Duplessis v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Jean Y. Duplessis
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2022cv10237
Filed: February 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Filing 36 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Late Objection, by Jean Y. Duplessis.(Baker, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2022: #1 Proposed Objection) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 36 replaced on 4/11/2022) (Paine, Matthew).
April 6, 2022 Filing 35 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Tara Trifon. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Paine, Matthew)
April 6, 2022 Filing 34 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #32 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to April 21, 2022 to File Joint Pre-Trial Memo by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
April 6, 2022 Filing 33 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tara Trifon Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9260340 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sprague, Stephanie)
April 1, 2022 Filing 32 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 21, 2022 to File Joint Pre-Trial Memo by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Sprague, Stephanie)
March 29, 2022 Filing 31 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered; PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2022 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Hearing to be held at conclusion of motion session.(Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 23, 2022 Filing 30 Judge William G. YoungELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re #25 JOINT STATEMENT is so ordered as the case management scheduling order. MOTIONS DUE April 19, 2022 and DISCOVERY DUE May 2, 2022. (Paine, Matthew)
March 21, 2022 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #26 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2022 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 21, 2022 Filing 28 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 3/21/2022 by video re #15 Renewed Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jean Y. Duplessis. The motion is collapsed with trial on the merits in accordance with Rule 65(a). Jury trial to commence on May 10, 2022. A joint proposed case management scheduled to be filed within two weeks. If the case were to settle, counsel are instructed to notify the clerk. (Ready for Trial on 5/10/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 (In person only) before Judge William G. Young.) (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Attorney Baker for the plaintiff and Attorney Sprague for the defendant) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 18, 2022 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Sprague, Stephanie)
March 18, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Sprague, Stephanie)
March 18, 2022 Filing 25 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Sprague, Stephanie)
March 18, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sprague, Stephanie)
March 7, 2022 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed) (with certificate of service) filed by Jean Y. Duplessis. (Baker, David)
March 7, 2022 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed) : Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2022 at 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. Entry made only to reflect that this hearing will be held by video (zoom), not in person. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 4, 2022 Filing 21 Opposition re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Sprague, Stephanie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2022: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 21 replaced on 3/7/2022) (Paine, Matthew).
March 4, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Donald W. Seeley, Jr (Seeley, Donald)
March 4, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Samuel C. Bodurtha (Bodurtha, Samuel)
March 2, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Sprague on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Sprague, Stephanie)
March 1, 2022 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed) : Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
February 23, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed) by Jean Y. Duplessis.(Baker, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2022: #1 Exhibit) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 15 replaced on 2/25/2022) (Paine, Matthew).
February 23, 2022 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jean Y. Duplessis as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Baker, David)
February 21, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald W. Seeley, Jr on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Seeley, Donald)
February 21, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Bodurtha on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
February 14, 2022 Filing 16 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 2/14/2022 re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jean Y. Duplessis. The Court inquires as to service on the defendant and determines that proper service had not been made. Order enters denying without prejudice #2 Motion for TRO due to no service being made. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Attorney Baker for the plaintiff) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
February 14, 2022 Filing 11 Civil Cover Sheet by Jean Y. Duplessis. (Baker, David) (Main Document 11 replaced on 2/14/2022) (Paine, Matthew).
February 13, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Verified) against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Jean Y. Duplessis.(Baker, David)
February 13, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2022 at 9:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
February 13, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2022 at 9:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
February 11, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Jean Y. Duplessis re 6 Notice of Hearing on Motion, . (Baker, David)
February 11, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Plaintiff's counsel shall give notice to defense counsel of this hearing. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
February 11, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dore, Samantha)
February 11, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Dore, Samantha)
February 11, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
February 11, 2022 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jean Y. Duplessis.(Baker, David)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against Wells Fargo as trustee Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9181989 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jean Y. Duplessis.(Baker, David) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/11/2022) (Dore, Samantha). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2022: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Dore, Samantha).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duplessis v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Y. Duplessis
Represented By: David G. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Represented By: Tara Trifon
Represented By: Donald W. Seeley, Jr.
Represented By: Stephanie Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?