Alphonse v. Moniz
Petitioner: Anderson Alphonse
Respondent: Superintendent Antone Moniz and Antone Moniz
Case Number: 1:2021cv11844
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241),,,,,,,, by Anderson Alphonse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U Visa Certification Signed By Police)(Holper, Mary)
January 6, 2022 Filing 17 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #10 Assented to MOTION Student Appearance Kelly Garretson re Petition for Habeas Corpus, ECF 1, and Reply, ECF 15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brito v. Garland, #2 Exhibit Reid v. Donelan Order Extending Deadline to File Petition for Rehearing En Banc)(Holper, Mary)
December 21, 2021 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing set for 1/13/2022 02:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(McKillop, Matthew)
November 30, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Anderson Alphonse to #11 Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241. (Holper, Mary)
November 24, 2021 Filing 14 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Assented to MOTION Student Appearance Kelly Garretson (McKillop, Matthew)
November 24, 2021 Filing 13 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Assented to MOTION Student Appearance Rohena Rajbhandari (McKillop, Matthew)
November 24, 2021 Filing 12 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Assented to MOTION Student Appearance Elizabeth Harrington (McKillop, Matthew)
November 23, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE/ANSWER to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Fitzgerald, Michael)
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION Student Appearance Kelly Garretson by Anderson Alphonse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Certification from Assistant Dean Emily Libby, #2 Exhibit Retainer Agreement between Boston College Immigration Clinic and Petitioner, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Student Attorney, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Counsel Mary Holper, #5 Exhibit List)(Holper, Mary)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION Student Appearance Rohena Rajbhandari by Anderson Alphonse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Certification re Rohena Rajbhandari from Assistant Dean Emily Libby, #2 Exhibit Retainer Agreement between Boston College Immigration Clinic and Petitioner, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Student Attorney Rohena Rajbhandari, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Counsel Mary Holper, #5 Exhibit List)(Holper, Mary)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION Student Appearance Elizabeth Harrington by Anderson Alphonse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Certification re Elizabeth Harrington from Assistant Dean Emily Libby, #2 Exhibit Retainer Agreement between Boston College Immigration Clinic and Petitioner, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Student Attorney Elizabeth Harrington, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Counsel Mary Holper, #5 Exhibit List)(Holper, Mary)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Fitzgerald on behalf of Antone Moniz (Fitzgerald, Michael)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. 1.The clerk shall serve a copy of the petition on the respondent and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. 2.Respondent shall, within 7 days of the entry of this Order, file an answer or other responsive pleading. Petitioner shall file a reply brief within 7 days of the filing of respondent's brief. 3.In order to give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, respondent shall provide the Court with at least 48 hours advance notice of any scheduled removal of the petitioner, and any scheduled transfer of the petitioner out of the jurisdiction.(PSSA, 4)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Currie, Haley)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Currie, Haley)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary P. Holper on behalf of Anderson Alphonse. (Currie, Haley)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number AMADC-9053352 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Anderson Alphonse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Anderson Alphonse, #2 Exhibit Notice to Appear, #3 Exhibit Notice of Custody Determination by Department of Homeland Security, #4 Exhibit Notice of Custody Transfer, #5 Exhibit Joseph Hearing Request, #6 Exhibit DHSs Joseph Hearing Submission, #7 Exhibit Immigration Judges Order on Joseph Custody Determination, #8 Exhibit Fraihat Notice of Custody Redetermi, #9 Exhibit Petitioners Immigration Court Convention Against Torture Brief, #10 Exhibit Mental Health Evaluation, CAT Br. Exhibit, #11 Exhibit DHS's Evidence in Removal Hearing, #12 Exhibit Immigration Judges Order on Petitioners Removability, #13 Exhibit Immigration Judges Order on Petitioners Convention Against Torture Application, #14 Exhibit Transcript of Removal Proceedings, #15 Exhibit Petitioners Brief on Appeal at the Board of Immigration Appeals, #16 Exhibit Board of Immigration Appeals Briefing Schedule Notice, #17 Exhibit Board of Immigration Appeals Briefing Extension Request Grant, #18 Exhibit Executive Office for Immigration Review Case Portal: Board of Immigration Appeals Case Appeal Status, #19 Exhibit Reid Class Member Notice, #20 Exhibit U Visa Request for Certification from Elizabeth Police Department, #21 Exhibit East Jersey State Prison Redacted Facesheet Participant Programs Transcript, #22 Exhibit Successful Employment and Lawful Living Certificate, #23 Exhibit Trenching and Excavation Certificate, #24 Exhibit African American Studies Certificate, #25 Exhibit Declaration of Support from Alexandra Pierre-Pierre, #26 Exhibit Letter of Support from Priscilla Pierre-Pierre, #27 Exhibit New Jersey Attorney General Law Enforcement Directive No. 2021-1, #28 Exhibit Exhibit List, #29 Civil Cover Sheet, #30 Supplement, #31 Supplement)(Holper, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alphonse v. Moniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anderson Alphonse
Represented By: Mary P. Holper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superintendent Antone Moniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Represented By: Michael Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?