NBD Solar LLC v. Maddox Industrial Transformer, LLC
Plaintiff: NBD Solar LLC
Defendant: Maddox Industrial Transformer, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv10936
Filed: June 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2022 Filing 25 Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by NBD Solar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burke, Richard)
August 2, 2022 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC NOTICE RESETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND HEARING BY VIDEO on Motion #12 MOTION to Dismiss : MOTION HEARING RESET FROM 8/18/2022 TO 9/30/2022 09:30 AM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE RESET FROM 8/18/2022 TO 9/30/2022 10:00 AM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
July 26, 2022 Filing 23 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Scott E. Frick. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
July 26, 2022 Filing 22 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added J. Patrick Bradley. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
July 25, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Scott E. Frick Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9426227 by Maddox Industrial Transformer, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification)(Lavoie, Mark)
July 25, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of J. Patrick Bradley Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number BMADC-9426174 by Maddox Industrial Transformer, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification)(Lavoie, Mark)
July 18, 2022 Filing 19 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Joint MOTION for Extension of time to 08/16/2022 to File Response - ALLOWED. (Molloy, Maryellen)
July 18, 2022 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/04/2022 and 08/16/2022 to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss by NBD Solar LLC.(Burke, Richard)
July 15, 2022 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NBD Solar LLC. (Burke, Richard)
July 14, 2022 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #12 MOTION to Dismiss : This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2022 02:30 PM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
July 14, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Scheduling ConferenceThis hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2022 02:15 PM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
July 7, 2022 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Maddox Industrial Transformer, LLC. (Lavoie, Mark)
July 7, 2022 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified copy of the entire South Carolina public record for the prior litigation, entitled Maddox Industrial Transformer, LLC v. NBD Solar, LLC, #2 Exhibit Certified copy of the entire Massachusetts Wareham District Court public record for the litigation to enforce the South Carolina judgment in Massachusetts, entitled Maddox Industrial Transformer, LLC v. NBD Solar, LLC (C.A. No. 2160FJ000005))(Lavoie, Mark)
July 7, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Maddox Industrial Transformer, LLC.(Lavoie, Mark)
July 7, 2022 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Maddox Industrial Transformer, LLC. (Lavoie, Mark)
July 7, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark B. Lavoie on behalf of Maddox Industrial Transformer, LLC (Lavoie, Mark)
July 6, 2022 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (Lavoie, Mark) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/14/2022 to correct document view. ) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
June 29, 2022 Filing 8 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Allowed re #7 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference - Assented To. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
June 28, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference - Assented To by NBD Solar LLC.(Beauregard, Philip)
June 24, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY VIDEO: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/11/2022 11:30 AM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
June 22, 2022 Filing 5 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re #4 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Maddox Industrial Transformer, LLC answer due 7/7/2022. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
June 21, 2022 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 7, 2022 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Maddox Industrial Transformer, LLC.(Lavoie, Mark)
June 16, 2022 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Currie, Haley)
June 16, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
June 16, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Maddox Industrial Transformer, LLC ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9372295 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Lavoie, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NBD Solar LLC v. Maddox Industrial Transformer, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NBD Solar LLC
Represented By: Richard E. Burke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maddox Industrial Transformer, LLC
Represented By: Mark B. Lavoie
Represented By: J. Patrick Bradley
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?