Doe v. City of Lowell et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: City of Lowell, North-Reading Lynnfield Taxi, Inc., Mary Moes 1-5 and Michael Moes 1-5
Case Number: 1:2022cv10849
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Suuberg, Margaret)
July 15, 2022 Filing 21 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 4/26/2023 09:15 AM in Courtroom 17 (Remote only) before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Initial disclosures shall be served by 7/15/2022. Discovery shall be completed by 4/14/2023. Please see attached for full order. (McManus, Caetlin)
July 15, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by City of Lowell, North-Reading Lynnfield Taxi, Inc..(Farrey, Thomas)
July 14, 2022 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT Leave to File Granted July 14, 2022 (Dk. 15) against All Defendants, filed by Jane Doe.(Burns, Sara)
July 14, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Jane Doe.(Burns, Sara)
July 14, 2022 Filing 17 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by North-Reading Lynnfield Taxi, Inc..(Farrey, Thomas)
July 14, 2022 Filing 16 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by City of Lowell.(Farrey, Thomas)
July 14, 2022 Filing 15 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion to Amend complaint. Plaintiff may now electronically file amended complaint through the ecf system. (Folan, Karen)
July 13, 2022 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION to Amend #9 State Court Record Plaintiff's Complaint to Correct Party Misnomer by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Burns, Sara)
July 1, 2022 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by North-Reading Lynnfield Taxi, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Van Pool Transportation, LLC for North-Reading Lynnfield Taxi, Inc... (Farrey, Thomas)
June 30, 2022 Filing 12 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 6/30/2022. Colloquy re: proposed schedule. Initial Disclosures by 7/15/22 and 9 months for fact discovery. Court will issue an order. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Burns, Durso, Farrey, Suuberg) (Folan, Karen)
June 27, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 6/30/2022 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
June 24, 2022 Filing 10 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by City of Lowell, North-Reading Lynnfield Taxi, Inc..(Farrey, Thomas)
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (Farrey, Thomas) (Main Document 9 replaced on 6/22/2022 with one impounded page removed by filer.) (McManus, Caetlin).
June 15, 2022 Filing 8 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties shall submit a joint proposed schedule by 6/29/22 and indicate whether they object to the court setting a schedule on the written submission.(Folan, Karen)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Lowell, North-Reading Lynnfield Taxi, Inc..(Farrey, Thomas)
June 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret R. Suuberg on behalf of City of Lowell, North-Reading Lynnfield Taxi, Inc. (Suuberg, Margaret)
June 2, 2022 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
June 2, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Lowell, North-Reading Lynnfield Taxi, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9349225 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farrey, Thomas) (Attachment 1 replaced Exhibit 1 detached from other exhibits and Additional attachment(s) #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (de Oliveira, Flaviana).
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas B. Farrey, III on behalf of City of Lowell, North-Reading Lynnfield Taxi, Inc. (Farrey, Thomas)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by City of Lowell. (Farrey, Thomas) (Main Document 1 replaced with corrected document on 6/2/2022) (de Oliveira, Flaviana).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. City of Lowell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Carmen L. Durso
Represented By: Sara E. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lowell
Represented By: Thomas B. Farrey, III
Represented By: Margaret R. Suuberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North-Reading Lynnfield Taxi, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas B. Farrey, III
Represented By: Margaret R. Suuberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Moes 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Moes 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?