Coyle v. DJD Medical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Peter Coyle
Defendant: DJD Medical, Inc., Domenic J Dinardo, Medical Device Business Services, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2021cv12048
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Filing 34 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to the State Court. (McManus, Caetlin)
January 28, 2022 Filing 33 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. The Court, squarely presented with the merits of removal in this action, concludes that it lacks subject matter jurisdiction, and that the case must be returned to state court. Accordingly, Removing Defendants' motion to stay all proceedings, [ECF No. #6 ], is DENIED, and Plaintiff's motion to remand the case to state court, [ECF No. #8 ], is GRANTED.SO ORDERED.(McManus, Caetlin)
January 20, 2022 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #30 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Resp to Ntc of Supp Auth filed by Peter Coyle. (Cowgill, Michael)
January 20, 2022 Filing 31 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #30 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
January 20, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Resp to Ntc of Supp Auth by Peter Coyle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Reply to Resp to Ntc of Supp Auth)(Cowgill, Michael)
January 18, 2022 Filing 29 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority Response by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc. . (Casey, Alison)
January 18, 2022 Filing 28 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #27 Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
January 18, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Response))(Casey, Alison)
January 14, 2022 Filing 26 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - 220111 Order)(Cowgill, Michael)
January 14, 2022 Filing 25 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
January 13, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Peter Coyle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 220111 Order)(Cowgill, Michael)
January 13, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE by Peter Coyle re #21 Notice (Other) to Withdraw Ntc of Supp Auth (Cowgill, Michael)
January 12, 2022 Filing 22 STATE COURT Record. (Casey, Alison)
January 11, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE by Peter Coyle Supplemental Auth ISO Mtn for Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 220111 Order)(Cowgill, Michael)
January 3, 2022 Filing 20 Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Casey, Alison)
December 22, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Casey, Alison)
December 22, 2021 Filing 18 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
December 22, 2021 Filing 17 Opposition re #16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion to Stay filed by Peter Coyle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cowgill, Michael)
December 22, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion to Stay by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Casey, Alison)
December 21, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Cowgill on behalf of Peter Coyle (Cowgill, Michael)
December 20, 2021 Filing 14 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael J. Cowgill. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McManus, Caetlin)
December 20, 2021 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael J. Cowgill Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9106895 by Peter Coyle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit)(Bliss, Paula)
December 20, 2021 Filing 12 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to January 5, 2022 or 7 days after any stay is lifted to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Folan, Karen)
December 20, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to January 5, 2022 or 7 days after any stay is lifted to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by DJD Medical, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Domenic J Dinardo, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Casey, Alison)
December 17, 2021 Filing 10 Opposition re #6 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Peter Coyle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bliss, Paula)
December 17, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Peter Coyle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Bliss, Paula)
December 17, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Peter Coyle.(Bliss, Paula)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Casey, Alison)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc..(Casey, Alison)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc.. (Casey, Alison)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison C. Casey on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc. (Casey, Alison)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9100111 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Casey, Alison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coyle v. DJD Medical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Coyle
Represented By: Paula S. Bliss
Represented By: Michael J. Cowgill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DJD Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Alison C. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domenic J Dinardo
Represented By: Alison C. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Device Business Services, Inc.
Represented By: Alison C. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Alison C. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Represented By: Alison C. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Alison C. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?