Babcock v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: Josie Giosefina Babcock
Defendant: Steve Anderson, Steve Pecor, Steve Peron and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 1:2022cv11191
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Filing 17 CLERK SENT TO PLAINTIFF ON 9/15/2022 BY CERTIFIED MAIL NO: 7012 3050 0000 7256 4066: (3) SUMMONS FOR DEFENDANTS AND DOCKET SHEET TO THE ADDRESS ON RECORD: Josie Giosefina Babcock, 397 Crescent Street Waltham MA 02453. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
September 15, 2022 Filing 16 Summons Reissued as to Steve Peron. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
August 25, 2022 Filing 15 Copy re #13 Order on Motion, Order on Motion to Seal, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion to Amend, #14 Summons Issued, and Docket Sheet, MAILED TO: Josie Giosefina Babcock, 397 Crescent Street Waltham MA 02453 on 8/25/2022. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
August 25, 2022 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Steve Anderson, Steve Pecor, United States Postal Service. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
August 25, 2022 Filing 13 Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying Motions #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 and granting Motion #12 to Amend to add United States Postal Service. The Clerk shall add the United States Postal Service as a defendant and issue summonses for service of the complaint (#1) and motion to add (#12) on Steve Anderson, Steve Peron, the U.S. Attorney for the D. Mass, the U.S. Attorney General and the U.S. Postal Service. Plaintiff shall have 90 days form the date summonses issue to serve the defendants. Failure to timely serve will subject this action to dismissal. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). See Memo & Order for details. (PSSA, 4)
August 19, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Add (Amend) by Josie Giosefina Babcock.(McManus, Caetlin)
August 19, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Josie Giosefina Babcock. (McManus, Caetlin)
August 19, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Seal Case by Josie Giosefina Babcock.(McManus, Caetlin)
August 19, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION (misc., financial information) by Josie Giosefina Babcock.(McManus, Caetlin)
August 19, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION (misc.) by Josie Giosefina Babcock.(McManus, Caetlin)
August 19, 2022 Filing 7 Filing fee/payment: $ 402.00, receipt number 1BST090792 for #1 Complaint (Phillips, Sophie)
August 9, 2022 Filing 6 Copy re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Mailed to Josie Giosefina Babcock 397 Crescent Street Waltham, MA 02453 on 8/9/2022. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
August 2, 2022 Filing 5 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. If plaintiff wishes to pursue this action, she shall, within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, either (1) pay the $402 filing fee or (2) file a new, fully completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. If plaintiff fails to pay the filing fee or submit a new application, this action will be dismissed without prejudice. (PSSA, 4)
July 22, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Josie Giosefina Babcock.(Castilla, Francis)
July 22, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Josie Giosefina Babcock.(Castilla, Francis)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Josie Giosefina Babcock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Babcock v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josie Giosefina Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Pecor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Peron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?