Precht v. RealPage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Precht
Defendant: RealPage, Inc., Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, Cushman & Wakefield Inc., lincoln property company, peabody properties, inc, WinnCompanies LLC, WinnResidential Manager Corp., UDR, Inc., SHP Management Corp., The Related Companies, Inc and Simpson Property Group, LLLP
Case Number: 1:2022cv12230
Filed: December 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2023 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
February 23, 2023 Filing 24 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Orlandi, Anthony)
February 14, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE by Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC of Motion for Transfer and Consolidation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Noonan, Gregory)
February 14, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory F Noonan on behalf of Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC (Noonan, Gregory)
February 14, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kayla Ghantous on behalf of Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC (Ghantous, Kayla)
February 13, 2023 Filing 20 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #19 MOTION to Suspend the Deadline for Certain Defendants to Respond to Complaint Stipulated Motion. Allowed in part, to the extent the court reserves the right to revisit this ruling at any time. (Russo, Noreen)
February 10, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Suspend the Deadline for Certain Defendants to Respond to Complaint Stipulated Motion by David Precht. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Orlandi, Anthony)
February 6, 2023 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Precht. Cushman & Wakefield Inc. waiver sent on 1/30/2023, answer due 3/31/2023. (Orlandi, Anthony)
January 30, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed WinnResidential Manager Corp. served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. (Orlandi, Anthony)
January 30, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed WinnCompanies LLC served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. (Orlandi, Anthony)
January 30, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Peabody Properties, Inc served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. (Orlandi, Anthony)
January 30, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed SHP Management Corp. served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. (Orlandi, Anthony)
January 30, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. (Orlandi, Anthony)
January 30, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed The Related Companies, Inc served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. (Orlandi, Anthony)
January 30, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Simpson Property Group, LLLP served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. (Orlandi, Anthony)
January 27, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE by David Precht of Related Case (Orlandi, Anthony)
January 26, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Precht. Lincoln Property Company waiver sent on 1/19/2023, answer due 3/20/2023. (Herzfeld, Tricia)
January 25, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Precht. RealPage, Inc. waiver sent on 1/18/2023, answer due 3/20/2023. (Herzfeld, Tricia)
January 23, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tricia R Herzfeld on behalf of David Precht (Herzfeld, Tricia)
January 3, 2023 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Tricia R. Herzfeld. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney.; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John F. Garvey, Jr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Russo, Noreen)
December 30, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John F. Garvey, Jr. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9648496 by David Precht. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of John F. Garvey)(Orlandi, Anthony)
December 30, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cushman & Wakefield Inc., Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC, Lincoln Property Company, Peabody Properties, Inc, RealPage, Inc., SHP Management Corp., Simpson Property Group, LLLP, The Related Companies, Inc, UDR, Inc., WinnCompanies LLC, WinnResidential Manager Corp.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dore, Samantha)
December 30, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
December 29, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tricia R. Herzfeld Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9648098 by David Precht. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Tricia Herzfeld)(Orlandi, Anthony)
December 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number BMADC-9648097 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by David Precht. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Orlandi, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precht v. RealPage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Precht
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Tricia R Herzfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RealPage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC
Represented By: Gregory F Noonan
Represented By: Kayla Ghantous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cushman & Wakefield Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lincoln property company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: peabody properties, inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WinnCompanies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WinnResidential Manager Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHP Management Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Related Companies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simpson Property Group, LLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?