ANRION CORP. et al v. IVANOVA et al
Plaintiff: Anrion Corp. and Andrei Mann
Defendant: Tatiana Ivanova, Nathalie Roicomte-Cavallari and Sci Maniv
Case Number: 1:2022cv11272
Filed: August 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Andrei Mann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lambert, George)
September 1, 2022 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time until 9/14/22. (Zierk, Marsha)
September 1, 2022 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/14/2022 to filing response to motion to dismiss by Anrion Corp..(Lambert, George)
August 30, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence J. Casey on behalf of Tatiana Ivanova (Casey, Lawrence)
August 19, 2022 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Tatiana Ivanova. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit May 23, 2018 Agreement, #2 Exhibit Employment Agreement)(Kaitz, Robert)
August 19, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Tatiana Ivanova.(Kaitz, Robert)
August 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Kaitz on behalf of Tatiana Ivanova (Kaitz, Robert)
August 8, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tatiana Ivanova, Nathalie Roicomte-Cavallari, Sci Maniv. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dore, Samantha)
August 8, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
August 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9445096 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by ANRION CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Category sheet)(Lambert, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANRION CORP. et al v. IVANOVA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anrion Corp.
Represented By: George Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrei Mann
Represented By: George Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatiana Ivanova
Represented By: Lawrence J. Casey
Represented By: Robert M. Kaitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathalie Roicomte-Cavallari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sci Maniv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?