Hawkinson v. EOIR
Plaintiff: Pro Se Party John A. Hawkinson
Defendant: EOIR and Executive Office for Immigration Review
Case Number: 1:2021cv11817
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: M Page Kelley
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (Remote only) before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 22, 2021 Filing 19 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Joint Motion to Continue. The scheduling conference set for January 3, 2022 is canceled. A new date will be selected by the court. (Ferguson, Kerry)
December 21, 2021 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Continue Rule 16(b) scheduling conference to 1/17/2022 due to holiday schedules by EOIR, John A. Hawkinson.(Hawkinson, John)
December 21, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceThis hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2022 02:00 PM in Courtroom 24 (Remote only) before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vieira, Leonardo)
December 13, 2021 Filing 16 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by John A. Hawkinson.. (Hawkinson, John)
December 13, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 10, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by EOIR.(Sady, Michael)
December 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of EOIR (Sady, Michael)
November 10, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Hawkinson., SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Hawkinson. (Attachments: #1 Proof of service upon Attorney General of the United States)(Hawkinson, John)
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed EOIR served on 11/10/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Hawkinson, John)
November 10, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by John A. Hawkinson. EOIR served on 11/9/2021, answer due 12/9/2021. (Hawkinson, John)
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for leave to electronically file Pro Se. The court grants permission on the condition that plaintiff satisfies all applicable training and other requirements for pro se litigants as stated in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, Page 5. Plaintiff is directed to complete the registration form available through #https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro se e-filing account instructions #https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-se.htm. (Ferguson, Kerry)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entries 4 and 6 corrected because: incorrect summons issued. Please refer to docket entry 7 for FOIA Summons Issued as to Defendant, EOIR. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to EOIR. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 FILED IN ERROR (DaSilva, Carolina).
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by John A. Hawkinson.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 FILED IN ERROR. (DaSilva, Carolina).
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee/payment: $ 402.00, receipt number 1BST087132 for #1 Complaint, (Phillips, Sophie)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EOIR, filed by John A. Hawkinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2021: #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkinson v. EOIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EOIR
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro Se Party John A. Hawkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?