Munoz v. 40-44 Forest Street, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maryann Munoz
Defendant: 40-44 Forest Street, LLC, Thomas Perrotta, David Webster, Jodie Nataloni, Heidi Conlon, City of Methuen, Sherri Perrotta and APM LLC doing business as Andalusian Property Management
Case Number: 1:2022cv11079
Filed: July 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Housing Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2022 Filing 11 Joint Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Methuen, Heidi Conlon. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Opposition)(Scamby, James)
August 9, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell Mook on behalf of APM LLC, Jodie Nataloni, David Webster (Mook, Darrell)
July 31, 2022 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Maryann Munoz. (Jacobs, Walter)
July 31, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Maryann Munoz.(Jacobs, Walter)
July 25, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Maryann Munoz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lease, #2 Exhibit Andruchaw Deed, #3 Exhibit T Perrotta Deed, #4 Exhibit Forest Street LLC Deed, #5 Exhibit Munoz Affidavit, #6 Exhibit Munoz Medical Diagnoses, #7 Exhibit Medical Letter, #8 Exhibit Munoz Text, #9 Exhibit Alexzavior Letter, #10 Exhibit Affidavit T Perrotta, #11 Exhibit Pet Addendum, #12 Exhibit Dog Ordinances, #13 Exhibit CDC Guidelines)(Jacobs, Walter)
July 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Stefanilo, Jr on behalf of 40-44 Forest Street, LLC, Sherri Perrotta, Thomas Perrotta (Stefanilo, Michael)
July 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard H. Kesten on behalf of 40-44 Forest Street, LLC, Sherri Perrotta, Thomas Perrotta (Kesten, Leonard)
July 18, 2022 Filing 4 STATE COURT Record. (Scamby, James)
July 6, 2022 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 6, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Finn, Mary)
July 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cityof Methuen, Heidi Conlon ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9398898 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2nd Amended Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Category Sheet)(Scamby, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munoz v. 40-44 Forest Street, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryann Munoz
Represented By: Alexandria A. Jacobs
Represented By: Walter H. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 40-44 Forest Street, LLC
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Represented By: Michael Stefanilo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Perrotta
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Represented By: Michael Stefanilo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Webster
Represented By: Darrell Mook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodie Nataloni
Represented By: Darrell Mook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Conlon
Represented By: James T. Scamby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Methuen
Represented By: James T. Scamby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Perrotta
Represented By: Leonard H. Kesten
Represented By: Michael Stefanilo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APM LLC doing business as Andalusian Property Management
Represented By: Darrell Mook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?