Dupre v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Dupre
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp. doing business as Stryker Orthopaedics and Surgi-Care, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv11793
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 22 Judge Indira Talwani: Case Management Order No. 11 - Resolution Processes for Certain Matters. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al. (Dore, Samantha)
December 16, 2021 Filing 21 Judge Indira Talwani: Case Management Order No. 10 - Review of Post-December 16, 2021 Newly Filed Cases. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al. (Dore, Samantha)
December 16, 2021 Filing 20 Judge Indira Talwani: Order Aiding Private Settlement Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al. (Dore, Samantha)
December 1, 2021 Filing 19 STATE COURT Record. (Bhakhri, Ritika)
November 29, 2021 Filing 18 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed letter request for sixty extension. Defendant's time to respond to the pending Motions to Remand [#1569] is extended to February 1, 2022. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(Dore, Samantha)
November 23, 2021 Filing 17 Letter/request (non-motion) from Kim Catullo Request with Consent for Extension of Briefing Schedule. (Catullo, Kim)
November 12, 2021 Filing 16 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: Cancelling November 15, 2021 Case Management Conference. The clerk shall reset the Case Management Conference for December 16, 2021. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(Dore, Samantha)
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Nelson G. Apjohn on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Apjohn, Nelson)
November 9, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Murphy on behalf of Surgi-Care, Inc. (Murphy, Ryan)
November 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Schwindt on behalf of Surgi-Care, Inc. (Schwindt, Jordan)
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie M. Chesney on behalf of Surgi-Care, Inc. (Chesney, Stephanie)
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Gross on behalf of Surgi-Care, Inc. (Gross, Brian)
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Surgi-Care, Inc.. (Gross, Brian)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. Consent Order for Consolidation of Removed Matter with LFIT V40 MDL.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT, 1:21-cv-11793-IT (Kelly, Danielle)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. (Bhakhri, Ritika)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Master Long Form Complaint by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 MASTER LONG FORM COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Orders No. 1-13 (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order No. 1-9, #2 Protective Order, #3 ESI Order, #4 Fact Sheet Implementation Order, #5 Order Aiding Private Settlement, #6 Orders Extending Discovery Stay) (Kelly, Danielle)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Dore, Samantha)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; Dupre v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp., et al. In Re: Stryker Orthopaedics LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation. (Finn, Mary)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
November 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. d/b/a Stryker Orthopaedics ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9042827 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Bhakhri, Ritika) Modified on 11/4/2021: Updated docket text. (Dore, Samantha).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dupre v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Dupre
Represented By: Walter Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp. doing business as Stryker Orthopaedics
Represented By: Ritika Bhakhri
Represented By: Nelson G. Apjohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surgi-Care, Inc.
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Jordan L. Schwindt
Represented By: Ryan M. Murphy
Represented By: Stephanie M. Chesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?