SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Plaintiff: SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC., LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOC., INC., XIII NORTHEAST FISHERY SECTOR, INC., HERITAGE FISHERIES, INC., NAT. W., INC. and OLD SQUAW FISHERIES, INC.
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior, DEB HAALAND, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, AMANDA LEFTON, LAURA DANIEL-DAVIS, United States Department of Commerce, GINA M. RAIMONDO, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, CATHERINE MARZIN, United States Department of Defense, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, United States Army Corps of Engineers, SCOTT A. SPELLMON and JOHN A. ATILANO, II
Intervenor Defendant: Vineyard Wind 1 LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv11091
Filed: July 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2022 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Support re #56 MOTION to Strike Documents from and Supplement the Administrative Record filed by HERITAGE FISHERIES, INC., LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOC., INC., NAT. W., INC., OLD SQUAW FISHERIES, INC., SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC., XIII NORTHEAST FISHERY SECTOR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Hadzi-Antich, Theodore)
September 2, 2022 Filing 56 MOTION to Strike Documents from and Supplement the Administrative Record by HERITAGE FISHERIES, INC., LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOC., INC., NAT. W., INC., OLD SQUAW FISHERIES, INC., SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC., XIII NORTHEAST FISHERY SECTOR, INC..(Hadzi-Antich, Theodore)
August 30, 2022 Filing 55 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER. Please see attached. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-11091-IT, 1:22-cv-11172-IT (Kelly, Danielle)
August 26, 2022 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Henneke on behalf of HERITAGE FISHERIES, INC., LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOC., INC., NAT. W., INC., OLD SQUAW FISHERIES, INC., SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC., XIII NORTHEAST FISHERY SECTOR, INC. (Henneke, Robert)
August 17, 2022 Filing 53 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Scheduling Conference held on 8/17/2022. (Both 1:22-cv-11091-IT and 1:22-cv-11172 were heard.) Case called. Court had colloquy with counsel. Cases are not consolidated but if documents are filed that are identical, both case captions shall be listed. Any distinctions/differences shall be noted. Court advised counsel on filing procedures and the separate filing of Rule 56.1 statements of undisputed material facts. (In 1:21-cv-11390-IT, the statement will be ordered to be filed.) A hearing on summary judgment motions to be set once briefing is completed. The motion as to page limits denied without prejudice and will be renewed brief by brief. Proposed schedule adopted in both cases: a. Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment, statement of facts, and brief in support of motion: November 1, 2022; b. Federal Defendants opposition and cross-motion, statement of facts, and brief in opposition and in support of cross-motion: December 13, 2022; c. Defendant-Intervenors opposition and cross-motion, statement of facts, and brief in opposition and in support of cross-motion: December 20, 2022; d. Plaintiffs' brief in opposition and reply: January 24, 2023; e. Federal Defendants' reply: February 28, 2023; and, f. Defendant-Intervenor's reply: March 7, 2023. Counsel shall endeavor to jointly file a single consolidated statement of facts no later than December 20, 2022. (Court Reporter: Robert Paschal at rwp.reporter@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Theodore Hadzi-Antich, Mark Brown, Luther L. Hajek, Connor William Mighell, Perry M. Rosen,David T. Buente, Jack W. Pirozzolo, Ira H. Zaleznik, Roger J. Marzulla, Angela Ellis) Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-11091-IT, 1:22-cv-11172-IT(MacDonald, Gail)
August 11, 2022 Filing 52 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #51 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Robert Henneke. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Dore, Samantha)
August 11, 2022 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert Henneke Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9450759 by LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOC., INC., NAT. W., INC., OLD SQUAW FISHERIES, INC., SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC., XIII NORTHEAST FISHERY SECTOR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robert Henneke)(Zaleznik, Ira)
August 4, 2022 Filing 50 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by JOHN A. ATILANO, II, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, LAURA DANIEL-DAVIS, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, CATHERINE MARZIN, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M. RAIMONDO, SCOTT A. SPELLMON, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Department of Commerce, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Mark)
August 1, 2022 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Brown on behalf of JOHN A. ATILANO, II, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, LAURA DANIEL-DAVIS, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, CATHERINE MARZIN, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M. RAIMONDO, SCOTT A. SPELLMON, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Department of Commerce, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of the Interior (Brown, Mark)
July 26, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Connor William Mighell on behalf of HERITAGE FISHERIES, INC., LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOC., INC., NAT. W., INC., OLD SQUAW FISHERIES, INC., SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC., XIII NORTHEAST FISHERY SECTOR, INC. (Mighell, Connor)
July 26, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Hadzi-Antich on behalf of HERITAGE FISHERIES, INC., LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOC., INC., NAT. W., INC., OLD SQUAW FISHERIES, INC., SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC., XIII NORTHEAST FISHERY SECTOR, INC. (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore)
July 26, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by James Wedeking on behalf of Vineyard Wind 1 LLC (Wedeking, James)
July 22, 2022 Filing 45 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James R. Wedeking. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 22, 2022 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James R. Wedeking Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9423778 by Vineyard Wind 1 LLC.(Pirozzolo, Jack) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2022: #1 Exhibit A) (Kelly, Danielle). (Main Document 44 replaced on 7/22/2022 - removed exhibit to properly file as an attachment) (Kelly, Danielle).
July 22, 2022 Filing 43 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Scheduling Conference set for 08/10/2022, is RESET for 8/17/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (Remote only) before Judge Indira Talwani. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(MacDonald, Gail)
July 22, 2022 Filing 42 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Theodore Hadzi-Antich and Connor William Mighell. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 22, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack W. Pirozzolo on behalf of Vineyard Wind 1 LLC (Pirozzolo, Jack)
July 22, 2022 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Theodore Hadzi-Antich and Connor William Mighell Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number AMADC-9422949 by LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOC., INC., OLD SQUAW FISHERIES, INC., SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC., XIII NORTHEAST FISHERY SECTOR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Zaleznik, Ira)
July 19, 2022 Filing 39 SEE ATTACHED NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2022 03:45 PM in Courtroom 9 (Remote only) before Judge Indira Talwani. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(MacDonald, Gail)
July 7, 2022 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
July 7, 2022 Filing 37 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-03276.
July 1, 2022 Filing 36 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Federal Defendants' Notice of Filing Certified BOEM Administrative Record Addendum) by BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, LAURA DANIEL-DAVIS, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1-Certification, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2-Addendum)(Brown, Mark)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendants' #16 Motion to Transfer the Case to the District of Massachusetts; granting Plaintiffs' #22 Unopposed Motion for Judicial Notice; and denying Plaintiffs #31 Motion to Strike without prejudice to refiling the motion in the transferee district. See full Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/27/2022. (lccrc1)
June 13, 2022 Filing 34 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Federal Defendants' Notice of Filing Certified Index to NMFS Administrative Record Second Addendum) by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M. RAIMONDO, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Certified Index to NMFS Administrative Record Second Addendum)(Brown, Mark)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #31 MOTION to Strike #26 Administrative Record. It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendants shall have until ten (10) days following this Court's denial of Defendants' #16 Motion to Transfer this action to the District of Massachusetts, should the Court deny that Motion. In the event the Court grants the Motion to Transfer, the transferee Court shall determine when Defendants' response to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike is due. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/26/2022. (lccrc1)
May 25, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 MOTION to Strike #26 Administrative Record,,, by JOHN A. ATILANO, II, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, LAURA DANIEL-DAVIS, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, CATHERINE MARZIN, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M. RAIMONDO, SCOTT A. SPELLMON, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosen, Perry)
May 20, 2022 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM re #31 MOTION to Strike #26 Administrative Record,,, filed by HERITAGE FISHERIES, INC., OLD SQUAW FISHERIES, INC., SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC., XIII NORTHEAST FISHERY SECTOR, INC., LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOC., INC., NAT. W., INC. by HERITAGE FISHERIES, INC., LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOC., INC., NAT. W., INC., OLD SQUAW FISHERIES, INC., SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC., XIII NORTHEAST FISHERY SECTOR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Hadzi-Antich, Theodore)
May 20, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION to Strike #26 Administrative Record,,, by HERITAGE FISHERIES, INC., LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOC., INC., NAT. W., INC., OLD SQUAW FISHERIES, INC., SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC., XIII NORTHEAST FISHERY SECTOR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hadzi-Antich, Theodore)
May 19, 2022 Filing 30 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Federal Defendants' Notice of Filing Certified Index to NMFS Administrative Record Addendum) by NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M. RAIMONDO, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 -Certified Index to NMFS Administrative Record Addendum)(Brown, Mark)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/18/2022. (lccrc2)
April 14, 2022 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Limited Protective Order) by JOHN A. ATILANO, II, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, LAURA DANIEL-DAVIS, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, CATHERINE MARZIN, GINA M. RAIMONDO, SCOTT A. SPELLMON, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Brown, Mark)
April 14, 2022 Filing 27 STIPULATION (Stipulated Limited Protective Order) by JOHN A. ATILANO, II, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, LAURA DANIEL-DAVIS, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, CATHERINE MARZIN, GINA M. RAIMONDO, SCOTT A. SPELLMON, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Acknowledgment and Agreement to be Bound by Protective Order)(Brown, Mark)
April 11, 2022 Filing 26 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Federal Defendants' Notice of Filing Certified Indices to Administrative Records) by JOHN A. ATILANO, II, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, LAURA DANIEL-DAVIS, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, CATHERINE MARZIN, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M. RAIMONDO, SCOTT A. SPELLMON, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.1-Certified Index to BOEM Administrative Record, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2-Certified Index to NMFS Administrative Record, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3-Certified Index to USACE Administrative Record)(Brown, Mark)
March 11, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by JOHN A. ATILANO, II, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, LAURA DANIEL-DAVIS, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, CATHERINE MARZIN, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M. RAIMONDO, SCOTT A. SPELLMON, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Hajek, Luther)
February 17, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE re #22 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice of Relevant Facts filed by VINEYARD WIND 1 LLC. (Buente, David)
February 17, 2022 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #22 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice of Relevant Facts filed by JOHN A. ATILANO, II, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, LAURA DANIEL-DAVIS, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, CATHERINE MARZIN, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M. RAIMONDO, SCOTT A. SPELLMON, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Rosen, Perry)
February 11, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice of Relevant Facts by HERITAGE FISHERIES, INC., LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOC., INC., NAT. W., INC., OLD SQUAW FISHERIES, INC., SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC., XIII NORTHEAST FISHERY SECTOR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hadzi-Antich, Theodore)
February 7, 2022 Filing 21 REPLY to opposition to motion re #16 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts filed by JOHN A. ATILANO, II, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, LAURA DANIEL-DAVIS, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, CATHERINE MARZIN, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M. RAIMONDO, SCOTT A. SPELLMON, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration.Jacek, #2 Affidavit Declaration.Harrison, #3 Affidavit Declaration.Pentonry, #4 Affidavit Declaration.Bennett)(Rosen, Perry)
February 2, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Arthur Brown, Sr on behalf of All Defendants (Brown, Mark)
January 31, 2022 Filing 19 Memorandum in opposition to re #16 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts filed by HERITAGE FISHERIES, INC., LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOC., INC., NAT. W., INC., OLD SQUAW FISHERIES, INC., SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC., XIII NORTHEAST FISHERY SECTOR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Hadzi-Antich, Theodore)
January 25, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Luther L. Hajek on behalf of All Defendants (Hajek, Luther)
January 19, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by VINEYARD WIND 1 LLC.(znmw)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #6 Vineyard Wind 1 LLCs Motion to Intervene and memorandum in support thereof, and noting no opposition to the motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/19/2022. (lccrc1)
January 18, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts by JOHN A. ATILANO, II, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, LAURA DANIEL-DAVIS, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, CATHERINE MARZIN, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M. RAIMONDO, SCOTT A. SPELLMON, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Points and Authorities, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Record of Decision, #4 Exhibit Complaint in Allco v. U.S., #5 Exhibit Complaint in Ack Residents v. U.S., #6 Exhibit Scheduling Order in Allco v. U.S., #7 Exhibit Scheduling Order in Ack Residents v. U.S.)(Rosen, Perry)
January 13, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Connor William Mighell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mighell, Connor)
January 12, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Henneke on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Henneke, Robert)
December 29, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #6 Motion to Intervene; emailed to dbuente@sidley.com, cc'd 10 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. FYI, in future, memorandum in support, declarations and exhibits should all be attached to the motion docket entry, rather than filed separately. Do not refile. (znmw, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T. Zaleski on behalf of Vineyard Wind 1 LLC (Zaleski, Joseph)
December 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Christopher Whitfield on behalf of Vineyard Wind 1 LLC (Whitfield, Peter)
December 28, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Buente on behalf of Vineyard Wind 1 LLC (Buente, David)
December 28, 2021 Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Vineyard Wind 1 LLC (Buente, David)
December 28, 2021 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Klaus Skoust Moeller in Support of Motion to Intervene by Vineyard Wind 1 LLC re #6 MOTION to Intervene filed by Vineyard Wind 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Declaration of Klaus Skoust Moeller)(Buente, David)
December 28, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Rachel Pachter in Support of Motion to Intervene by Vineyard Wind 1 LLC re #6 MOTION to Intervene filed by Vineyard Wind 1 LLC. (Buente, David)
December 28, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM re #6 MOTION to Intervene filed by Vineyard Wind 1 LLC by Vineyard Wind 1 LLC. (Buente, David)
December 28, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Intervene by Vineyard Wind 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Buente, David)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (15) Issued Electronically as to JOHN A. ATILANO, II, LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III, BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, LAURA DANIEL-DAVIS, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, CATHERINE MARZIN, NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, GINA M. RAIMONDO, SCOTT A. SPELLMON, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, and U.S. Attorney (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Perry M. Rosen on behalf of All Defendants (Rosen, Perry)
December 20, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-11390. (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HERITAGE FISHERIES, INC., LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOC., INC., NAT. W., INC., OLD SQUAW FISHERIES, INC., SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC., XIII NORTHEAST FISHERY SECTOR, INC. (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8930149) filed by LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOC., INC., SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC., OLD SQUAW FISHERIES, INC., XIII NORTHEAST FISHERY SECTOR, INC., HERITAGE FISHERIES, INC., NAT. W., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Hadzi-Antich, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAFREEZE SHORESIDE, INC.
Represented By: Connor William Mighell
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Represented By: Theodore Hadzi-Antich
Represented By: Ira H. Zaleznik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONG ISLAND COMMERCIAL FISHING ASSOC., INC.
Represented By: Connor William Mighell
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Represented By: Theodore Hadzi-Antich
Represented By: Ira H. Zaleznik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XIII NORTHEAST FISHERY SECTOR, INC.
Represented By: Connor William Mighell
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Represented By: Theodore Hadzi-Antich
Represented By: Ira H. Zaleznik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERITAGE FISHERIES, INC.
Represented By: Connor William Mighell
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Represented By: Theodore Hadzi-Antich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAT. W., INC.
Represented By: Connor William Mighell
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Represented By: Theodore Hadzi-Antich
Represented By: Ira H. Zaleznik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLD SQUAW FISHERIES, INC.
Represented By: Connor William Mighell
Represented By: Robert Henneke
Represented By: Theodore Hadzi-Antich
Represented By: Ira H. Zaleznik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEB HAALAND
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA LEFTON
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA DANIEL-DAVIS
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Commerce
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GINA M. RAIMONDO
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHERINE MARZIN
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOYD J. AUSTIN, III
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT A. SPELLMON
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN A. ATILANO, II
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Vineyard Wind 1 LLC
Represented By: David T. Buente
Represented By: Joseph T. Zaleski
Represented By: Peter Christopher Whitfield
Represented By: Jack W. Pirozzolo
Represented By: James Wedeking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?