Windover Construction, Inc. v. Selective Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Windover Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of America and Merchants Insurance Group
Cross Claimant: Cosan Construction Corp.
Cross Defendant: ICI Flooring, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv11365
Filed: August 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2022 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Windover Construction, Inc.. (Bourbeau, Sheryl)
October 21, 2022 Filing 40 Opposition re #16 MOTION to Stay this action pending a decision by the New Jersey Federal Court of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Windover Construction, Inc.. (Bourbeau, Sheryl)
October 21, 2022 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss , #11 MOTION to Dismiss , #17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Windover Construction, Inc.. (Bourbeau, Sheryl)
October 21, 2022 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Windover Construction, Inc.. (Bourbeau, Sheryl)
October 21, 2022 Filing 37 Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Windover Construction, Inc.. (Bourbeau, Sheryl)
October 21, 2022 Filing 36 Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Windover Construction, Inc.. (Bourbeau, Sheryl)
October 21, 2022 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #33 Opposition to Motion, #34 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss of Merchants. (Bourbeau, Sheryl)
October 21, 2022 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Merchants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Windover Construction, Inc.. (Bourbeau, Sheryl)
October 21, 2022 Filing 33 Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Merchants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Windover Construction, Inc.. (Bourbeau, Sheryl)
October 21, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Selective Insurance Company of America.(Hensley, Candace)
October 12, 2022 Filing 31 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time until October 21, 2022, for Windover to file an opposition or response to each of the motions filed by Defendants Merchants Mutual Insurance Company (incorrectly named as Merchants Insurance Group), ICI Flooring, Selective Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (incorrectly named as Selective Insurance Company of America), and Cosan Construction Corp. (Zierk, Marsha)
October 12, 2022 Filing 30 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/21/2022 to File Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Stay by Windover Construction, Inc..(Bourbeau, Sheryl)
October 3, 2022 Filing 29 Supplemental MOTION to Stay re #16 MOTION to Stay this action pending a decision by the New Jersey Federal Court of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration by ICI Flooring, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-Return of Service)(Dwyer, Paul)
September 29, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Boivin on behalf of ICI Flooring, Inc. (Boivin, Mark)
September 29, 2022 Filing 27 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time until October 13, 2020 to oppose Merchants Mutual Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss; Defendant Selective Insurance Company of America's Motion to Dismiss; Defendant ICI Flooring, Inc.s Motion to Stay this Action Pending a Decision by the New Jersey Federal Court on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration; and Defendant ICI Flooring, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. (Zierk, Marsha)
September 28, 2022 Filing 26 Withdrawal of motion: #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/13/22 to To file Response to Motions filed by Windover Construction, Inc... (Bourbeau, Sheryl)
September 28, 2022 Filing 25 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 13, 2022 to File Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Stay by Windover Construction, Inc..(Bourbeau, Sheryl)
September 28, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/13/22 to To file Response to Motions by Windover Construction, Inc..(Schor, Paul)
September 26, 2022 Filing 23 Document disclosure by Windover Construction, Inc..(Schor, Paul)
September 23, 2022 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ICI Flooring, Inc.. (Dwyer, Paul)
September 16, 2022 Filing 21 Defendant Cosan Construction Corp. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against ICI Flooring, Inc. by Cosan Construction Corp..(Mook, Darrell)
September 15, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Hensley, Candace)
September 15, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Shari Campbell, #2 Exhibit Exs. 1-3 to Declaration of Shari Campbell)(Hensley, Candace)
September 15, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by ICI Flooring, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dwyer, Paul)
September 15, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by ICI Flooring, Inc..(Dwyer, Paul)
September 15, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay this action pending a decision by the New Jersey Federal Court of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration by ICI Flooring, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dwyer, Paul)
September 15, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of ICI Flooring, Inc. (Dwyer, Paul)
September 15, 2022 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merchants Insurance Group identifying Corporate Parent Merchant's Insurance Group for Merchants Insurance Group.. (O'Donnell, Barbara)
September 15, 2022 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss , #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(O'Donnell, Barbara)
September 15, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Merchants Insurance Group. (O'Donnell, Barbara)
September 15, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Merchants Insurance Group.(O'Donnell, Barbara)
September 1, 2022 Filing 10 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 ASSENTED-to Motion for Extension of Time until September 15, 2022. Defendants assert that Cosan Construction Corp., ICI Flooring, and Merchants Mutual Insurance Company are incorrectly named as Merchants Insurance Group and Selective Insurance Company of America. After initial disclosures, the court will expect the parties to be properly named. (Zierk, Marsha)
August 31, 2022 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (Currie, Haley)
August 31, 2022 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 15, 2022 to Respond to the complaint by Selective Insurance Company of America.(Hensley, Candace)
August 29, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara A. O'Donnell on behalf of Merchants Insurance Group (O'Donnell, Barbara)
August 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph K. Scully on behalf of Selective Insurance Company of America (Scully, Joseph)
August 26, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Selective Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Selective Insurance Company of America.. (Hensley, Candace)
August 25, 2022 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 25, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
August 25, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Candace J. Hensley on behalf of Selective Insurance Company of America (Hensley, Candace)
August 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Selective Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9468794 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form)(Hensley, Candace)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windover Construction, Inc. v. Selective Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windover Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Sheryl M. Bourbeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Candace J. Hensley
Represented By: Joseph K. Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchants Insurance Group
Represented By: Barbara A. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Cosan Construction Corp.
Represented By: Darrell Mook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: ICI Flooring, Inc.
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?