ModernaTX, Inc. et al v. Pfizer Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: ModernaTX, Inc. and Moderna US, Inc.
Defendant: Pfizer Inc., BioNTech SE, BioNTech Manufacturing GmbH and BioNTech US Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv11378
Filed: August 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2022 Filing 22 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 18 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint until December 5, 2022. (Zierk, Marsha)
September 9, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Wyley S. Proctor on behalf of Pfizer Inc. (Proctor, Wyley)
September 9, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik Paul Belt on behalf of Pfizer Inc. (Belt, Erik)
September 9, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee C. Bromberg on behalf of Pfizer Inc. (Bromberg, Lee)
September 9, 2022 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/05/2022 to To extend response date to the complaint for defendants Pfizer Inc. and BioNTech US Inc. by BioNTech Manufacturing GmbH, BioNTech SE, BioNTech US Inc..(Robbins, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/12/2022: Corrected event type (Kelly, Danielle).
September 9, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M. Boucher on behalf of BioNTech Manufacturing GmbH, BioNTech SE, BioNTech US Inc. (Boucher, Gregory)
September 9, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ModernaTX, Inc., Moderna US, Inc.. BioNTech SE waiver sent on 9/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Lee, William)
September 9, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ModernaTX, Inc., Moderna US, Inc.. (Lee, William)
September 9, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ModernaTX, Inc., Moderna US, Inc.. BioNTech Manufacturing GmbH waiver sent on 9/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Lee, William)
September 9, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed BioNTech US Inc. served on 8/29/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (Lee, William)
September 9, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Lipchitz on behalf of BioNTech Manufacturing GmbH, BioNTech SE, BioNTech US Inc. (Lipchitz, Joseph)
September 9, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Robbins on behalf of BioNTech Manufacturing GmbH, BioNTech SE, BioNTech US Inc. (Robbins, Jeffrey)
September 2, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Pfizer Inc. served on 8/29/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (Lee, William)
August 26, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily R. Whelan on behalf of Moderna US, Inc., ModernaTX, Inc. (Whelan, Emily)
August 26, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to BioNTech Manufacturing GmbH, BioNTech SE, BioNTech US Inc., Pfizer Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
August 26, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Finn, Mary)
August 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy K. Wigmore on behalf of Moderna US, Inc., ModernaTX, Inc. (Wigmore, Amy)
August 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Danford on behalf of Moderna US, Inc., ModernaTX, Inc. (Danford, Andrew)
August 26, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin S. Prussia on behalf of Moderna US, Inc., ModernaTX, Inc. (Prussia, Kevin)
August 26, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Lee, William)
August 26, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Moderna US, Inc., ModernaTX, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Moderna, Inc. for Moderna US, Inc., ModernaTX, Inc... (Lee, William)
August 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BioNTech US Inc., BioNTech SE, Pfizer Inc., BioNTech Manufacturing GmbH Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9469742 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Moderna US, Inc., ModernaTX, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Category Form)(Lee, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ModernaTX, Inc. et al v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ModernaTX, Inc.
Represented By: Amy K. Wigmore
Represented By: Andrew J. Danford
Represented By: Emily R. Whelan
Represented By: Kevin S. Prussia
Represented By: William F. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moderna US, Inc.
Represented By: Amy K. Wigmore
Represented By: Andrew J. Danford
Represented By: Emily R. Whelan
Represented By: Kevin S. Prussia
Represented By: William F. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BioNTech SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BioNTech Manufacturing GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BioNTech US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?