U.S. Bank Trust National Association v. Ratte et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Defendant: Donna L Ratte, Michael D Ratte and Bank of America, N.A.
Interested Party: Velocity Investments, LLC and Barclays Bank Delaware
Case Number: 1:2022cv10312
Filed: February 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY VIDEO: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/17/2022 03:00 PM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
April 20, 2022 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE SETTING ON #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM BY VIDEO: MOTION HEARING SET FOR 6/17/2022 02:30 PM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
April 20, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Anne Morisette on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Morisette, Patricia)
April 19, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Murphy, Daniel)
April 19, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bank of America, N.A..(Murphy, Daniel)
April 19, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Murphy on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Murphy, Daniel)
April 13, 2022 Filing 9 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Bank of America, N.A. answer due 5/20/2022. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
April 13, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Bank of America, N.A. served on 3/30/2022, answer due 4/20/2022; Barclays Bank Delaware served on 3/29/2022, answer due 4/19/2022; Donna L Ratte served on 3/29/2022, answer due 4/19/2022; Michael D Ratte served on 3/29/2022, answer due 4/19/2022; Velocity Investments, LLC served on 3/30/2022, answer due 4/20/2022. (Linehan, Brian)
April 12, 2022 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 20, 2022 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Bank of America, N.A..(Swisher, Meredith)
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith A. Swisher on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Swisher, Meredith)
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Phillips, Sophie)
February 24, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
February 24, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Linehan on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust National Association (Linehan, Brian)
February 24, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee, for ABS Loan Trust V. (Longoria, Reneau)
February 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against Barclays Bank Delaware, Bank of America, N.A., Michael D Ratte, Donna L Ratte, Velocity Investments, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9198176 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee, for ABS Loan Trust V. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Longoria, Reneau)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust National Association v. Ratte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Represented By: Brian Linehan
Represented By: Reneau J. Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna L Ratte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Ratte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Meredith A. Swisher
Represented By: Patricia Anne Morisette
Represented By: Daniel P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Velocity Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Barclays Bank Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?