2021 to adjust docket text (Currie, Haley).
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Mary Elizabeth Lux, Robert Lux Plaintiffs' Notice of Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order 38 (O'Donnell, Erika)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Mary Elizabeth Lux, Robert Lux. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6)(O'Donnell, Erika)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant LivaNova Holding USA, Inc. f/k/a Sorin Group USA, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses and Certificate of Service by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc..(Breen, William)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LivaNova Holding USA, Inc. (f/k/a Sorin Group USA, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9041068 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Record, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Notice of Filing)(Breen, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lux, et al. v. LivaNova Deutschland, GMBH, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LivaNova Deutschland, GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LivaNova Holding USA, Inc.
Represented By: William P Breen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorin Group Deutschland, GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorin Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: William P Breen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The General Hospital Corporation doing business as Massachusetts General Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serguei Melnitchouk, MD, MPH
Represented By: Richard J. Riley
Represented By: Heidi M. Oh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Perfusionist at Massachusetts General Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Elizabeth Lux
Represented By: Erika A. O'Donnell
Represented By: Michael J. McCann
Represented By: Michael C. Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lux
Represented By: Erika A. O'Donnell
Represented By: Michael J. McCann
Represented By: Michael C. Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?