Novoluto GmbH v. Clio Designs Incorporated
Plaintiff: Novoluto GmbH
Defendant: Clio Designs Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2021cv11858
Filed: November 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Referring Judge: Angel Kelley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 18 District Judge Angel Kelley: SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered. (Lara, Miguel)
December 17, 2021 Filing 17 District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Lisa E. Margonis. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Pacho, Arnold)
December 17, 2021 Filing 16 District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Tammy J. Terry. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Pacho, Arnold)
December 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tammy J. Terry by Plaintiff Novoluto GmbH. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9102022. Payment Type : PRO HAC VICE. (O'Connor, Andrew)
December 16, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lisa Erin Margonis Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9101989 by Novoluto GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(O'Connor, Andrew)
December 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tammy J. Terry by Novoluto GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(O'Connor, Andrew)
December 16, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
December 16, 2021 Filing 11 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (O'Connor, Andrew)
December 10, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
December 10, 2021 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 7, 2022 to File Answer (Russo, Noreen)
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 7, 2022 to File Answer by Clio Designs Incorporated.(Stier, Robert)
December 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert H. Stier, Jr on behalf of Clio Designs Incorporated (Stier, Robert)
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Clio Designs Incorporated served on 11/17/2021, answer due 12/8/2021. (O'Connor, Andrew)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Clio Designs Incorporated. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service..
November 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
November 16, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Novoluto GmbH identifying Corporate Parent IntiHealth Ger GmbH for Novoluto GmbH.. (O'Connor, Andrew)
November 16, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (O'Connor, Andrew)
November 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clio Designs Incorporated Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9057585 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Novoluto GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Category Form)(O'Connor, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novoluto GmbH v. Clio Designs Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novoluto GmbH
Represented By: Andrew T. O'Connor
Represented By: Lisa E. Margonis
Represented By: Tammy J. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clio Designs Incorporated
Represented By: Robert H. Stier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?