Murphy v. LastPass US LP et al
Plaintiff: Alan Murphy, Jr.
Defendant: LastPass US LP and GoTo Technologies USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv10415
Filed: February 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2023 Filing 16 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held on 3/24/2023 before Judge Patti B. Saris: All parties appeared by Video. Motion to consolidate cases and motion to stay deadlines ALLOWED : 22-12047-PBS ( Docket No. 19 , 26 , 39 ); and 23-10004-PBS ( Docket No. #15 ). Court hears arguments on Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel. The parties are ORDERED to confer and file a proposed list of members of the executive committee which includes one counsel for each proposed class. The plaintiffs shall also confer about proposed lead counsel (no more than four).The proposals shall be filed by April 14, 2023. The parties shall also propose by April 14th a scheduling order for the motions. (Attorneys present: All Counsel of Record on Lead Case 1:22-cv-12047-PBS and related cases present)(Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.)Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-12047-PBS et al.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 7, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David Pastor on behalf of Alan Murphy, Jr (Pastor, David)
February 23, 2023 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE SETTING HEARING BY VIDEO : (26 in 1:22-cv-12047-PBS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel -Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Class Counsel-, (19 in 1:22-cv-12047-PBS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND APPOINT INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 3/24/2023 09:30 AM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-12047-PBS et al.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 21, 2023 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
February 21, 2023 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:23-cv-00627.
February 13, 2023 Filing 11 TRANSFERRED to the District of Massachusetts the electronic record via email. (gcy, )
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court grants the parties' motion to transfer #8 and transfers this case to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, forthwith. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 2/13/2023:Mailed notice(gcy, )
February 8, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Aaron Daniel Charfoos for presentment of motion to transfer case, #8 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 2/14/2023 at 09:45 AM. (Charfoos, Aaron)
February 8, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP to transfer case to USDC Massachusetts (CONSENTED) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Murphy First Amended Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Doe Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Carter Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Klein Complaint)(Charfoos, Aaron)
February 6, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 4/4/2023 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' website and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 3/28/2023. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
February 2, 2023 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (daj, )
February 2, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (daj, )
February 2, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, )
February 1, 2023 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by LastPass US LP (Charfoos, Aaron)
February 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc. (Charfoos, Aaron)
February 1, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alan Murphy, Jr by Bryan Paul Thompson (Thompson, Bryan)
February 1, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP by Aaron Daniel Charfoos (Charfoos, Aaron)
February 1, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Charfoos, Aaron)
February 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2022CH12414) filed by GoTo Technologies USA, Inc., LastPass US LP Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20308641. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Charfoos, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. LastPass US LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Murphy, Jr.
Represented By: Bryan Paul Thompson
Represented By: David Pastor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LastPass US LP
Represented By: Aaron Daniel Charfoos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoTo Technologies USA, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Daniel Charfoos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?