MAN AGAINST XTINCTION, as Citizen Attorney General v. Cosco Container Lines America, Inc et al
Plaintiff: MAN AGAINST XTINCTION, as Citizen Attorney General, Richard Maximus Straham and Pro Se Party Richard Strahan
Defendant: Cocsco Container Lines Amerika, Inc., Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc. and CMA CGM (AMERICA) LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv10722
Filed: June 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 13 Emergency MOTION PARTIAL WAIVER OF RULE FOR SERVICE OF SUBPOENA ON GOVERNMENT AGENCY AND CORPORATIONS re #10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MAN AGAINST XTINCTIONS EMERGENCY PETITION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER PLAINTIFFS PETITION TO ALLOW HIM TO SERVE SUPOENAS ON GOVERNMENT AGENCIES & BIG CORPORATIONS VIA USPS TRACKED PRIORITY MAIL by Richard Strahan.(Strahan, Richard)
July 29, 2022 Filing 12 Emergency MOTION Petition to ALLOW service of summons by USPS Priority Tracked Mail on Corporate Designated Process Receiver Service re #10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MAN AGAINST XTINCTIONS EMERGENCY PETITION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER PLAINTIFFS PETITION TO ALLOW HIM TO SERVE SUMMONS/COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANTS BY HIS MAILING IT USPS TRACKED PRIORITY MAIL by Richard Strahan.(Strahan, Richard)
July 27, 2022 Filing 11 Emergency MOTION ORDER TOI HAVE US MARSHAL SERVE TRO/SUMMONS ON EACH DEFENDANT re #10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MAN AGAINST XTINCTIONS EMERGENCY PETITION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER PLAINTIFFS SECOND EMERGENCY PETITION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING THE US MARSHAL BY 1 AUGUST 2022 TO SERVE THE SUMMONS & PENDING EMERGENCY TRO PETITION ON THE DEFENDANTS by Richard Strahan.(Strahan, Richard)
July 27, 2022 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MAN AGAINST XTINCTIONS EMERGENCY PETITION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Richard Strahan.(Strahan, Richard)
July 22, 2022 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION to Compel MAX's EMERGTENCY MOTION TO ORDER US MARSHAL TO SERVE BY 29 JULY 2022 THE SUMMONS/COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANTS SERVICE PROVIDER IN BOSTON MA by Richard Strahan.(Strahan, Richard)
June 28, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
June 28, 2022 Filing 7 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3 Motion waiver of the filing fee and service by the USMS,; granting #4 Motion for leave to electronically file Pro Se; denying #5 Motion for TRO; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pro se litigants must have an individual PACER account to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at #https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro se e-filing account Instructions #https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-se.htm.If you already have a PACER account with E-Filing access as a pro se litigant, you do not need to register again. Please email tracy_mclaughlin@mad.uscourts.gov. (Hourihan, Lisa)
June 14, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
June 14, 2022 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by MAN AGAINST XTINCTION, as Citizen Attorney General.(Castilla, Francis)
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by MAN AGAINST XTINCTION, as Citizen Attorney General.(Castilla, Francis)
June 14, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to waive the filing fee and have US. Marshal Serve the Summons on the Defendants by MAN AGAINST XTINCTION, as Citizen Attorney General.(Castilla, Francis)
June 14, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MAN AGAINST XTINCTION, as Citizen Attorney General.(Castilla, Francis)
June 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MAN AGAINST XTINCTION, as Citizen Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAN AGAINST XTINCTION, as Citizen Attorney General v. Cosco Container Lines America, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAN AGAINST XTINCTION, as Citizen Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Maximus Straham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro Se Party Richard Strahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cocsco Container Lines Amerika, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMA CGM (AMERICA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?