S. et al v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts et al
Plaintiff: Brent S., Angie S., J. B., R. B., A. F., C. S. and H. S.
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts and Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts HMO Blue
Case Number: 1:2021mc91545
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 INTERIM ELECTRONIC REPORT OF ADR PROVIDER. Magistrate Judge Dein: On October 4, 2021, I conducted a mediation via Zoom in this case. All parties were represented by counsel, and were present in person or by authorized corporate officer. Progress was made, and the parties are scheduled for a continuation of the mediation on November 3, 2021 at 10:30AM. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-11569-ADB, 1:18-cv-12278-ADB, 1:21-mc-91545-ADB. (Cunningham, Nancy)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 2:21-mc-00502.
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Stipulated Motion to Transfer Motion to Compel. This miscellaneous action, including Defendants' Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena (Dkt. #3 ), shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts. Docket entry #1 , Motion to Compel Compliance, is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 8/31/21. (dla)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena filed by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts HMO Blue. (Hagen, Scott)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 Stipulated MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena filed by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts HMO Blue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MA subpoena, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hagen, Scott)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena. Case Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. (Filing fee $ 49, receipt number 4681095589.) filed by Defendants Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts HMO Blue. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Massachusetts Docket Report, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(nmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S. et al v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent S.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Ex Kano S. Sams, II
Represented By: Jonathan M. Feigenbaum
Represented By: Mala M. Rafik
Represented By: Sean K. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angie S.
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Ex Kano S. Sams, II
Represented By: Jonathan M. Feigenbaum
Represented By: Mala M. Rafik
Represented By: Sean K. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. B.
Represented By: Ex Kano S. Sams, II
Represented By: Jonathan M. Feigenbaum
Represented By: Sean K. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. B.
Represented By: Ex Kano S. Sams, II
Represented By: Jonathan M. Feigenbaum
Represented By: Sean K. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. F.
Represented By: Ex Kano S. Sams, II
Represented By: Jonathan M. Feigenbaum
Represented By: Mala M. Rafik
Represented By: Sean K. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. S.
Represented By: Ex Kano S. Sams, II
Represented By: Jonathan M. Feigenbaum
Represented By: Mala M. Rafik
Represented By: Sean K. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. S.
Represented By: Ex Kano S. Sams, II
Represented By: Mala M. Rafik
Represented By: Sean K. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts
Represented By: Scott A. Hagen
Represented By: Charles L. Solomont
Represented By: Jordan McCrary
Represented By: Katherine E. Priest
Represented By: Lisa R. Weddle
Represented By: Molly Moriarty Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts HMO Blue
Represented By: Scott A. Hagen
Represented By: Charles L. Solomont
Represented By: Jordan McCrary
Represented By: Katherine E. Priest
Represented By: Lisa R. Weddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?