Gillis, et al. v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, et al.
Plaintiff: Robert J Gillis
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, as Successor by Merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Alfa Laval Inc., Ametek, Inc., individually and as successor to Schutte & Koerting, Foster Wheeler, LLC, survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corporation, Aurora Pump Company, Boston Properties, Inc., Trustees Boston University, Burnham LLC, Cameron International Corporation, f/k/a Cooper Cameron Corporation, Cla-val Co., Clifton Associates, Inc., f/k/a Johnson Asbestos Corporation, DCo LLC, f/k/a Dana Companies, LLC, Electrolux Home Products, Inc., individually and as successor to Copes Vulcan, Elliott Company, Emerson-Swan, Inc., FMC Corporation, on behalf of its former Chicago Pump, Peerless Pump and Northern Pump Businesses, GSK Consumer Health, Inc., HP Hood, individually and as successor-in-interest to Brigham's Ice Cream Inc., Joy Global Underground Mining, LLC f/k/a Joy Technologies LLC, Mass General Brigham Incorporated, individually and as successor-in-interest to The Massachusetts General Hospital, Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharpe & Dohme LLC, Paramount Global, f/k/a ViacomCBS, Inc., f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electr, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, successor to Denison Hydraulics Inc. f/k/a Denison Engineering, Robertshaw Controls Company, individually and as successor-in-interest to Fulton Sylphon Company, The William Powell Company, University of Massachusetts, Union Carbide Corporation, Valves and Controls US, Inc., f/k/a Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, Wilo USA LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest to Weil Pump Company, Inc., York International Corporation, DCO LLC, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Valves and Controls US, Inc., Ametek, Inc., Foster Wheeler, LLC, Boston University, Cooper Cameron Corporation, Johnson Asbestos Corporation, Dana Companies, LLC.,, HP Hood, Joy Technologies LLC, ViacomCBS Inc., a CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Denison Engineering, Robertshaw Controls Company, Weir Valves & Controls USA, INC., Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., Wilo USA LLC and PBV Inc
Cross Defendant: Blackmer, BNS Co., Carrier Corporation, Cleaver Brooks, Inc., General Insulation Company, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, IMO Industries, Inc., Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Massachusetts Port Authority, Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center, New England Insulation Company, Redco Corporation, The Marley-Wylain Company, Clifton Associates, Inc., Judith Gillis, Defense Liaison Counsel, Copeland Corporation LLC and Industry Products Co.
Cross Claimant: Crosby Valve, LLC, General Electric Company, Harvard University, John Crane Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Cameron International Corporation, Joy Global Underground Mining LLC, Paramount Global, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Electrolux Home Products, Inc., FMC Corporation and Mass General Brigham Incorporated
Interested Party: Industry Products Company
Not Classified By Court: Judge Donald L Cabell
Case Number: 1:2022cv11733
Filed: October 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Referring Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2023 Filing 392 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey Nicole McCandless on behalf of Robert J Gillis (McCandless, Kelsey)
November 21, 2023 Filing 391 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered re #310 MOTION for Protective Order. Finding such a procedure to be appropriate in this case, PBV's Motion is ALLOWED, and it is hereby ORDERED. (Thomson, Katherine)
November 21, 2023 Filing 390 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #243 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by PBV Inc. Recommendation: For all the reasons detailed herein, this court recommends to the District Judge to whom this case is assigned that "Industry Products Company's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction" (Docket No. 243) be ALLOWED. Objections to R&R due by 12/5/2023. (Thomson, Katherine)
November 15, 2023 Filing 389 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #388 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by The Marley-Wylain Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Primack, David)
November 15, 2023 Filing 388 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support by The Marley-Wylain Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Primack, David)
November 15, 2023 Filing 387 STATEMENT of facts re #385 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(DeLuzio, Maria)
November 15, 2023 Filing 386 MEMORANDUM in Support re #385 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
November 15, 2023 Filing 385 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Warren Pumps LLC.(DeLuzio, Maria)
November 15, 2023 Filing 384 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #382 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Foster Wheeler, LLC(survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41)(Souza, Kristen)
November 15, 2023 Filing 383 MEMORANDUM in Support re #382 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Foster Wheeler, LLC(survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corporation). (Souza, Kristen)
November 15, 2023 Filing 382 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Foster Wheeler, LLC(survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corporation).(Souza, Kristen)
November 15, 2023 Filing 381 STATEMENT of facts re #379 MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of Crosby Valve LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Rooney, John)
November 15, 2023 Filing 380 MEMORANDUM in Support re #379 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Crosby Valve, LLC. (Rooney, John)
November 15, 2023 Filing 379 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Crosby Valve, LLC.(Rooney, John)
November 14, 2023 Filing 378 MEMORANDUM in Support re #377 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cla-val Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-10 to Memo in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Goldman, David)
November 14, 2023 Filing 377 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cla-val Co..(Goldman, David)
November 7, 2023 Filing 376 DESIGNATION OF EXPERTS by Crosby Valve, LLC . (Rooney, John)
November 3, 2023 Filing 375 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Velan Valve Corporation. (Robinson, John)
November 1, 2023 Filing 374 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-I)(Jackson, Susan)
November 1, 2023 Filing 373 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by The Marley-Wylain Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Sargent, #2 Exhibit 2-Taylor, #3 Exhibit 3-Rasmuson, #4 Exhibit 4-Sicilia)(Primack, David)
November 1, 2023 Filing 372 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Foster Wheeler, LLC(survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B-1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B-2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B-3, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B-4, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C-1, #10 Exhibit Exhibit C-2, #11 Exhibit Exhibit C-3, #12 Exhibit Exhibit C-4, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D-1, #14 Exhibit Exhibit D-2, #15 Exhibit Exhibit D-3, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D-4)(Souza, Kristen)
October 27, 2023 Filing 371 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: Motion Hearing held on 10/27/2023 re #243 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by PBV Inc, #310 MOTION for Protective Order filed by PBV Inc; case called; USMJ Dein hears arguments from counsel and takes the motions under advisement. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/Audio.html. For a transcript of this proceeding, contact mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Shepard,Binder and Graham) (Quinn, Thomas)
October 27, 2023 Filing 370 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Hoover on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Hoover, Mark)
October 27, 2023 Filing 369 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Hoover on behalf of Blackmer (Hoover, Mark)
October 17, 2023 Filing 368 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #367 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark G. Zellmer. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McManus, Caetlin)
October 16, 2023 Filing 367 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Attorney Mark G. Zellmer Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10087260 by The Marley-Wylain Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Dwyer, Paul)
October 11, 2023 Filing 366 NOTICE of Appearance by John Fitzpatrick on behalf of Foster Wheeler, LLC (Fitzpatrick, John)
October 11, 2023 Filing 365 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #364 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John Fitzpatrick. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (McManus, Caetlin)
October 10, 2023 Filing 364 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John Fitzpatrick Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10075731 by Foster Wheeler, LLC(survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Attorney Fitzpatrick)(Souza, Kristen)
October 3, 2023 Filing 363 NOTICE by Crosby Valve, LLC re #362 Stipulation of Dismissal Notice of Withdrawal of Dismissal (Pickett, Rene)
October 2, 2023 Filing 362 Withdrawn, see #363 . STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Crosby Valve, LLC. (Pickett, Rene) Modified on 10/3/2023 (McManus, Caetlin).
October 2, 2023 Filing 361 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Valves and Controls US, Inc.. (Pickett, Rene)
September 29, 2023 Filing 360 STATEMENT of facts re #358 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Behalf of Parker-Hannifin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Parker-Hannifin's Motion for Summary Judgement Exhibits, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Susan A. Jackson)(Jackson, Susan)
September 29, 2023 Filing 359 MEMORANDUM in Support re #358 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Jackson, Susan)
September 29, 2023 Filing 358 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Parker-Hannifin Corporation.(Jackson, Susan)
September 29, 2023 Filing 357 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Susan A. Jackson on Behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Jackson, Susan)
September 26, 2023 Filing 356 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 9/26/2023.1:17-cv-11004-DJC Laporte Case -This case has resolved. Sixty Day Settlement Order of Dismissal entered on September 21, 2023. (Entry No. 616).1:19-cv-10282-NMG McIsaac Case -The one remaining defendant is General Electric Company. The case is being returned back from Alternative Dispute Resolution. Parties are discussing a schedule.1:19-cv-11284-ADB Lee Case -2 remaining defendants. Assigned to Trial Group N. Plaintiff has communicated settlement demands to the two remaining defendants. Parties to schedule settlement conference.1:22-cv-10243-FDS Callahan Case -Mr. Callahans depo was completed prior to passing. The complaint has been amended to reflect the passing. The Parties seeking referral to Alternative Dispute Resolution.1:23-cv-10327-LTS King Case -Mr. Kings depo has been concluded. Case is proceeding on the group U deadlines.1:23-cv-10866-FDS Morgan Case -The parties have filed a joint motion to assign group V doc. no. 976 pending. Upon approval a joint motion to transfer the case to trial group v will be filed.1:20-cv-10964-DJC Chamberlain case -4 defendants remaining in the case. Parties are continuing to engage in settlement discussions.1:22-cv-11733-NMG Gillis case -Mediation held, 11 remaining defendants. Plaintiffs expert report has been filed. Ongoing negotiations continuing.1:23-cv-10496-RWZ Wright case -Joint Motion to Extend Pre-Trial Deadlines filed September 25, 2023 (Entry No. 214) with Modified Pre-Trial Preparation Schedule attached as Exhibit B (Entry No. 214-2). Pending for Judge Bowlers review. The next Status Conference has been set for 11/28/2023 02:30 PM in Courtroom 7 (In person with remote access provided) before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/Audio.html. For a transcript of this proceeding, contact mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11532-RWZ et al.(Simeone, Maria)
September 22, 2023 Filing 355 STATEMENT of facts re #353 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(DeLuzio, Maria)
September 22, 2023 Filing 354 MEMORANDUM in Support re #353 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Blackmer. (DeLuzio, Maria)
September 22, 2023 Filing 353 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Blackmer.(DeLuzio, Maria)
September 22, 2023 Filing 352 ELECTRONIC NOTICE SETTING HEARING on Motion #243 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #310 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 (In person only) before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. No jurisdictional discovery shall take place without further Order of the Court. (Thomson, Katherine)
September 1, 2023 Filing 350 DESIGNATION OF EXPERTS by Robert J Gillis and Judith Gillis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Binder, Keith)
August 31, 2023 Filing 348 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Henry Balestracci on behalf of DCO LLC (Balestracci, Thomas)
August 24, 2023 Filing 345 Set/Reset Hearings: Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 9/1/2023 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen)
August 21, 2023 Filing 344 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #244 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #260 Opposition to Motion, #293 Reply. Counsel who filed these documents are requested to submit a courtesy copy of these documents, including exhibits tabbed, to U.S.M.J. Dein by 08/25/2023. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Thomson, Katherine)
August 18, 2023 Filing 343 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein Referred for: Report and Recommendations (rr). Motions referred: #243 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , and ruling on #310 MOTION for Protective Order . (Lima, Christine) Motions referred to Judith G. Dein.
August 18, 2023 Filing 342 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #320 Motion to Dismiss (Lima, Christine)
August 18, 2023 Filing 341 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #319 Motion to Dismiss (Lima, Christine)
August 18, 2023 Filing 340 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #317 Motion to Dismiss (Lima, Christine)
August 18, 2023 Filing 339 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #316 Motion to Dismiss (Lima, Christine)
August 18, 2023 Filing 338 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #315 Motion to Dismiss (Lima, Christine)
August 16, 2023 Filing 337 Second Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiffs regarding Mediation . (Binder, Keith)
August 15, 2023 Filing 336 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ALLOWING #333 Joint MOTION to Modify the Scheduling Order. (McManus, Caetlin)
August 15, 2023 Filing 335 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Industry Products Co.. (Graham, Brad)
August 15, 2023 Filing 334 NOTICE by Industry Products Co. of Name Change to PBV Inc. (Graham, Brad)
August 14, 2023 Filing 333 Joint MOTION to Modify the Scheduling Order by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Graham, Brad)
August 8, 2023 Filing 332 Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Thomson, Katherine)
August 8, 2023 Filing 331 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered granting #327 MOTION to Compel Production of Original Pathology Materials. (Thomson, Katherine)
August 3, 2023 Filing 330 NOTICE of Hearing. Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 8/29/2023 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. For defendants: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Aurora Pump Company, BNS Co., Blackmer, Boston University, Burnham LLC, Cla-val Co., Copeland Corporation LLC, Crosby Valve, LLC, DCO LLC, Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Emerson-Swan, Inc. Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 8/30/2023 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. For defendants: FMC Corporation, Foster Wheeler, LLC, General Electric Company, General Insulation Company, Harvard University, IMO Industries, Inc., Industry Products Co., Joy Global Underground Mining LLC, Mass General Brigham Incorporated, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Massachusetts Port Authority. Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 8/31/2023 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. For defendants: Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharpe & Dohme LLC, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Redco Corporation, Robertshaw Controls Company, The Marley-Wylain Company, The William Powell Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Valves and Controls US, Inc., Velan Valve Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC. Hearings will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Attached is the Court's mediation order. The parties should review the order for full details before August 15, 2023. The parties shall exchange settlement proposals by August 15, 2023. Confidential mediation statements (in the manner specified in the Court's mediation order) shall be filed by no later than August 18, 2023. (Russo, Noreen)
August 2, 2023 Filing 329 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein Referred for: Events Only (e). Motions referred: #327 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Original Pathology Materials. (Warnock, Douglas) Motions referred to Judith G. Dein.
August 2, 2023 Filing 328 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by New England Insulation Company. (DeLuzio, Maria)
July 31, 2023 Filing 327 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Original Pathology Materials by Defense Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Thomas)
July 28, 2023 Filing 326 Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiffs Regarding Mediation . (Binder, Keith)
July 19, 2023 Filing 325 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant, Carrier Corporation by Robert J Gillis. (Binder, Keith)
July 18, 2023 Filing 324 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Given the atypically large number of parties involved in this case, it would not be tenable in the court's view to attempt to convene a session involving all parties at once, and it would instead be preferable and more efficient to conduct a series of mediation sessions with each including the plaintiff and a smaller group of defendants. The court requests that the parties discuss this proposal and, if in agreement, discuss how those groups should be arranged, and submit a proposed schedule that lists the groups and, to the extent it matters, the order in which each should proceed. The parties should also provide for each grouping all dates of availabilities for the month of August, bearing in mind that the court typically conducts mediation sessions from 10:00 a.m. to 1:00 p.m. without interruption, but may be willing to consider deviating from this schedule if necessary to accommodate a party's scheduling concerns, and the court's schedule permits. (Russo, Noreen)
July 17, 2023 Filing 323 Document disclosure by Robert J Gillis.(Binder, Keith)
July 5, 2023 Filing 322 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #310 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Robert J Gillis. (Binder, Keith)
June 29, 2023 Filing 321 STIPULATION of Dismissal by John Crane Inc.. (Schwindt, Jordan)
June 26, 2023 Filing 320 Assented to MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice as to Robertshaw Controls Company by Robertshaw Controls Company.(Mackler, Joni)
June 23, 2023 Filing 319 Assented to MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by General Insulation Company.(Jackson, Susan)
June 22, 2023 Filing 318 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Donald L Cabell appointed at request of the parties.(Simeone, Maria)
June 22, 2023 Filing 317 Assented to MOTION to Dismiss by Emerson-Swan, Inc..(Perritano, Judith)
June 22, 2023 Filing 316 Assented to MOTION to Dismiss by New England Insulation Company.(DeLuzio, Maria)
June 22, 2023 Filing 315 Assented to MOTION to Dismiss by The William Powell Company.(DeLuzio, Maria)
June 21, 2023 Filing 314 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution: July, 2023. The parties request Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell be assigned. (Warnock, Douglas)
June 21, 2023 Filing 313 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING Joint MOTION for Order to Modification of Scheduling by Robert J Gillis; ( Discovery to be completed by 6/1/2023, Motions due by 11/1/2023) (Warnock, Douglas)
June 21, 2023 Filing 312 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Paramount Global. (Moccia, Anthony)
June 21, 2023 Filing 311 MEMORANDUM in Support re #310 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Industry Products Co.. (Graham, Brad)
June 21, 2023 Filing 310 MOTION for Protective Order by Industry Products Co..(Graham, Brad)
June 21, 2023 Filing 309 NOTICE by Robert J Gillis Response to Crosby Valve LLC's Allegation of No Product Identification (Binder, Keith)
June 20, 2023 Filing 308 NOTICE by Robert J Gillis Response to Warren Pumps LLC's Allegation of No Product Identification (Binder, Keith)
June 20, 2023 Filing 307 NOTICE by Robert J Gillis Response to Redco Corporation's Allegation of No Product Identification (Binder, Keith)
June 20, 2023 Filing 306 NOTICE by Robert J Gillis Response to Parker-Hannifin Corporation's Allegation of No Product Identification (Binder, Keith)
June 20, 2023 Filing 305 NOTICE by Robert J Gillis Response to Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC's Allegation of No Product Identification (Binder, Keith)
June 20, 2023 Filing 304 NOTICE by Robert J Gillis Response to Merck & Co., Inc.'s Allegation of No Product Identification (Binder, Keith)
June 20, 2023 Filing 303 NOTICE by Robert J Gillis Response to Joy Global Underground Mining LLC's Allegation of No Product Identification (Binder, Keith)
June 20, 2023 Filing 302 NOTICE by Robert J Gillis Response to John Crane Inc.'s Allegation of No Product Identification (Binder, Keith)
June 20, 2023 Filing 301 NOTICE by Robert J Gillis Response to FMC Corporation's Allegation of No Product Identification (Binder, Keith)
June 20, 2023 Filing 300 NOTICE by Robert J Gillis Response to Electrolux Home Products, Inc.'s Allegation of No Product Identification (Binder, Keith)
June 20, 2023 Filing 299 NOTICE by Robert J Gillis Response to DCo, LLC's Allegation of No Product Identification (Binder, Keith)
June 20, 2023 Filing 298 NOTICE by Robert J Gillis Response to Cla-Val Co.'s Allegation of No Product Identification (Binder, Keith)
June 20, 2023 Filing 297 NOTICE by Robert J Gillis Response to Blackmer Pump Company's Allegation of No Product Identification (Binder, Keith)
June 20, 2023 Filing 296 NOTICE by Robert J Gillis Response to Aurora Pump Company's Allegation of No Product Identification (Binder, Keith)
June 20, 2023 Filing 295 NOTICE by Valves and Controls US, Inc. Allegation of No Product Identification (Pickett, Rene) (Main Document 295 replaced on 6/22/2023 to remove blank page form PDF) (Warnock, Douglas).
June 20, 2023 Filing 294 NOTICE by Crosby Valve, LLC Allegation of No Product Identification (Pickett, Rene) (Main Document 294 replaced on 6/22/2023 to remove blank page in PDF) (Warnock, Douglas).
June 16, 2023 Filing 293 REPLY to Response to #243 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Reply in Support. Leave to file granted on June 9, 2023. filed by Industry Products Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Graham, Brad)
June 16, 2023 Filing 292 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Rene M. Pickett on behalf of Defendant, Copeland Corporation LLC (Pickett, Rene)
June 16, 2023 Filing 291 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Rene M. Pickett on behalf of Defendant, Crosby Valve, LLC (Pickett, Rene)
June 16, 2023 Filing 290 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Rene M. Pickett on behalf of Defendant, Mass General Brigham Incorporated (Pickett, Rene)
June 16, 2023 Filing 289 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Rene M. Pickett on behalf of Defendant, President and Fellows of Harvard College (Pickett, Rene)
June 16, 2023 Filing 288 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Rene M. Pickett on behalf of Defendant, Valves and Controls US, Inc. (Pickett, Rene)
June 16, 2023 Filing 287 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Rene M. Pickett on behalf of Defendant, Trustees of Boston University (Pickett, Rene)
June 16, 2023 Filing 286 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Ametek, Inc.. (Bjornlund, Kyle)
June 14, 2023 Filing 285 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Clifton Associates, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 12, 2023 Filing 284 NOTICE by General Insulation Company Allegation of No Product Identification (Jackson, Susan)
June 12, 2023 Filing 283 NOTICE by Parker-Hannifin Corporation Allegation of No Product Identification (Jackson, Susan)
June 12, 2023 Filing 282 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aurora Pump Company. (Waksler, Craig)
June 12, 2023 Filing 281 NOTICE by Redco Corporation of No Product Identification (Goldman, David)
June 12, 2023 Filing 280 NOTICE by Robertshaw Controls Company Allegation of No Product Identification (Claflin, Mark)
June 12, 2023 Filing 279 NOTICE by Aurora Pump Company of No Product Identification (Waksler, Craig)
June 12, 2023 Filing 278 NOTICE by Paramount Global of No Product Identification (Moccia, Anthony)
June 12, 2023 Filing 277 NOTICE by John Crane Inc. Allegation of No Product Identification (Schwindt, Jordan)
June 12, 2023 Filing 276 NOTICE by Cla-val Co. of No Product Identification (Goldman, David)
June 12, 2023 Filing 275 NOTICE by FMC Corporation Allegation of No Product Identification (Dwyer, Paul)
June 12, 2023 Filing 274 NOTICE by DCO LLC Allegation of No Product Identification (Brown, Thomas)
June 9, 2023 Filing 273 NOTICE by Merck Sharpe & Dohme LLC of Allegation of No Product Identification (Simon, Julia)
June 9, 2023 Filing 272 NOTICE by Merck & Co., Inc. of Allegation of No Product Identification (Simon, Julia)
June 9, 2023 Filing 271 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered ALLOWING #250 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Renewed by Alfa Laval Inc. (Warnock, Douglas)
June 9, 2023 Filing 270 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING a reply brief, not to exceed 10 pages re #261 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Industry Products Co.; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Warnock, Douglas)
June 9, 2023 Filing 269 NOTICE by The William Powell Company of Allegation of No Product Identification (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 9, 2023 Filing 268 NOTICE by Warren Pumps LLC of Allegation of No Product Identification (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 9, 2023 Filing 267 NOTICE by New England Insulation Company of Allegation of No Product Identification (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 9, 2023 Filing 266 NOTICE by Joy Global Underground Mining LLC of Allegation of No Product Identification (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 9, 2023 Filing 265 NOTICE by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. of Allegation of No Product Identification (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 9, 2023 Filing 264 NOTICE by Clifton Associates, Inc. of Allegation of No Product Identification (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 9, 2023 Filing 263 NOTICE by Blackmer of Allegation of No Product Identification (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 9, 2023 Filing 262 NOTICE by Emerson-Swan, Inc. of Allegation of No Product Identification (Perritano, Judith)
June 7, 2023 Filing 261 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Industry Products Co..(Graham, Brad)
June 2, 2023 Filing 260 Opposition re #243 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Robert J Gillis. (Attachments: #1 declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(O'Donnell, Erika)
May 31, 2023 Filing 259 Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Thomson, Katherine)
May 31, 2023 Filing 258 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #256 MOTION for Extension of Time to June 12, 2023 to Respond to Plaintiffs Discovery Requests. (Thomson, Katherine)
May 24, 2023 Filing 257 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein Referred for: Events Only (e). Motions referred: #256 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 12th, 2023 to To Respond to Plaintiffs Discovery Requests . (Warnock, Douglas) Motions referred to Judith G. Dein.
May 23, 2023 Filing 256 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 12th, 2023 to To Respond to Plaintiffs Discovery Requests by Velan Valve Corporation.(Pascarella, Clifford)
May 19, 2023 Filing 255 NOTICE by Robert J Gillis Notice of Change of Firm Name (O'Donnell, Erika)
May 9, 2023 Filing 254 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant GlaxoSmith Kline LLC and Defendant GSK Consumer Health, Inc. Only by GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Larson, Adam)
April 26, 2023 Filing 253 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Binder, Keith)
April 26, 2023 Filing 252 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Robert J Gillis. Copeland Corporation LLC served on 4/3/2023, answer due 4/24/2023; Industry Products Co. served on 4/3/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. Acknowledgement filed by Robert J Gillis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(O'Donnell, Erika)
April 21, 2023 Filing 251 MEMORANDUM in Support re #250 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Renewed filed by Alfa Laval Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Schwindt, Jordan)
April 21, 2023 Filing 250 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Renewed by Alfa Laval Inc..(Schwindt, Jordan)
April 20, 2023 Filing 249 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER enteredDENYING as moot #79 Motion for Summary Judgment, in view of Docket No. 132; DENYING as moot #131 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, in view of Docket No. 192;DENYING as moot #208 Motion to Dismiss, in view of the amended complaint at Docket No. 222. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
April 18, 2023 Filing 248 ANSWER to #222 Amended Complaint by Merck Sharpe & Dohme LLC.(Tayyab, J.)
April 18, 2023 Filing 247 ANSWER to #222 Amended Complaint by Merck & Co., Inc..(Tayyab, J.)
April 18, 2023 Filing 246 Copeland Corporation LLC's First Amended Answer to First Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Copeland Corporation LLC.(Rooney, John)
April 18, 2023 Filing 245 Crosby Valve, LLC's First Amended ANSWER to #222 Amended Complaint and Jury Claim, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crosby Valve, LLC.(Rooney, John)
April 18, 2023 Filing 244 MEMORANDUM in Support re #243 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Industry Products Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Graham, Brad)
April 18, 2023 Filing 243 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Industry Products Co..(Graham, Brad)
April 18, 2023 Filing 242 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #222 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Paramount Global.(Moccia, Anthony)
April 17, 2023 Filing 241 ANSWER to Complaint by Aurora Pump Company.(Waksler, Craig)
April 14, 2023 Filing 240 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #235 Joint MOTION for Order to Modification of Scheduling by Robert J Gillis. (Warnock, Douglas)
April 14, 2023 Filing 239 Copeland Corporation LLC's Answer and Jury Claim to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Copeland Corporation LLC.(Rooney, John)
April 14, 2023 Filing 238 Crosby Valve, LLC's Answer & Jury Claim to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Crosby Valve, LLC.(Rooney, John)
April 13, 2023 Filing 237 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Paramount Global.(Moccia, Anthony)
April 13, 2023 Filing 236 Redco Corporation, f/k/a Crane Co.'s ANSWER to #222 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Cross-Claims, Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Redco Corporation.(Goldman, David)
April 12, 2023 Filing 235 Joint MOTION for Order to Modification of Scheduling by Robert J Gillis.(O'Donnell, Erika) Modified event type on 4/14/2023 (Warnock, Douglas).
April 11, 2023 Filing 234 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M. Moccia on behalf of Paramount Global (Moccia, Anthony)
April 11, 2023 Filing 233 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Cla-val Co..(Goldman, David)
April 11, 2023 Filing 232 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of Cla-val Co. (Goldman, David)
April 11, 2023 Filing 231 ANSWER to #222 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, Response to Cross-Claim and, First CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Massachusetts Institute of Technology.(Murphy, Ryan)
April 10, 2023 Filing 230 Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC's ANSWER to #222 Amended Complaint of Plaintiff, First CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Foster Wheeler, LLC(survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corporation).(Surette, Siobhan)
April 5, 2023 Filing 229 ANSWER to #222 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by John Crane Inc..(Schwindt, Jordan)
April 4, 2023 Filing 228 ANSWER to #222 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Jury Claim against All Defendants by Mass General Brigham Incorporated(individually and as successor-in-interest to The Massachusetts General Hospital).(Rooney, John)
April 4, 2023 Filing 227 ANSWER to #222 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Jury Claim against All Defendants by Harvard University.(Rooney, John)
April 4, 2023 Filing 226 ANSWER to #222 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Jury Claim against All Defendants by Boston University.(Rooney, John)
April 4, 2023 Filing 225 ANSWER to #222 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Jury Claim against All Defendants by Valves and Controls US, Inc..(Rooney, John)
April 4, 2023 Filing 224 Amended ANSWER to #222 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Union Carbide Corporation.(Brown, Timothy)
April 3, 2023 Filing 223 Summons Issued as to Copeland Corporation LLC, Industry Products Co.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
April 3, 2023 Filing 222 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert J Gillis.(O'Donnell, Erika)
March 29, 2023 Filing 221 Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiffs' Attorney regarding Summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summonses)(O'Donnell, Erika)
March 28, 2023 Filing 220 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2023. The court hears the oral argument of counsel re #185 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Robert J Gillis. After argument, the court allows #185 MOTION to Amend in open court. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/Audio.html . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact the Clerk's office by email at mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov. (Simeone, Maria)
March 28, 2023 Filing 219 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #185 Motion to Amend, after hearing. This case presents a close call on the issue of futility. However since the case is still at an early stage, the addition of IPC will not delay the progression of trial preparation. This court notes there is no opposition to the addition of Copeland. (Bowler, Marianne)
March 27, 2023 Filing 218 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Naftali Falda on behalf of Judith Gillis, Robert J Gillis (Falda, Nathaniel)
March 27, 2023 Filing 217 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C. Netburn on behalf of Industry Products Company (Netburn, Peter)
March 24, 2023 Filing 216 Filed in error. See correctly filed appearance #218 . NOTICE of Appearance by Erika A. O'Donnell on behalf of Robert J Gillis (O'Donnell, Erika) Modified on 3/27/2023 (McManus, Caetlin).
March 24, 2023 Filing 215 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #214 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nathaniel N. Falda. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McManus, Caetlin)
March 24, 2023 Filing 214 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nathaniel N. Falda Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9775046 by Robert J Gillis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing NY)(O'Donnell, Erika)
March 22, 2023 Filing 213 Reset Hearings as to #185 MOTION to Amend Complaint. The Motion Hearing has been reset for 3/28/2023 02:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Simeone, Maria)
March 21, 2023 Filing 212 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion. A Motion Hearing has been set for 5/23/2023 02:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler re #185 MOTION to Amend Complaint : This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2023 02:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Simeone, Maria)
March 13, 2023 Filing 211 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #209 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #208 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Jordan L. Schwindt on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc. filed by on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc.. (Schwindt, Jordan)
February 15, 2023 Filing 210 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: re #208 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to ECF Administrative Procedure G(4) under Electronic Filing: "Any memorandum of law or other attachment filed in support of a main document shall be filed as a separate document, using the proper event." Additionally, any exhibits shall be attached to the Memorandum of law.Counsel is reminded to review the local rules and the attorney handbook when filing documents with the Court by accessing our web page, at www.mad.uscourts.gov under CM/ECF E-Filing. (Warnock, Douglas)
February 6, 2023 Filing 209 MEMORANDUM in Support re #208 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Alfa Laval Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Warnock, Douglas)
February 6, 2023 Filing 208 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Alfa Laval Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Schwindt, Jordan) Deleted and re-docketed (see ECF #209 ) Memorandum and exhibits on 2/15/2023 as they were improperly filed as attachments (Warnock, Douglas).
January 30, 2023 Filing 207 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Mass General Brigham Incorporated.(Rooney, John)
January 24, 2023 Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Brown on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Brown, Timothy)
January 20, 2023 Filing 205 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 on behalf of The William Powell Company. (DeLuzio, Maria)
January 20, 2023 Filing 204 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The William Powell Company. (DeLuzio, Maria)
January 20, 2023 Filing 203 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The William Powell Company.(DeLuzio, Maria)
January 12, 2023 Filing 198 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by New England Insulation Company. (DeLuzio, Maria)
January 12, 2023 Filing 197 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 on behalf of New England Insulation Company. (DeLuzio, Maria)
January 12, 2023 Filing 196 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by New England Insulation Company.(DeLuzio, Maria)
January 9, 2023 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Alexandrina Crockwell on behalf of Mass General Brigham Incorporated (Crockwell, Jacqueline)
January 9, 2023 Filing 194 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mass General Brigham Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent None for corporate parent or other public affiliates for Mass General Brigham Incorporated.. (Rooney, John)
January 9, 2023 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Rooney on behalf of Mass General Brigham Incorporated (Rooney, John)
January 5, 2023 Filing 192 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center (Adams, Kip)
January 3, 2023 Filing 191 Opposition re #185 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Industry Products Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ramer Affidavit)(Felice, John)
January 3, 2023 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Felice on behalf of Industry Products Company (Felice, John)
January 3, 2023 Filing 189 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merck Sharpe & Dohme LLC identifying Other Affiliate Merck & Co., Inc. for Merck Sharpe & Dohme LLC.. (George, Wayne)
January 3, 2023 Filing 188 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merck & Co., Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Schering-Plough Corporation for Merck & Co., Inc... (George, Wayne)
December 27, 2022 Filing 187 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Cameron International Corporation. (Schwindt, Jordan)
December 22, 2022 Filing 186 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Cleaver Brooks, Inc.. (Martin, Adam)
December 22, 2022 Filing 185 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Robert J Gillis. (Attachments: #1 Appendix First Amended Complaint)(Binder, Keith)
December 20, 2022 Filing 184 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robertshaw Controls Company. (Claflin, Mark)
December 13, 2022 Filing 183 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Merck Sharpe & Dohme LLC.(Tayyab, J.)
December 13, 2022 Filing 182 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Merck & Co., Inc..(Tayyab, J.)
December 13, 2022 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharpe & Dohme LLC (Tayyab, J.)
December 13, 2022 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne E. George on behalf of Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharpe & Dohme LLC (George, Wayne)
December 12, 2022 Filing 179 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Robert J Gillis. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by Robert J Gillis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Out of State Defendants, #2 Exhibit Sheriff Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Misc. Proof of Service)(O'Donnell, Erika)
December 8, 2022 Filing 178 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BNS Co.. (Adams, Stephen)
December 8, 2022 Filing 177 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendant Emerson Swan, Inc.. (Perritano, Judith)
December 7, 2022 Filing 176 STIPULATION of Dismissal on Elliott Company by Robert J Gillis. (Binder, Keith)
December 7, 2022 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Burke on behalf of Massachusetts Port Authority (Burke, William)
December 7, 2022 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Rotella on behalf of Massachusetts Port Authority (Rotella, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2022 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlie S. Seigal on behalf of Clifton Associates, Inc. (Seigal, Carlie)
December 5, 2022 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Joni K. Mackler on behalf of Robertshaw Controls Company (Mackler, Joni)
December 5, 2022 Filing 171 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Acknowledgment of Service by Robertshaw Controls Company.(Claflin, Mark)
December 5, 2022 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Claflin on behalf of Robertshaw Controls Company (Claflin, Mark)
December 2, 2022 Filing 169 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 168 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Warren Pumps LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 167 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Warren Pumps LLC.(DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 166 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 on behalf of Joy Global Underground Mining LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 165 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joy Global Underground Mining LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 164 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Joy Global Underground Mining LLC.(DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 163 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 162 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IMO Industries, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 161 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by IMO Industries, Inc..(DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 160 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 159 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 158 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 157 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 on behalf of Clifton Associates, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 156 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Clifton Associates, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 155 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Clifton Associates, Inc..(DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 154 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 on behalf of Blackmer. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 153 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blackmer. (DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 152 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Blackmer.(DeLuzio, Maria)
December 2, 2022 Filing 151 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Emerson-Swan, Inc.. (Perritano, Judith)
December 2, 2022 Filing 150 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Emerson-Swan, Inc..(Perritano, Judith)
December 2, 2022 Filing 149 STIPULATION of Dismissal on WILO USA LL, individually and as successor-in-interest to Weil Pump Company, Inc. by Robert J Gillis. (Binder, Keith)
November 30, 2022 Filing 148 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Defendant GSK Consumer Health, Inc. (Only) by GSK Consumer Health, Inc.. (Larson, Adam)
November 29, 2022 Filing 147 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Boston University.(Rooney, John)
November 29, 2022 Filing 146 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Harvard University.(Rooney, John)
November 28, 2022 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford V. Pascarella on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Pascarella, Clifford)
November 28, 2022 Filing 144 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Velan Valve Corporation. (Robinson, John)
November 28, 2022 Filing 143 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Velan Valve Corporation.(Robinson, John)
November 28, 2022 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Robinson on behalf of Velan Valve Corporation (Robinson, John)
November 21, 2022 Filing 141 NOTICE by Robert J Gillis regarding Authorizations for Defendants (O'Donnell, Erika)
November 17, 2022 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Ann Richards on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Richards, Courtney)
November 17, 2022 Filing 139 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC Corporation.(Dwyer, Paul)
November 17, 2022 Filing 138 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Marley-Wylain Company. (Primack, David)
November 17, 2022 Filing 137 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Primack, David)
November 17, 2022 Filing 136 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by The Marley-Wylain Company.(Primack, David)
November 17, 2022 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Primack on behalf of The Marley-Wylain Company (Primack, David)
November 17, 2022 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R. Waksler on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Waksler, Craig)
November 17, 2022 Filing 133 Summons Issued as to Aurora Pump Company, Carrier Corporation, DCO LLC, FMC Corporation, GSK Consumer Health, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Mass General Brigham Incorporated, Massachusetts Port Authority, Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center, Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharpe & Dohme LLC, New England Insulation Company, Paramount Global, Robertshaw Controls Company, The Marley-Wylain Company, The William Powell Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Wilo USA LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
November 17, 2022 Filing 132 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Boston Properties, Inc.. (Dain, Daniel)
November 16, 2022 Filing 131 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibits)(Adams, Kip)
November 16, 2022 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R. Nelson on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Nelson, Monica)
November 16, 2022 Filing 129 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Dwyer, Paul)
November 16, 2022 Filing 128 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FMC Corporation. (Dwyer, Paul)
November 16, 2022 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of FMC Corporation (Dwyer, Paul)
November 16, 2022 Filing 126 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company, The for Union Carbide Corporation.. (Adams, Kip)
November 16, 2022 Filing 125 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Union Carbide Corporation.(Adams, Kip)
November 16, 2022 Filing 124 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Union Carbide Corporation.(Adams, Kip)
November 16, 2022 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip J. Adams on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Adams, Kip)
November 16, 2022 Filing 122 Request for Summonses Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiffs' Attorneys. (Attachments: #1 Summonses)(O'Donnell, Erika)
November 14, 2022 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Emerson-Swan, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
November 14, 2022 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Emerson-Swan, Inc. (Riordan, Meghan)
November 14, 2022 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Emerson-Swan, Inc. (Perritano, Judith)
November 14, 2022 Filing 118 Letter/request (non-motion) regarding Summons requested by Plaintiffs' Attorney. (O'Donnell, Erika)
November 14, 2022 Filing 117 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice (Joint) by HP Hood. (McDonough, Patrick)
November 11, 2022 Filing 116 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Insulation Company. (Jackson, Susan)
November 11, 2022 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Jackson on behalf of General Insulation Company (Jackson, Susan)
November 10, 2022 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Perritano, Judith)
November 10, 2022 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Joy Global Underground Mining LLC (Perritano, Judith)
November 10, 2022 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Perritano, Judith)
November 10, 2022 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Perritano, Judith)
November 10, 2022 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Clifton Associates, Inc. (Perritano, Judith)
November 10, 2022 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Blackmer (Perritano, Judith)
November 10, 2022 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Riordan, Meghan)
November 10, 2022 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Joy Global Underground Mining LLC (Riordan, Meghan)
November 10, 2022 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Riordan, Meghan)
November 10, 2022 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Riordan, Meghan)
November 10, 2022 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Clifton Associates, Inc. (Riordan, Meghan)
November 10, 2022 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Blackmer (Riordan, Meghan)
November 10, 2022 Filing 102 STIPULATION of Dismissal by University of Massachusetts. (Vail, Hannah)
November 10, 2022 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (DeLuzio, Maria)
November 10, 2022 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Joy Global Underground Mining LLC (DeLuzio, Maria)
November 10, 2022 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
November 10, 2022 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
November 10, 2022 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Clifton Associates, Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
November 10, 2022 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Blackmer (DeLuzio, Maria)
November 10, 2022 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Rene M. Pickett on behalf of Harvard University (Pickett, Rene)
November 10, 2022 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Rene M. Pickett on behalf of Crosby Valve, LLC (Pickett, Rene)
November 10, 2022 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Rene M. Pickett on behalf of Boston University (Pickett, Rene)
November 10, 2022 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Rene M. Pickett on behalf of Valves and Controls US, Inc. (Pickett, Rene)
November 10, 2022 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith W. Binder on behalf of Robert J Gillis (Binder, Keith)
November 9, 2022 Filing 90 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD by Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center. (Adams, Kip)
November 9, 2022 Filing 89 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #77 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Warnock, Douglas)
November 8, 2022 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Adams on behalf of BNS Co. (Adams, Stephen)
November 8, 2022 Filing 87 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Redco Corporation.(Goldman, David)
November 8, 2022 Filing 86 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Redco Corporation.(Goldman, David)
November 8, 2022 Filing 85 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Redco Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Spruce Lake Liability Management Holdco LLC for Redco Corporation.. (Goldman, David)
November 8, 2022 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of Redco Corporation (Goldman, David)
November 8, 2022 Filing 83 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Cla-val Co..(Goldman, David)
November 8, 2022 Filing 82 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Cla-val Co..(Goldman, David)
November 8, 2022 Filing 81 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cla-val Co. identifying Other Affiliate Griswold Industries for Cla-val Co... (Goldman, David)
November 7, 2022 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of Cla-val Co. (Goldman, David)
November 2, 2022 Filing 79 First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Boston Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of MSJ, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of)(Dain, Daniel)
November 2, 2022 Filing 78 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boston Properties, Inc.. (Dain, Daniel)
November 1, 2022 Filing 77 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by HP Hood.(Biagetti, Peter)
November 1, 2022 Filing 76 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HP Hood. (Biagetti, Peter)
November 1, 2022 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick E. McDonough on behalf of HP Hood (McDonough, Patrick)
November 1, 2022 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A. Biagetti on behalf of HP Hood (Biagetti, Peter)
November 1, 2022 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. McCarthy on behalf of Massachusetts Institute of Technology (McCarthy, Daniel)
November 1, 2022 Filing 72 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Murphy, Ryan)
November 1, 2022 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Murphy, Ryan)
November 1, 2022 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Murphy on behalf of Massachusetts Institute of Technology (Murphy, Ryan)
November 1, 2022 Filing 69 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #58 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/01/2022 to File Answer; Boston University answer due 12/1/2022. (Warnock, Douglas)
November 1, 2022 Filing 68 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Jackson, Susan)
November 1, 2022 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Jackson on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Jackson, Susan)
October 31, 2022 Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BNS Co..(Adams, Stephen)
October 31, 2022 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Dain on behalf of Boston Properties, Inc. (Dain, Daniel)
October 31, 2022 Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cleaver Brooks, Inc.. (Martin, Adam)
October 31, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam C. Martin on behalf of Cleaver Brooks, Inc. (Martin, Adam)
October 29, 2022 Filing 62 STATE COURT Record. (Schwindt, Jordan)
October 26, 2022 Filing 61 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crosby Valve, LLC. (Rooney, John)
October 26, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Rooney on behalf of Crosby Valve, LLC (Rooney, John)
October 26, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Alexandrina Crockwell on behalf of Crosby Valve, LLC (Crockwell, Jacqueline)
October 26, 2022 Filing 58 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/01/2022 to File Answer by Boston University.(Rooney, John)
October 26, 2022 Filing 57 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boston University. (Rooney, John)
October 26, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Rooney on behalf of Boston University (Rooney, John)
October 26, 2022 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Alexandrina Crockwell on behalf of Boston University (Crockwell, Jacqueline)
October 26, 2022 Filing 54 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #49 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/01/2022 to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint Harvard University answer due 12/1/2022. (Lima, Christine)
October 24, 2022 Filing 53 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #52 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Keith W. Binder. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Warnock, Douglas)
October 24, 2022 Filing 52 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Keith W. Binder Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9554917 by Robert J Gillis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing NJ, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing NY, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Southern NY)(O'Donnell, Erika)
October 21, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Rooney on behalf of Harvard University (Rooney, John)
October 21, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Rooney on behalf of Valves and Controls US, Inc. (Rooney, John)
October 21, 2022 Filing 49 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/01/2022 to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Harvard University.(Crockwell, Jacqueline)
October 21, 2022 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harvard University identifying Corporate Parent Harvard University for Harvard University.. (Crockwell, Jacqueline)
October 21, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Alexandrina Crockwell on behalf of Harvard University (Crockwell, Jacqueline)
October 21, 2022 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by Valves and Controls US, Inc..(Crockwell, Jacqueline)
October 21, 2022 Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Valves and Controls US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Valves and Controls US, Inc., f/k/a Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. for Valves and Controls US, Inc... (Crockwell, Jacqueline)
October 21, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Alexandrina Crockwell on behalf of Valves and Controls US, Inc. (Crockwell, Jacqueline)
October 19, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE by Ametek, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Joinder of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bjornlund, Kyle)
October 19, 2022 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ametek, Inc.. (Bjornlund, Kyle)
October 19, 2022 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ametek, Inc..(Bjornlund, Kyle)
October 19, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle E. Bjornlund on behalf of Ametek, Inc. (Bjornlund, Kyle)
October 19, 2022 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Alfa Laval Inc. by Alfa Laval Inc..(Schwindt, Jordan)
October 19, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE by Alfa Laval Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Joinder in Removal (Schwindt, Jordan)
October 19, 2022 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alfa Laval Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval Inc. AB for Alfa Laval Inc... (Schwindt, Jordan)
October 19, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Schwindt on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc. (Schwindt, Jordan)
October 19, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. McCarthy on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc. (McCarthy, Daniel)
October 19, 2022 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against John Crane Inc. by John Crane Inc..(Schwindt, Jordan)
October 19, 2022 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Cameron International Corporation by Cameron International Corporation.(Schwindt, Jordan)
October 19, 2022 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cameron International Corporation. (Schwindt, Jordan)
October 19, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. McCarthy on behalf of Cameron International Corporation (McCarthy, Daniel)
October 19, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah C. Vail on behalf of University of Massachusetts (Vail, Hannah)
October 19, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Schwindt on behalf of Cameron International Corporation (Schwindt, Jordan)
October 18, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE by Foster Wheeler, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Joinder in Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Surette, Siobhan)
October 18, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen R. Souza on behalf of Foster Wheeler, LLC (Souza, Kristen)
October 18, 2022 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Foster Wheeler, LLC identifying Corporate Parent JOHN WOOD GROUP plc (Scotland) for Foster Wheeler, LLC.. (Surette, Siobhan)
October 18, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Foster Wheeler, LLC.(Surette, Siobhan)
October 18, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Siobhan M. Surette on behalf of Foster Wheeler, LLC (Surette, Siobhan)
October 18, 2022 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton added. Judge Patti B. Saris no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
October 17, 2022 Filing 22 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, I recuse myself from participation in this matter and direct the Clerk to reassign the case randomly. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 17, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Stesha A. Emmanuel on behalf of General Electric Company (Emmanuel, Stesha)
October 17, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
October 17, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Mohan, Catherine)
October 17, 2022 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
October 17, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
October 14, 2022 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Burnham LLC. (Felice, John)
October 14, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad W. Graham on behalf of Burnham LLC (Graham, Brad)
October 14, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Felice on behalf of Burnham LLC (Felice, John)
October 14, 2022 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Felice, John)
October 14, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Acknowledgment of Service, Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Felice, John)
October 14, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad W. Graham on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Graham, Brad)
October 14, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Felice on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Felice, John)
October 13, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Crane Inc.. (Schwindt, Jordan)
October 13, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Schwindt on behalf of John Crane Inc. (Schwindt, Jordan)
October 13, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan F. Tabasky on behalf of John Crane Inc. (Tabasky, Jonathan)
October 13, 2022 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Warnock, Douglas)
October 13, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Defense Liaison Counsel (Armato, Stephen)
October 13, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Defense Liaison Counsel (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
October 13, 2022 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 13, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
October 12, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Crane Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9538099 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Category Form)(Schwindt, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillis, et al. v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J Gillis
Represented By: Erika A. O'Donnell
Represented By: Giuliana D'Esopo
Represented By: Michael J. McCann
Represented By: Michael C. Shepard
Represented By: Keith W. Binder
Represented By: Nathaniel Naftali Falda
Represented By: Kelsey Nicole McCandless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, as Successor by Merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Inc.
Represented By: Jordan L. Schwindt
Represented By: Daniel P. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ametek, Inc., individually and as successor to Schutte & Koerting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC, survivor to a merger with Foster Wheeler Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel P. Dain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees Boston University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham LLC
Represented By: Brad W. Graham
Represented By: John R. Felice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron International Corporation, f/k/a Cooper Cameron Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cla-val Co.
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifton Associates, Inc., f/k/a Johnson Asbestos Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCo LLC, f/k/a Dana Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc., individually and as successor to Copes Vulcan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson-Swan, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation, on behalf of its former Chicago Pump, Peerless Pump and Northern Pump Businesses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSK Consumer Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Hood, individually and as successor-in-interest to Brigham's Ice Cream Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Global Underground Mining, LLC f/k/a Joy Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mass General Brigham Incorporated, individually and as successor-in-interest to The Massachusetts General Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: J. Yasmin Tayyab
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Sharpe & Dohme LLC
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: J. Yasmin Tayyab
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global, f/k/a ViacomCBS, Inc., f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation, successor to Denison Hydraulics Inc. f/k/a Denison Engineering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertshaw Controls Company, individually and as successor-in-interest to Fulton Sylphon Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Massachusetts
Represented By: Hannah C. Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Kip J. Adams
Represented By: Monica R. Nelson
Represented By: Timothy Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valves and Controls US, Inc., f/k/a Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Represented By: Mark J. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilo USA LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest to Weil Pump Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCO LLC
Represented By: Thomas Henry Balestracci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Susan A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valves and Controls US, Inc.
Represented By: Rene M. Pickett
Represented By: John F. Rooney
Represented By: Jacqueline Alexandrina Crockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ametek, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle E. Bjornlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: Siobhan M. Surette
Represented By: Kristen R. Souza
Represented By: John Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston University
Represented By: John F. Rooney
Represented By: Jacqueline Alexandrina Crockwell
Represented By: Rene M. Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Cameron Corporation
Represented By: Jordan L. Schwindt
Represented By: Daniel P. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Asbestos Corporation
Represented By: Carlie S. Seigal
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies, LLC.,
Represented By: Thomas Henry Balestracci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Hood
Represented By: Peter A. Biagetti
Represented By: Patrick E. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Technologies LLC
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Anthony M. Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: a CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Anthony M. Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation
Represented By: Anthony M. Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Anthony M. Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denison Engineering
Represented By: Susan A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertshaw Controls Company
Represented By: Joni K. Mackler
Represented By: Mark J. Claflin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, INC.
Represented By: Rene M. Pickett
Represented By: John F. Rooney
Represented By: Jacqueline Alexandrina Crockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Represented By: John F. Rooney
Represented By: Jacqueline Alexandrina Crockwell
Represented By: Rene M. Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilo USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PBV Inc
Represented By: Brad W. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Blackmer
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: BNS Co.
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Carrier Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Cleaver Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Adam C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: General Insulation Company
Represented By: Susan A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Massachusetts Institute of Technology
Represented By: Daniel P. McCarthy
Represented By: Ryan M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Massachusetts Port Authority
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Rotella
Represented By: William F. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center
Represented By: Kip J. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: New England Insulation Company
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: The Marley-Wylain Company
Represented By: David P. Primack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Clifton Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Represented By: Carlie S. Seigal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Judith Gillis
Represented By: Erika A. O'Donnell
Represented By: Giuliana D'Esopo
Represented By: Michael J. McCann
Represented By: Michael C. Shepard
Represented By: Keith W. Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Defense Liaison Counsel
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Stephen T. Armato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Copeland Corporation LLC
Represented By: John F. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Industry Products Co.
Represented By: Brad W. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Crosby Valve, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Alexandrina Crockwell
Represented By: Rene M. Pickett
Represented By: John F. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Catherine Mohan
Represented By: Stesha A. Emmanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Harvard University
Represented By: John F. Rooney
Represented By: Rene M. Pickett
Represented By: Jacqueline Alexandrina Crockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: John Crane Inc.
Represented By: Jordan L. Schwindt
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Clifford V. Pascarella
Represented By: John J. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Cameron International Corporation
Represented By: Daniel P. McCarthy
Represented By: Jordan L. Schwindt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Joy Global Underground Mining LLC
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Paramount Global
Represented By: Anthony M. Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Brad W. Graham
Represented By: John R. Felice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Mass General Brigham Incorporated
Represented By: John F. Rooney
Represented By: Jacqueline Alexandrina Crockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Industry Products Company
Represented By: John R. Felice
Represented By: Peter C. Netburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Judge Donald L Cabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?