Fustolo v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steven C. Fustolo
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp. as Trustee of SCRT 2019-2 and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp.
Case Number: 1:2023cv10166
Filed: January 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Referring Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2023 Filing 18 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 25, 2023 to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Unopposed) Responses due by 3/27/2023 (Hourihan, Lisa)
March 13, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 25, 2023 to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Unopposed) by Steven C. Fustolo.(Culik, Joe)
March 1, 2023 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Carr, Peter)
March 1, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..(Carr, Peter)
February 24, 2023 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Denise J. Casper added. Judge Patti B. Saris no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
February 24, 2023 Filing 13 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 21, 2023 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
February 21, 2023 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Patti B. Saris added. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
February 21, 2023 Filing 10 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Carr, Peter)
February 21, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms should be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
February 17, 2023 Filing 8 STATE COURT Record. (Carr, Peter)
February 8, 2023 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp. for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc... (Carr, Peter)
February 8, 2023 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp. as Trustee of SCRT 2019-2. (Carr, Peter)
February 2, 2023 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time (DLC, law1)
February 1, 2023 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 1, 2023 to Respond to Complaint by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp. as Trustee of SCRT 2019-2, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..(Carr, Peter)
January 26, 2023 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Dore, Samantha)
January 26, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
January 26, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp. as Trustee of SCRT 2019-2, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9686730 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Carr, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/26/2023: #3 Exhibit) (Dore, Samantha). (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/26/2023) (Dore, Samantha).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fustolo v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven C. Fustolo
Represented By: Joe Dye Culik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Francis Carr, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp. as Trustee of SCRT 2019-2
Represented By: Peter Francis Carr, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp.
Represented By: Peter Francis Carr, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?