Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC v. GoTo Technologies USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC and Steven Carter
Defendant: GoTo Technologies USA, Inc. and LastPass US LP
Consolidated Plaintiff: R. Andre Klein, David Andrew, Steven Linthicum, Denise Remhof, Alan Murphy, Jr., Nathan Goldstein and John Doe
Consolidated Defendant: LastPass USA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv12047
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2023 Filing 111 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re #109 Consent Motion For Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Under Seal.Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 20, 2023 Filing 112 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered ALLOWED re Joint Motion to CONVERT 1/4/2024 Hearing to In-Person Hearing. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND MOTION HEARING SET FOR 1/4/2024 02:30 PM. ALL COUNSEL SHOULD APPEAR IN PERSON ON 1/4/2024 IN COURTROOM 19, 7TH FLOOR. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) Modified on 11/21/2023 to correct hearing time to 2:30PM. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
November 17, 2023 Filing 110 REPLY to Response to #92 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Reply)(Wiech, Christopher)
November 17, 2023 Filing 109 Consent MOTION For Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Under Seal re #95 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #92 MOTION to Dismiss by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Re Motion to File Under Seal)(Wiech, Christopher) Modified on 11/19/2023 to Correct CM/ECF NextGen Filing Event (Paine, Matthew).
November 17, 2023 Filing 108 Joint MOTION for Hearing Joint Mot. to CONVERT 1/4/2024 Hearing to In-Person by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc..(McGonigle, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 107 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re #106 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #92 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 11/17/2023. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
November 3, 2023 Filing 106 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/17/2023 to File Reply ISO MTD by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP.(McGonigle, William) Modified on 11/6/2023 to Correct CM/ECF NextGen Filing Event (Paine, Matthew).
October 19, 2023 Filing 105 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY VIDEO : SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/4/2024 10:15 AM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 19, 2023 Filing 104 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #92 MOTION to Dismiss : This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2024 09:30 AM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
October 18, 2023 Filing 103 Opposition re #92 MOTION to Dismiss filed by David Andrew, Steven Carter, Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC, John Doe, Nathan Goldstein, R. Andre Klein, Steven Linthicum, Alan Murphy, Jr., Denise Remhof. (Haber, Edward)
October 17, 2023 Filing 102 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #96 Motion to Schedule Rule 16 and #100 Response to Motion. " I adopt the defendants' proposal but will decide whether formal discovery goes forward at the hearing on the motion to dismiss." (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
October 16, 2023 Filing 101 MOTION for Leave to File -Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave to File Reply- by David Andrew, Steven Carter, Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC, Nathan Goldstein, R. Andre Klein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Schedule Rule 16 Conference)(Saif, Justin)
October 12, 2023 Filing 100 RESPONSE to Motion re #96 MOTION to Schedule Rule 16 Conference filed by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Re Case Management Order No. 4)(Wiech, Christopher)
October 11, 2023 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian J. McLoughlin on behalf of David Andrew (McLoughlin, Ian)
October 3, 2023 Filing 98 DECLARATION re #96 MOTION to Schedule Rule 16 Conference by David Andrew, Steven Carter, Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC, Nathan Goldstein, R. Andre Klein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Krebs on Security Article dated 9/5/23, #2 Exhibit B - Email Correspondence dated 6/26/23, #3 Exhibit C - Email Correspondence dated 8/3/23)(Saif, Justin)
October 3, 2023 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM in Support re #96 MOTION to Schedule Rule 16 Conference filed by David Andrew, Steven Carter, Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC, Nathan Goldstein, R. Andre Klein. (Saif, Justin)
October 3, 2023 Filing 96 MOTION to Schedule Rule 16 Conference by David Andrew, Steven Carter, Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC, Nathan Goldstein, R. Andre Klein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saif, Justin)
September 20, 2023 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM in Support re #92 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP. (Attachments: #1 Ex1-Security Incident December 2022, #2 Ex2-Security Incident March 2023, #3 Ex3-What Data Was Accessed, #4 Ex4-LastPass Business Terms of Service, #5 Ex5-LastPass Terms of Service, #6 Ex6-LastPass GoTo Terms of Service)(Wiech, Christopher)
September 19, 2023 Filing 94 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re #91 Assented to Motion to Seal Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Counsel will receive an email within twenty-four (24) hours of this order with instructions for submitting sealed documents for which leave has been granted in accordance with the Local Rules of the U.S. District Court of Massachusetts. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
September 19, 2023 Filing 93 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Allowed re #90 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ( 32 Pages). Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
September 18, 2023 Filing 92 MOTION to Dismiss by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Ex.1 Security Incident December 2022 Update, #3 Ex.2 Security Incident March 2023 Update & Actions, #4 Ex.3 Data Accessed, #5 Ex.4 LastPass Business Terms of Service, #6 Ex.5 LastPass Terms of Service, #7 Ex.6 LastPass GoTo Terms of Service)(Wiech, Christopher)
September 18, 2023 Filing 91 Assented to MOTION to Seal Unredacted Memo ISO Mot to Dismiss by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGonigle, William)
September 15, 2023 Filing 90 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wiech, Christopher)
August 23, 2023 Filing 89 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered ALLOWED #88 Consent Motion to Modify Case Management Order No. 2.SET DEADLINES AS TO : Defendants to Respond to Consolidated Complaint, Whether by Answer or Motion due by 9/18/2023; Plaintiffs to File Any Response to Defendants' Motion(s) due by 10/18/2023; Defendants to File any Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition Response due by 11/8/2023. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
August 21, 2023 Filing 88 Consent MOTION to Modify Case Management Order No. 2 by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP, LastPass USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wiech, Christopher)
August 8, 2023 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian J. McLoughlin on behalf of Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC (McLoughlin, Ian)
August 4, 2023 Filing 86 AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against All Defendants, filed by David Andrew, Steven Carter, Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC, John Doe, Nathan Goldstein, R. Andre Klein, LastPass USA, LLC, Steven Linthicum, Alan Murphy, Jr., Denise Remhof.(Haber, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2023: #1 ( Sealed ) Amended Complaint) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
August 2, 2023 Filing 85 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered re #82 Motion for Leave to File to File Amended Complaint Under Seal and to Briefly Extend Time to File Complaint." Allowed. A redacted compliant shall be filed publicly." (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
July 31, 2023 Filing 84 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #83 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Bryan G. Faubus. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
July 28, 2023 Filing 83 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Bryan G. Faubus Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9968177 by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan G. Gaubus)(Pastor, David)
July 17, 2023 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to File to File Amended Complaint Under Seal and to Briefly Extend Time to File Complaint by Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haber, Edward)
July 17, 2023 Filing 81 Filed in error. Please refer to D. #82 . Unopposed MOTION to Seal and for extension of time to file Amended Complaint by Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haber, Edward).
June 28, 2023 Filing 80 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Laura Grace Van Note (Van Note, Laura)
June 3, 2023 Filing 79 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered ALLOWED re #78 Motion for Extension of Time to File Consolidated Complaint. SET DEADLINES AS TO : CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT DUE BY 7/17/2023. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
May 31, 2023 Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 17, 2023 to File Consolidated Complaint by David Andrew, Steven Carter, Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC, John Doe, Nathan Goldstein, R. Andre Klein, Steven Linthicum, Alan Murphy, Jr., Denise Remhof. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ulwick, James)
May 16, 2023 Filing 76 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Kevin Laukaitis (Laukaitis, Kevin)
April 21, 2023 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Reese on behalf of Denise Remhof (Reese, Michael)
April 18, 2023 Filing 74 Judge Patti B. Saris ORDER entered: AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 (CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS AND APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL) (Paine, Matthew)
April 14, 2023 Filing 73 NOTICE of [Proposed ] Assented-To Order Appointing Interim Class Counsel by R. Andre Klein . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orenstein, Nathaniel) Modified docket text on 4/14/2023 (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
April 7, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/transcripts.htm (McDonagh, Christina)
April 7, 2023 Filing 71 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on March 24, 2023, before Judge Patti B. Saris. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com. Redaction Request due 4/28/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2023. (McDonagh, Christina)
March 28, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Love Schubert on behalf of David Andrew (Schubert, Amber)
March 24, 2023 Filing 69 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held on 3/24/2023 before Judge Patti B. Saris: All parties appeared by Video. Motion to consolidate cases and motion to stay deadlines ALLOWED : 22-12047-PBS ( Docket No. #19 , #26 , #39 ); and 23-10004-PBS ( Docket No. #15 ). Court hears arguments on Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel. The parties are ORDERED to confer and file a proposed list of members of the executive committee which includes one counsel for each proposed class. The plaintiffs shall also confer about proposed lead counsel (no more than four).The proposals shall be filed by April 14, 2023. The parties shall also propose by April 14th a scheduling order for the motions. (Attorneys present: All Counsel of Record on Lead Case 1:22-cv-12047-PBS and related cases present)(Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.)Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-12047-PBS et al.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 23, 2023 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to #47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by David Andrew, Nathan Goldstein, Steven Linthicum. (Haber, Edward)
March 22, 2023 Filing 67 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #66 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Molloy, Maryellen)
March 22, 2023 Filing 66 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum Per Local Rule 7.1(b)(3) by David Andrew, Nathan Goldstein, Steven Linthicum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Haber, Edward)
March 22, 2023 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin N. Saif on behalf of R. Andre Klein (Saif, Justin)
March 20, 2023 Filing 64 Opposition re #47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC, John Doe, and R. Andre Klein's Omnibus Memorandum of Law In Opposition to: (1) Motion to Appoint the "Haber Group" As Interim Co-Lead Counsel and (2) Application of Michael R. Reese and Reese LLP for Appointment as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel filed by Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC. (Pastor, David)
March 9, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea M. Lamb on behalf of GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP (Lamb, Chelsea )
March 9, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Wiech on behalf of GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP (Wiech, Christopher)
March 7, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Vallely on behalf of David Andrew, Steven Linthicum (Vallely, Patrick)
March 7, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle H. Blauner on behalf of David Andrew, Steven Linthicum (Blauner, Michelle)
March 7, 2023 Filing 59 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Aaron D. Charfoos. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 7, 2023 Filing 58 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Chelsea M. Lamb and Christopher A. Wiech. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 7, 2023 Filing 57 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Laura Van Note. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 7, 2023 Filing 56 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Scott Edward Cole. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 7, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica C Mirabella on behalf of Denise Remhof (Mirabella, Erica)
March 7, 2023 Filing 54 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #49 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #52 Response to Motion, #51 Response to Motion, #53 Response to Motion, #47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #50 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #48 Proposed Document(s) submitted. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by 3/16/2023. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF and exhibits must be tabbed. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 7, 2023 Filing 53 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel -Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Class Counsel- filed by Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC. (Pastor, David)
March 6, 2023 Filing 52 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel -Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Class Counsel- RESPONSE TO MOTION AND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF MICHAEL REESE AS CO-LEAD COUNSEL filed by Denise Remhof. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Mirabella, Erica)
March 6, 2023 Filing 51 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel -Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Class Counsel- filed by Steven Carter. (Naumes, Robert)
March 6, 2023 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel -Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Class Counsel- filed by David Andrew, Nathan Goldstein, Steven Linthicum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SHU Resume, #2 Exhibit B - Keller Resume, #3 Exhibit C - Hausfeld Resume, #4 Exhibit D - Schubert Resume, #5 Exhibit E - Tyco Resume, #6 Exhibit F - Time and Expense Protocol)(Haber, Edward)
March 6, 2023 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Support re #47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by David Andrew, Nathan Goldstein, Steven Linthicum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SHU Resume, #2 Exhibit B - Keller Resume, #3 Exhibit C - Hausfeld Resume, #4 Exhibit D - Schubert Resume, #5 Exhibit E - Tyco Resume, #6 Exhibit F - Time and Expense Protocol)(Haber, Edward)
March 6, 2023 Filing 48 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC. Document received: [Proposed] Amended Pretrial Order No. 1 (Consolidating Related Actions and Appointing Interim Class Counsel ]. (Pastor, David)
March 6, 2023 Filing 47 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by David Andrew, Nathan Goldstein, Steven Linthicum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Case Management Order)(Haber, Edward)
March 2, 2023 Filing 46 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Aaron D. Charfoos Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9741670 by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Aaron Charfoos)(McGonigle, William)
February 28, 2023 Filing 45 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Chelsea m. Lamb and Christopher A. Wiech Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number AMADC-9737172 by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Chelsea M. Lamb, #2 Certification of Christopher A. Wiech)(McGonigle, William)
February 28, 2023 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Laura Van Note Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9737032 by Steven Carter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Laura Van Note)(Naumes, Robert)
February 28, 2023 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Scott Edward Cole Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9737024 by Steven Carter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Scott Edward Cole)(Naumes, Robert)
February 27, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. McGonigle, III on behalf of GoTo Technologies USA, Inc. (McGonigle, William)
February 27, 2023 Filing 41 Proposed Document(s) submitted by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc.. Document received: Mt to Stay Proceedings (Assented to). (Ausrotas, Raymond)
February 27, 2023 Filing 40 Assented to MEMORANDUM in Support re #39 Assented to MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc.. (Ausrotas, Raymond)
February 27, 2023 Filing 39 Assented to MOTION to Stay Proceedings by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc..(Ausrotas, Raymond)
February 23, 2023 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC NOTICE SETTING HEARING BY VIDEO : (26 in 1:22-cv-12047-PBS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel -Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Class Counsel-, (19 in 1:22-cv-12047-PBS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND APPOINT INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 3/24/2023 09:30 AM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-12047-PBS et al.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 21, 2023 Filing 37 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re #35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel -Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Class Counsel. Steven Carter Response due by 3/6/2023.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 21, 2023 Filing 36 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re re #34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel -Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Class Counsel. Response due by 3/6/2023. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 21, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/6/2023 to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel -Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Class Counsel- by Steven Carter.(Naumes, Robert)
February 17, 2023 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel -Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Class Counsel- by David Andrew.(Vallely, Patrick)
February 15, 2023 Filing 33 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re #32 Stipulation Extending Time to respond filed by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc.Response due by 3/2/2023. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 9, 2023 Filing 32 STIPULATION of the Parties to Extend Time to Respond by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc.. (Ausrotas, Raymond)
February 8, 2023 Filing 31 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re #25 Stipulation Extending Time to respond filed by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc. Response due by 2/9/2023.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 6, 2023 Filing 30 DECLARATION re #27 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel -Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Class Counsel- -Declaration of Nicholas Migliaccio- by R. Andre Klein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Migliaccio & Rathod Firm Resume)(Orenstein, Nathaniel)
February 6, 2023 Filing 29 DECLARATION re #27 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel -Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Class Counsel- -Declaration of Thomas Zimmerman- by R. Andre Klein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Zimmerman Law Offices Firm Resume)(Orenstein, Nathaniel)
February 6, 2023 Filing 28 DECLARATION re #27 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel -Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Class Counsel- -Declaration of Nathaniel L. Orenstein- by R. Andre Klein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Berman Tabacco Firm Resume)(Orenstein, Nathaniel)
February 6, 2023 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel -Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Class Counsel- filed by R. Andre Klein. (Orenstein, Nathaniel)
February 6, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Counsel -Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Class Counsel- ( Responses due by 2/21/2023) by R. Andre Klein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orenstein, Nathaniel)
February 3, 2023 Filing 25 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc.. (Ausrotas, Raymond)
January 31, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Related Case and Intent to Oppose Motion to Consolidate by R. Andre Klein re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND APPOINT INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL.(Orenstein, Nathaniel)
January 31, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel L. Orenstein on behalf of R. Andre Klein (Orenstein, Nathaniel)
January 27, 2023 Filing 22 DECLARATION re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND APPOINT INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL by Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pastor, David)
January 27, 2023 Filing 21 DECLARATION re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND APPOINT INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL by Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pastor, David)
January 27, 2023 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND APPOINT INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL filed by Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC. (Pastor, David)
January 27, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND APPOINT INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL by Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pastor, David)
January 26, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David Pastor on behalf of Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC (Pastor, David)
January 26, 2023 Filing 17 STIPULATION of All Parties and Proposed Order to Extend Time to respond to Complaint by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc.. (Ausrotas, Raymond)
December 23, 2022 Filing 16 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Response to Complaint GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP. ANSWER DUE BY 1/26/23.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 22, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/26/23 to Response to Complaint by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP.(Ausrotas, Raymond)
December 15, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed LastPass US LP served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
December 15, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed GoTo Technologies USA, Inc. served on 12/5/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
December 12, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Flick on behalf of Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC (Flick, Brian)
December 12, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr on behalf of Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC (Zimmerman, Thomas)
December 9, 2022 Filing 10 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brian D. Flick. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McManus, Caetlin)
December 9, 2022 Filing 9 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Marc E. Dann. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McManus, Caetlin)
December 9, 2022 Filing 8 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McManus, Caetlin)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian D. Flick Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9618566 by Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian D. Flick)(Quat, Kenneth)
December 7, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Marc E. Dann Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9618555 by Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Marc E. Dann)(Quat, Kenneth)
December 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. by Plaintiff Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9617437. Payment Type : PRO HAC VICE. (Quat, Kenneth)
December 6, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. by Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr., Esq.)(Quat, Kenneth)
December 2, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
December 2, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
December 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9611155 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Quat, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC v. GoTo Technologies USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth D. Quat
Represented By: David Pastor
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr
Represented By: James A. Ulwick
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Represented By: Justin N. Saif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Carter
Represented By: Laura Grace Van Note
Represented By: Scott Edward Cole
Represented By: Robert T. Naumes, Jr.
Represented By: James A. Ulwick
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Represented By: Justin N. Saif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoTo Technologies USA, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond P. Ausrotas
Represented By: Aaron Daniel Charfoos
Represented By: Chelsea M. Lamb
Represented By: Christopher A. Wiech
Represented By: William F. McGonigle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LastPass US LP
Represented By: Raymond P. Ausrotas
Represented By: Chelsea M. Lamb
Represented By: Aaron Daniel Charfoos
Represented By: Christopher A. Wiech
Represented By: William F. McGonigle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: R. Andre Klein
Represented By: Nathaniel L. Orenstein
Represented By: Justin N. Saif
Represented By: James A. Ulwick
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: David Andrew
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Represented By: Amber Love Schubert
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Represented By: Michelle H. Blauner
Represented By: Patrick J. Vallely
Represented By: James A. Ulwick
Represented By: Justin N. Saif
Represented By: Ian J. McLoughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Steven Linthicum
Represented By: Cort T Carlson
Represented By: Sabita J. Soneji
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Represented By: Michelle H. Blauner
Represented By: Patrick J. Vallely
Represented By: James A. Ulwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Denise Remhof
Represented By: Kevin Laukaitis
Represented By: Michael R. Reese
Represented By: Charles D. Moore
Represented By: Erica C Mirabella
Represented By: James A. Ulwick
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Alan Murphy, Jr.
Represented By: Bryan Paul Thompson
Represented By: David Pastor
Represented By: James A. Ulwick
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Nathan Goldstein
Represented By: Amy E Keller
Represented By: James D. Gotz
Represented By: Steven N. Nathan
Represented By: James J. Pizzirusso
Represented By: James A. Ulwick
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Represented By: Justin N. Saif
Represented By: Steven M. Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Jason S. Rathod
Represented By: David Pastor
Represented By: Nicholas A. Migliaccio
Represented By: Tyler J. Bean
Represented By: James A. Ulwick
Represented By: Bryan G. Faubus
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: LastPass USA, LLC
Represented By: William F. McGonigle, III
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Represented By: Christopher A. Wiech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?