Dulong et al v. Spruce Lending, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paul Dulong and Linda Dulong
Defendant: Spruce Lending, Inc., NRG Residential Solar Solutions, LLC (formerly NRG Suncap LLC), Spruce Power Lending, Inc. and NRG Residential Solar Solutions, LLC formerly doing business as NRG Suncap LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv11345
Filed: August 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Filing 20 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 3, 2022 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE CANCELLING HEARING : SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND MOTION HEARING SET FOR 10/25/2022 03:00 PM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
September 29, 2022 Filing 19 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. " ALLOWED WITHOUT OPPOSITION." (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
September 16, 2022 Filing 17 STATE COURT Record. (Matthews, Michael)
September 12, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane S Wizig on behalf of NRG Residential Solar Solutions, LLC (Wizig, Diane)
September 12, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D Matthews, Jr on behalf of NRG Residential Solar Solutions, LLC (Matthews, Michael)
September 12, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Villarreal on behalf of NRG Residential Solar Solutions, LLC (Villarreal, David)
September 9, 2022 Filing 13 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael D. Matthews, Diane S. Wizig and David L. Villarreal. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
September 8, 2022 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael D. Matthews, Diane S. Wizig and David L. Villarreal Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number AMADC-9487108 by NRG Residential Solar Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate in Support of Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Matthews, #2 Exhibit Certificate in Support of Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice Diane Wizig, #3 Exhibit Certificate in Support of Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice David Villarreal)(Hansen, David)
September 8, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY VIDEO: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/25/2022 03:30 PM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
September 6, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM :MOTION HEARING SET FOR 10/25/2022 03:00 PM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted by VIDEO CONFERENCE. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
August 26, 2022 Filing 9 EXHIBIT 2 by NRG Residential Solar Solutions, LLC (formerly NRG Suncap LLC). (Koutrobis, Christos)
August 26, 2022 Filing 8 APPENDIX/EXHIBIT 1 by NRG Residential Solar Solutions, LLC (formerly NRG Suncap LLC). (Koutrobis, Christos)
August 26, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NRG Residential Solar Solutions, LLC (formerly NRG Suncap LLC). (Koutrobis, Christos)
August 26, 2022 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by NRG Residential Solar Solutions, LLC (formerly NRG Suncap LLC). (Koutrobis, Christos)
August 26, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by NRG Residential Solar Solutions, LLC (formerly NRG Suncap LLC).(Koutrobis, Christos)
August 26, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christos Koutrobis on behalf of NRG Residential Solar Solutions, LLC (formerly NRG Suncap LLC) (Koutrobis, Christos)
August 22, 2022 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 22, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
August 19, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NRG Residential Solar Solutions, LLC (formerly NRG Suncap LLC) ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9461804 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Hansen, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dulong et al v. Spruce Lending, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dulong
Represented By: Dara J. Sandau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Dulong
Represented By: Dara J. Sandau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spruce Lending, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRG Residential Solar Solutions, LLC (formerly NRG Suncap LLC)
Represented By: David L. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spruce Power Lending, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRG Residential Solar Solutions, LLC formerly doing business as NRG Suncap LLC
Represented By: David L. Hansen
Represented By: Michael D Matthews, Jr
Represented By: Christos Koutrobis
Represented By: David L. Villarreal
Represented By: Diane S Wizig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?