Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc. and CS Accessories, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv11872
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 56 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered; Final Judgment and Order for Permanent Injunction as Against Defendant CS Accessories, LLC. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
December 6, 2021 Filing 53 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Berman, Kenneth)
December 4, 2021 Filing 52 AGREEMENT FOR JUDGMENT between Plaintiff and Defendant CS Accessories, LLC by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Final Judgment and Order for Permanent Injunction as Against CS Accessories, LLC)(Kaler, Robert)
December 3, 2021 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to #47 Emergency MOTION to Continue Trial to early January 2022 filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Berman, Kenneth)
December 3, 2021 Filing 50 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #47 Emergency Motion to Continue Trial to early January 2022 by Amazon.com, Inc. Motion is denied absent joint agreement to an interim order. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
December 3, 2021 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT of Kuniyasu Shimizu in Opposition re #47 Emergency MOTION to Continue Trial to early January 2022 filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert)
December 3, 2021 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #47 Emergency MOTION to Continue Trial to early January 2022 filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert)
December 2, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Coppola, Katelyn)
December 2, 2021 Filing 54 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction held on December 1, 2021, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. Redaction Request due 12/23/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/2/2022. (Coppola, Katelyn)
December 2, 2021 Filing 47 Emergency MOTION to Continue Trial to early January 2022 by Amazon.com, Inc..(Berman, Kenneth)
December 2, 2021 Filing 46 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Christopher J. Donnelly. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Paine, Matthew)
December 1, 2021 Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute.(Kaler, Robert)
December 1, 2021 Filing 44 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 12/1/2021 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. The Court enters an order terminating #5 Motion for TRO and P/I; collapsing the motion with trial on the merits in accordance with FRCP 65A and setting a jury waived trial for Tuesday, December 7, 2021 at 9:00 AM. A binder of exhibits, both agreed upon and disputed shall be supplied to the Court prior to the commencement of trial. Should the matter settle prior to trial, counsel are instructed to notify the clerk. (Bench Trial Day One set for 12/7/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 (In person only) before Judge William G. Young, Bench Trial Day Two set for 12/8/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 (In person only) before Judge William G. Young, Bench Trial Day Three set for 12/9/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 (In person only) before Judge William G. Young.) (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Attorney Kaler for the plaintiff; Attorneys Berman and Buckley for defendant Amazon.com, Inc. and Attorneys Schofield and Donnelly for defendant CS Accessories, LLC) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
December 1, 2021 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher J. Donnelly Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9077258 . (Schofield, Timothy)
December 1, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher J. Donnelly Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9077258 by CS Accessories, LLC.(Schofield, Timothy)
December 1, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy N. Schofield on behalf of CS Accessories, LLC (Schofield, Timothy)
November 30, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Affidavits of James Coleman and Dr. Martin Bide by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit of James Coleman in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Affidavit Second Affidavit of Dr. Martin Bide in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction)(Kaler, Robert)
November 30, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Jedediah Wakefield on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Wakefield, Jedediah)
November 30, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Buckley on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Buckley, Brian)
November 30, 2021 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT of Brian Buckley in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Brian Buckley, #2 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Brian Buckley)(Berman, Kenneth)
November 30, 2021 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT of Paul Thomas in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Berman, Kenneth)
November 30, 2021 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Berman, Kenneth)
November 29, 2021 Filing 34 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #32 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Amazon's Time-Sensitive Motion to Continue December 1 Hearing on Motion for TRO and PI by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 29, 2021 Filing 33 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #24 Motion to Continue December 1, 2021 Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion For Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to December 15, 2021 (TIME SENSITIVE MOTION) by Amazon.com, Inc. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 29, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Amazon's Time-Sensitive Motion to Continue December 1 Hearing on Motion for TRO and PI by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A -- Sur-Reply)(Kaler, Robert)
November 29, 2021 Filing 31 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brian D. Buckley. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Paine, Matthew)
November 29, 2021 Filing 30 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jedediah Wakefield. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Paine, Matthew)
November 24, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to #24 MOTION to Continue December 1 Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion For Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to December 15, 2021 (TIME SENSITIVE MOTION) filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Berman, Kenneth)
November 24, 2021 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Berman, Kenneth)
November 24, 2021 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Continue December 1 Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion For Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to December 15, 2021 (TIME SENSITIVE MOTION) filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert)
November 24, 2021 Filing 26 Letter/request (non-motion) from Kenneth R. Berman, Counsel for Amazon regarding Amazon's time-sensitive motion to continue December 1 hearing. (Berman, Kenneth)
November 24, 2021 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Brian Buckley in Support re #24 MOTION to Continue December 1 Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion For Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to December 15, 2021 (TIME SENSITIVE MOTION) filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Brian Buckley in Support of Motion to Continue December 1 Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion For Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Berman, Kenneth)
November 24, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Continue December 1 Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion For Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to December 15, 2021 (TIME SENSITIVE MOTION) by Amazon.com, Inc..(Berman, Kenneth)
November 23, 2021 Filing 23 Assented to MOTION to Correct Corrected Assented-to Motion of Jedediah Wakefield to Appear Pro Hac Vice (replaces Dkt. 21 filed in error; $100 filing fee paid on Dkt. 21; supported by affidavit filed at Dkt. 22) by Amazon.com, Inc..(Berman, Kenneth)
November 23, 2021 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Jedediah Wakefield in Support re #21 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jedediah Wakefield Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9069633 filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Berman, Kenneth)
November 23, 2021 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jedediah Wakefield Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9069633 by Amazon.com, Inc..(Berman, Kenneth)
November 23, 2021 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Brian D. Buckley in Support re #19 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian D. Buckley Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9069628 filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Berman, Kenneth)
November 23, 2021 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian D. Buckley Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9069628 by Amazon.com, Inc..(Berman, Kenneth)
November 23, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth R. Berman on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Berman, Kenneth)
November 23, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Hearing with Affidavit of Process Server on Amazon.com, Inc. (Kaler, Robert)
November 23, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Hearing with Affidavit of Service on CS Accessories (Kaler, Robert)
November 22, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Hearing (Kaler, Robert)
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Amazon.com, Inc. served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Kaler, Robert)
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. CS Accessories, LLC served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert)
November 19, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2021 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Counsel for the plaintiff shall notify defense counsel of this hearing. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute of Non-Jury Demand (Kaler, Robert)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Kuniyasu Shimizu re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of James Coleman re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2021: #1 Exhibit A) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 8 replaced on 11/18/2021) (Paine, Matthew).
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Martin Bide re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2021: #1 Exhibit 1) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/18/2021) (Paine, Matthew).
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Karl Spilhaus re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2021: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/18/2021) (Paine, Matthew).
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute.(Kaler, Robert)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Kaler, Robert)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc., CS Accessories, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CS Accessories, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9061828 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Kaler, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cashmere and Camel Hair Manufacturers Institute
Represented By: Robert J. Kaler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Brian D. Buckley
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Represented By: Kenneth R. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CS Accessories, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Donnelly
Represented By: Timothy N. Schofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?