RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Plaintiff: RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior, DEB HAALAND, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, AMANDA LEFTON, National Marine Fisheries Service, RICHARD W. SPINRAD, United States Department of the Army, CHRISTINE WORMUTH, United States Army Corps of Engineers and JAMIE A. PINKHAM
Intervenor Defendant: Vineyard Wind 1 LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv11172
Filed: July 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Filing 45 Opposition re #43 MOTION to Strike #27 SSA Administrative Record, #17 SSA Administrative Record,, #23 SSA Administrative Record, #24 SSA Administrative Record, and Supplement Administrative Record filed by Vineyard Wind 1 LLC. (Pirozzolo, Jack)
September 16, 2022 Filing 44 Opposition re #43 MOTION to Strike #27 SSA Administrative Record, #17 SSA Administrative Record,, #23 SSA Administrative Record, #24 SSA Administrative Record, and Supplement Administrative Record filed by Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, National Marine Fisheries Service, JAMIE A. PINKHAM, RICHARD W. SPINRAD, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Interior, CHRISTINE WORMUTH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint ROD (Partial), #2 Exhibit FEIS Vol. 1 (Partial), #3 Exhibit Corps Aug. 2021 Supplement, #4 Exhibit Corps Jan. 2022 Supplement, #5 Exhibit COP for Permit Application (Partial), #6 Exhibit Conditions of Construction (Partial))(Rosen, Perry)
September 2, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION to Strike #27 SSA Administrative Record, #17 SSA Administrative Record,, #23 SSA Administrative Record, #24 SSA Administrative Record, and Supplement Administrative Record by RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Documents From and Supplement the Administrative Record, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Marzulla, Roger)
August 30, 2022 Filing 42 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER. Please see attached. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-11091-IT, 1:22-cv-11172-IT (Kelly, Danielle)
August 17, 2022 Filing 41 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Scheduling Conference held on 8/17/2022. (Both 1:22-cv-11091-IT and 1:22-cv-11172 were heard.) Case called. Court had colloquy with counsel. Cases are not consolidated but if documents are filed that are identical, both case captions shall be listed. Any distinctions/differences shall be noted. Court advised counsel on filing procedures and the separate filing of Rule 56.1 statements of undisputed material facts. (In 1:21-cv-11390-IT, the statement will be ordered to be filed.) A hearing on summary judgment motions to be set once briefing is completed. The motion as to page limits denied without prejudice and will be renewed brief by brief. Proposed schedule adopted in both cases: a. Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment, statement of facts, and brief in support of motion: November 1, 2022; b. Federal Defendants opposition and cross-motion, statement of facts, and brief in opposition and in support of cross-motion: December 13, 2022; c. Defendant-Intervenors opposition and cross-motion, statement of facts, and brief in opposition and in support of cross-motion: December 20, 2022; d. Plaintiffs' brief in opposition and reply: January 24, 2023; e. Federal Defendants' reply: February 28, 2023; and, f. Defendant-Intervenor's reply: March 7, 2023. Counsel shall endeavor to jointly file a single consolidated statement of facts no later than December 20, 2022. (Court Reporter: Robert Paschal at rwp.reporter@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Theodore Hadzi-Antich, Mark Brown, Luther L. Hajek, Connor William Mighell, Perry M. Rosen,David T. Buente, Jack W. Pirozzolo, Ira H. Zaleznik, Roger J. Marzulla, Angela Ellis) Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-11091-IT, 1:22-cv-11172-IT(MacDonald, Gail)
August 5, 2022 Filing 40 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, National Marine Fisheries Service, JAMIE A. PINKHAM, RICHARD W. SPINRAD, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Interior, CHRISTINE WORMUTH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Mark)
August 1, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Brown on behalf of Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, National Marine Fisheries Service, JAMIE A. PINKHAM, RICHARD W. SPINRAD, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Department of the Army, United States Department of the Interior, CHRISTINE WORMUTH (Brown, Mark)
July 28, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger J. Marzulla on behalf of RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE (Marzulla, Roger)
July 28, 2022 Filing 37 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Roger J. Marzulla. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 27, 2022 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Roger J. Marzulla Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9430255 by RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Roger J. Marzulla)(Zaleznik, Ira)
July 26, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by James Wedeking on behalf of Vineyard Wind 1 LLC (Wedeking, James)
July 22, 2022 Filing 34 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James R. Wedeking. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 22, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James R. Wedeking Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9423796 by Vineyard Wind 1 LLC.(Pirozzolo, Jack) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2022: #1 Exhibit A) (Kelly, Danielle). (Main Document 33 replaced on 7/22/2022 - removed exhibit to properly file as attachment) (Kelly, Danielle).
July 22, 2022 Filing 32 SEE ATTACHED NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (Remote only) before Judge Indira Talwani. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(MacDonald, Gail) Modified on 7/22/2022 (MacDonald, Gail).
July 22, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack W. Pirozzolo on behalf of Vineyard Wind 1 LLC (Pirozzolo, Jack)
July 20, 2022 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
July 20, 2022 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:22-cv-00237.
July 7, 2022 Filing 28 Case transferred to the USDC for the District of Massachusetts pursuant to #25 Order on Motion to Intervene,, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases,, Order on Motion to Transfer Case, Sent to Court via extraction. (zjm)
July 1, 2022 Filing 27 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Federal Defendants' Notice of Filing Certified BOEM Administrative Record Addendum) by BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1-Certification, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2-Addendum)(Brown, Mark)
June 27, 2022 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint #1 by VINEYARD WIND 1 LLC.(zjm)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #5 Motion to Intervene by Vineyard Wind LLC; granting Defendants' #10 Motion to Transfer the Case to the District of Massachusetts; and denying #8 Motion to Consolidate Cases without prejudice to refiling the motion in the transferee district. See full Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/27/2022. (lccrc1)
June 13, 2022 Filing 24 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Federal Defendants' Notice of Filing Certified Index to NMFS Administrative Record Second Addendum) by NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, RICHARD W. SPINRAD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Certified Index to NMFS Administrative Record Second Addendum)(Brown, Mark)
May 19, 2022 Filing 23 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Federal Defendants' Notice of Filing Certified Index to NMFS Administrative Record Addendum) by NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, RICHARD W. SPINRAD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Certified Index to NMFS Administrative Record Addendum)(Brown, Mark)
April 19, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Luther L. Hajek on behalf of All Defendants (Hajek, Luther)
April 18, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, JAMIE A. PINKHAM, RICHARD W. SPINRAD, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, CHRISTINE WORMUTH.(Ellis, Angela)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/18/2022. (lccrc2)
April 14, 2022 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Limited Protective Order) by BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, JAMIE A. PINKHAM, RICHARD W. SPINRAD, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, CHRISTINE WORMUTH. (Brown, Mark)
April 14, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION (Stipulated Limited Protective Order) by BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, JAMIE A. PINKHAM, RICHARD W. SPINRAD, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, CHRISTINE WORMUTH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Acknowledgment and Agreement to be Bound by Protective Order)(Brown, Mark)
April 11, 2022 Filing 17 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Federal Defendants' Notice of Filing Certified Indices to Administrative Records) by BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, JAMIE A. PINKHAM, RICHARD W. SPINRAD, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, CHRISTINE WORMUTH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1-Certified Index to BOEM Administrative Record, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2-Certified Index to NMFS Administrative Record, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3-Certified Index to USACE Administrative Record)(Brown, Mark)
March 3, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY to opposition to motion re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts filed by BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, JAMIE A. PINKHAM, RICHARD W. SPINRAD, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Massachusetts Amicus Brief)(Rosen, Perry)
February 28, 2022 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT served on 2/10/2022; DEB HAALAND served on 2/11/2022; AMANDA LEFTON served on 2/11/2022; NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE served on 2/10/2022; JAMIE A. PINKHAM served on 2/7/2022; RICHARD W. SPINRAD served on 2/10/2022; UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS served on 2/11/2022; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY served on 2/17/2022; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 2/11/2022; CHRISTINE WORMUTH served on 2/14/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Marzulla, Nancie)
February 28, 2022 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/16/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Marzulla, Nancie)
February 28, 2022 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Marzulla, Nancie)
February 25, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE. (Marzulla, Nancie)
February 25, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts filed by RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Marzulla, Nancie)
February 18, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts by BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, JAMIE A. PINKHAM, RICHARD W. SPINRAD, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, CHRISTINE WORMUTH. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Jacek Declaration, #4 Affidavit Harrison Declaration, #5 Affidavit Pentony Declaration, #6 Exhibit Allco Complaint, #7 Exhibit Ack Residents Complaint, #8 Exhibit Allco Scheduling Order, #9 Exhibit Ack Residents Scheduling Order, #10 Exhibit Pet. for Review in 1st Circuit, #11 Exhibit Motion to Stay 1st Circuit Action, #12 Exhibit Status Report in 1st Circuit, #13 Affidavit Bennett Declaration)(Rosen, Perry)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby sets the following expedited briefing schedule for Defendants' #10 Motion to Transfer: plaintiffs shall file their response by 2/25/2022; defendants shall file their reply by 3/4/2022. SO ORDERED by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/18/2022. (lccrc1)
February 17, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #8 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, JAMIE A. PINKHAM, RICHARD W. SPINRAD, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, CHRISTINE WORMUTH. (Rosen, Perry)
February 15, 2022 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marzulla, Nancie)
February 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Perry M. Rosen on behalf of All Defendants (Rosen, Perry)
February 11, 2022 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VINEYARD WIND 1 LLC (Buente, David)
February 11, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene by VINEYARD WIND 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Moeller in Support, #3 Declaration of Pachter in Support, #4 Proposed Answer, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Buente, David)
February 3, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS (12) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(rj)
February 1, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb)
January 31, 2022 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE (Marzulla, Nancie)
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE. Case related to Case No. 21-3276. (Marzulla, Nancie)
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9013212) filed by RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Marzulla, Nancie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE
Represented By: Nancie G. Marzulla
Represented By: Ira H. Zaleznik
Represented By: Roger J. Marzulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Angela Ellis
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEB HAALAND
Represented By: Angela Ellis
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Represented By: Angela Ellis
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA LEFTON
Represented By: Angela Ellis
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Angela Ellis
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD W. SPINRAD
Represented By: Angela Ellis
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Army
Represented By: Angela Ellis
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE WORMUTH
Represented By: Angela Ellis
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Angela Ellis
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIE A. PINKHAM
Represented By: Angela Ellis
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Represented By: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Vineyard Wind 1 LLC
Represented By: David T. Buente
Represented By: Jack W. Pirozzolo
Represented By: James Wedeking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?