Alves v. Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Plaintiff: Joe Alves
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv11820
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2023 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
December 19, 2022 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #34 Declaration, #33 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office Attention Matthew Paine - Docket Clerk - Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
December 16, 2022 Filing 34 DECLARATION re #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Declaration of Johnny McIntosh by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Maroney, Michael)
December 16, 2022 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support re #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Maroney, Michael)
December 16, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company.(Maroney, Michael)
November 28, 2022 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge William G. Young added. Judge Indira Talwani no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
November 28, 2022 Filing 30 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL. (MacDonald, Gail)
November 18, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Sophie Kletzien on behalf of Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company (Kletzien, Sophie)
November 18, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Melodia on behalf of Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company (Melodia, Mark)
November 17, 2022 Filing 27 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #26 Assented to Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sophie L. Kletzien. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 16, 2022 Filing 26 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sophie L. Kletzien Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9591098 by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Sophie L. Kletzien)(Maroney, Michael)
November 16, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Kristine Tack on behalf of Joe Alves (Tack, Rachel)
November 16, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Laird on behalf of Joe Alves (Laird, Michael)
November 16, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C Gudmundson on behalf of Joe Alves (Gudmundson, Brian)
November 16, 2022 Filing 22 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mark S. Melodia. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha)
November 16, 2022 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark S. Melodia Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number BMADC-9591059 by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Mark S. Melodia)(Maroney, Michael)
November 14, 2022 Filing 20 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Rachel K. Tack. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 14, 2022 Filing 19 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael J. Laird. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 14, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rachel K. Tack Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9585491 by Joe Alves. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel K. Tack ISO PHV Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guglielmo, Joseph)
November 14, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael J. Laird Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9585460 by Joe Alves. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Laird ISO PHV Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guglielmo, Joseph)
November 14, 2022 Filing 16 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brian C. Gudmundson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 11, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian C. Gudmundson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9584116 by Joe Alves. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian C. Gudmundson ISO PHV Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guglielmo, Joseph)
November 10, 2022 Filing 14 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Establish Briefing Schedule #13 . Defendant's time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to December 16, 2022. Plaintiff's response shall be filed no later than January 31, 2023. Defendant is granted leave to file a reply which shall be filed no later than February 14, 2023. Counsel shall ensure that filings comply with this session's standing order regarding motion practice, including the requirement that the font used in filings shall be at least 12-point for all text, including footnotes. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 9, 2022 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint and to Establish Briefing Schedule by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company.(Maroney, Michael)
November 9, 2022 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Maroney, Michael)
November 9, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Maroney on behalf of Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company (Maroney, Michael)
November 1, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Carey Alexander on behalf of Joe Alves (Alexander, Carey)
November 1, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Samuel Binder on behalf of Joe Alves (Binder, Ethan)
November 1, 2022 Filing 8 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ethan S. Binder. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 1, 2022 Filing 7 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Carey Alexander. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 1, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ethan S. Binder Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9567467 by Joe Alves. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ethan S. Binder, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guglielmo, Joseph)
November 1, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Carey Alexander Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9567446 by Joe Alves. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carey Alexander ISO PHV Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guglielmo, Joseph)
October 31, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company served on 10/26/2022, answer due 11/16/2022. (Guglielmo, Joseph)
October 25, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Phillips, Sophie)
October 25, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9556002 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Joe Alves. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Guglielmo, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alves v. Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Alves
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: Brian C Gudmundson
Represented By: Rachel Kristine Tack
Represented By: Carey Alexander
Represented By: Ethan Samuel Binder
Represented By: Michael J Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: Mark Melodia
Represented By: Michael T. Maroney
Represented By: Sophie Kletzien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?