BSI 254 Westfield LLC et al v. Fiorillo
Plaintiff: BSI 254 Westfield LLC and BSI 254 Westfield Member, LLC
Defendant: Nicholas J. Fiorillo
Case Number: 1:2022cv11394
Filed: August 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2022 Filing 25 USCA Case Number 22-1820 for #22 Notice of Appeal, filed by Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Paine, Matthew)
October 25, 2022 Filing 24 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #22 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
October 24, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by Nicholas J. Fiorillo.(Currie, Haley)
October 24, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 19 Order on Motion to Remand,,, by Nicholas J. Fiorillo NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 11/14/2022. (Currie, Haley)
October 17, 2022 Filing 21 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to the State Court(Currie, Haley)
October 17, 2022 Filing 20 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re D. #10 Motion to Consolidate Cases, #15 Motion for leave to electronically file Pro Se, #16 Motion for leave to electronically file Pro Se - In light of the Court's ruling on the motion for remand, these motions are DENIED as moot. (Currie, Haley)
October 17, 2022 Filing 19 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re D. #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand - Having considered the motion for remand, D. 5-6, and the opposition to same, D. 11, the Court ALLOWS the motion for remand. First, the removal was untimely under 28 U.S.C. 1446 where it was removed on August 29, 2022, D. 1, but the underlying complaint was filed on March 28, 2022, D. 1-1, and he was served on April 20, 2022. D. 5-1 at 16. Even assuming arguendo that it was timely, there is no appropriate basis to remove this case under 28 U.S.C. 1443, even considering not just the notice of removal, D. 1, but the substance of Plaintiff's opposition to removal, D. 11. See Nickerson-Malpher v. Wells-Fargo Bank, N.A., No. 10-11033-JLT, 2010 WL 3069950, at *3 (D. Mass. Aug. 3, 2010); Mackey v. Massachusetts, 582 F. Supp. 3d 1, 4 (D. Mass. 2022). This matter shall be remanded to state court forthwith. (Currie, Haley)
October 14, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel filed by Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Currie, Haley)
October 14, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiff's Counsel by Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(Currie, Haley)
October 11, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave for Pro Se Litigant to File Pleadings and Documents Electronically by Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(Currie, Haley)
October 6, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Dore, Samantha)
October 4, 2022 Filing 14 EXHIBITS A-E by Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Currie, Haley)
October 4, 2022 Filing 13 Letter - Motions to be Considered by Appeals Court from Nicholas Fiorillo. (Currie, Haley)
October 4, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #11 Opposition to Motion. (Currie, Haley)
October 4, 2022 Filing 11 Opposition re #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Nicholas J. Fiorillo. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(Currie, Haley)
October 4, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Authorities to Support by Nicholas J. Fiorillo.(Currie, Haley)
September 12, 2022 Filing 9 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re: #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Having considered Defendant's motion for extension to remand motion, D. 7, and Plaintiffs' opposition to same, D. 8, the Court ALLOWS the extension until September 30, 2022, but does not anticipate further extension. Whether Plaintiff secures counsel or remains pro se, his opposition to the remand motion will be due on September 30, 2022. (Hourihan, Lisa)
September 1, 2022 Filing 8 Opposition re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/30/2022 to File Answer filed by BSI 254 Westfield LLC, BSI 254 Westfield Member, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Welnicki, Matthew)
August 31, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/30/2022 to File Answer by Nicholas J. Fiorillo.(Kreuzer, Neil)
August 30, 2022 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by BSI 254 Westfield LLC, BSI 254 Westfield Member, LLC. (Welnicki, Matthew)
August 30, 2022 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION to Remand by BSI 254 Westfield LLC, BSI 254 Westfield Member, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Welnicki, Matthew)
August 29, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
August 29, 2022 Filing 3 MISSING LOCAL CATEGORY FORM & CIVIL COVER SHEET ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format both a Local Category Form & a Civil Cover Sheet. Both forms can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/resources/forms-local.htm (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
August 29, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Complaint removed from the docket sheet and refund issued in re AMADC-9471828. (Danieli, Chris)
August 29, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nicholas J. Fiorillo ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9471986 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 state filings, p1-64, #2 state filings, p65-115, #3 state filings, p116-160, #4 state filings, p.161-)(Kreuzer, Neil).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BSI 254 Westfield LLC et al v. Fiorillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BSI 254 Westfield LLC
Represented By: Matthew C. Welnicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BSI 254 Westfield Member, LLC
Represented By: Matthew C. Welnicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas J. Fiorillo
Represented By: Neil Kreuzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?