Quincy Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Hoverzon, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Quincy Mutual Fire Insurance Company A/S/O Evan & Sharon Gold and Quincy Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Hoverzon, LLC and Amazon.Com Services, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Judge Paul G. Levenson
Case Number: 1:2023cv10347
Filed: February 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2023 Filing 30 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered ALLOWED re #29 Amended Joint Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1. SET DEADLINES AS TO: Amended Pleadings due by 7/17/2023; Fact Discovery to be completed by 10/2/2023; Dispositive Motions and/or All Daubert Motions due by 2/15/2024. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
April 12, 2023 Filing 29 Amended JOINT STATEMENT of counsel The Parties Amended Joint Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1. (Lantry, Jacob)
April 10, 2023 Filing 28 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Paul G. Levenson appointed for a mediation date in Fall 2023.(Simeone, Maria)
April 7, 2023 Filing 27 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution- FALL 2023. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
April 6, 2023 Filing 25 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3) by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. (Lantry, Jacob)
April 5, 2023 Filing 26 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris: Scheduling Conference held by Video on 4/5/2023. Joint Statement - Adopted with modifications- AMENDED JOINT STATEMENT DUE BY 4/20/2023. Case to be referred to ADR - FALL 2023. (Attorneys present: Michael R. O'Malley, Praven Shenoy for Plaintiff, Jacob J. Lantry for Defendant -Amazon.Com Services, LLC, Alison Feeley - Hoverzon, LLC) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 31, 2023 Filing 24 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Giroux, Jared)
March 30, 2023 Filing 23 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Plaintiff. (Shenoy, Praven)
March 28, 2023 Filing 22 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Amazon.Com Services, LLC.(Lantry, Jacob)
March 23, 2023 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amazon.Com Services, LLC. (Lantry, Jacob)
March 21, 2023 Filing 20 ANSWER to Crossclaim by Hoverzon, LLC.(Giroux, Jared)
March 16, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Praven Shenoy on behalf of Quincy Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Shenoy, Praven)
February 28, 2023 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Hoverzon, LLC by Amazon.Com Services, LLC.(Lantry, Jacob)
February 24, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY VIDEO: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/6/2023 09:30 AM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 24, 2023 Filing 16 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re #13 Stipulation For Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Hoverzon, LLC Answer due by 3/2/2023.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 24, 2023 Filing 15 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Amazon.Com Services, LLC Answer due 3/2/2023. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 24, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Hoverzon, LLC.(Giroux, Jared)
February 23, 2023 Filing 13 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hoverzon, LLC. (Giroux, Jared)
February 22, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT up to and including March 2, 2023 by Amazon.Com Services, LLC. (Lantry, Jacob)
February 22, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Campbell on behalf of Amazon.Com Services, LLC (Campbell, James)
February 22, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob J. Lantry on behalf of Amazon.Com Services, LLC (Lantry, Jacob)
February 21, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Patti B. Saris added. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
February 21, 2023 Filing 8 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Belmont, Kellyann)
February 21, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin added. Judge Indira Talwani no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
February 21, 2023 Filing 6 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(MacDonald, Gail)
February 17, 2023 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
February 17, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
February 16, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hoverzon, LLC. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
February 16, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared B. Giroux on behalf of Hoverzon, LLC. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
February 16, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hoverzon, LLC ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9723383 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Service letter, #3 Exhibit C- Civil Action Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D- Amazon Consent for Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Form, # (7) Notice of Appearance- JBG, # (8) 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Giroux, Jared) Modified on 2/17/2023: removed attachments 7 and 8 to file as separate entries (de Oliveira, Flaviana).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quincy Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Hoverzon, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincy Mutual Fire Insurance Company A/S/O Evan & Sharon Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincy Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: James T. Buchanan
Represented By: Michael R. O'Malley
Represented By: Praven Shenoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoverzon, LLC
Represented By: Jared B. Giroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com Services, LLC
Represented By: Jacob J. Lantry
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Judge Paul G. Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?