Stillwater Designs and Audio, Inc. v. SATTI LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stillwater Designs and Audio, Inc. doing business as Kicker
Defendant: SATTI LLC doing business as DRE RO, Amazon Seller ID ARTVUVTVKE7T6, currently doing business as lordvoice, Amazon Seller ID A1PUELP7N6FQ9, currently doing business as ShinnyStar, Amazon Seller ID ARTVUVTVKE7T6 currently doing business as lordvoice and Amazon Seller ID A1PUELP7N6FQ9 currently doing business as ShinnyStar
Case Number: 1:2023cv10061
Filed: January 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants by Stillwater Designs and Audio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Brodsky, Jack)
February 28, 2023 Filing 17 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 MOTION Third Party Discovery (Currie, Haley)
February 14, 2023 Filing 16 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re #14 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default, #15 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default (Currie, Haley)
February 14, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Amazon Seller ID A1PUELP7N6FQ9 - doing business as ShinnyStar (Currie, Haley)
February 14, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Amazon Seller ID ARTVUVTVKE7T6 - doing business as Iordvoice (Currie, Haley)
February 14, 2023 Filing 13 Request for notice of default by Stillwater Designs and Audio, Inc. of Defendants lordvoice and ShinnyStar. (Brodsky, Jack)
February 9, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION Third Party Discovery by Stillwater Designs and Audio, Inc..(Nickerson, Morgan)
February 2, 2023 Filing 11 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re #10 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default (Currie, Haley)
February 2, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SATTI LLC (Currie, Haley)
February 1, 2023 Filing 9 Request for notice of default by Stillwater Designs and Audio, Inc. of Defendant SATTI LLC. (Brodsky, Jack)
February 1, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Stillwater Designs and Audio, Inc.. Amazon Seller ID A1PUELP7N6FQ9, currently doing business as ShinnyStar served on 1/20/2023, answer due 2/10/2023; Amazon Seller ID ARTVUVTVKE7T6, currently doing business as lordvoice served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023; SATTI LLC served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. Acknowledgement filed by Stillwater Designs and Audio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Brodsky, Jack)
January 20, 2023 Filing 7 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Alternative Service of Process by Stillwater Designs and Audio, Inc. (Hourihan, Lisa)
January 13, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS by Stillwater Designs and Audio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Order, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Order, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Order)(Brodsky, Jack)
January 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack S. Brodsky on behalf of Stillwater Designs and Audio, Inc. (Brodsky, Jack)
January 10, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Amazon Seller ID A1PUELP7N6FQ9, currently doing business as ShinnyStar, Amazon Seller ID ARTVUVTVKE7T6, currently doing business as lordvoice, SATTI LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
January 10, 2023 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
January 10, 2023 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Nickerson, Morgan)
January 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9661313 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Stillwater Designs and Audio, Inc. d/b/a Kicker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Nickerson, Morgan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stillwater Designs and Audio, Inc. v. SATTI LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stillwater Designs and Audio, Inc. doing business as Kicker
Represented By: Morgan T. Nickerson
Represented By: Jack S. Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SATTI LLC doing business as DRE RO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Seller ID ARTVUVTVKE7T6, currently doing business as lordvoice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Seller ID A1PUELP7N6FQ9, currently doing business as ShinnyStar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Seller ID ARTVUVTVKE7T6 currently doing business as lordvoice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Seller ID A1PUELP7N6FQ9 currently doing business as ShinnyStar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?