Wright et al v. Cummins Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bruce S Wright and Louise K Wright
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Cameron International Corporation f/k/a Cooper Cameron Corporation, individually and as successor-in-interest to The Cooper-Bessemer Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Elliott Company, Flowserve US Inc. individually and as successor-in-interest to Edward Valves, Inc., FMC Corporation individually and as successor-in-interest to Northern Pumps, Jenkins Bros., Paramount Global, f/k/a ViacomCBS Inc., f/k/a Viacom Inc., f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a, Redco Corporation f/k/a Crane Co., Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corp., a/k/a Lidgerwood Manufacturing Co., individually and as successor to M.T. Davidson Co., Valves and Controls US, Inc. f/k/a Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc., f/k/a Motion Control Industries, Inc., CRA Trailers, Inc. f/k/a Great Dane Trailers, Inc., Daimler Truck North America LLC f/k/a Daimler Trucks North America LLC f/k/a Freightliner LLC f/k/a Freightliner Corporation, individually and as successor to Western Star Trucks, DCo LLC f/k/a Dana Companies LLC, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, as successor to Felt Products Manufacturing Co. and/or the former Vellumoid Division of Federal-Mogul Corporation, Fleetpride, Inc., Ford Motor Company, Genuine Parts Company, d/b/a NAPA, Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Honeywell International Inc., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., as successor-in-interest to The Bendix Corporation, Lipe Automation Corp. f/k/a Lipe-Rollway Corporation, a dissolved New York corporation, Mack Trucks, Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to Brockway Motor Company, Meritor, Inc., f/k/a ArvinMeritor, Inc., successor-in-interest to Rockwell International Corporation, Morse TEC LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation, Navistar, Inc., successor to International Truck and Engine Company f/k/a International Harvester Company, Paccar Inc., d/b/a Kenworth Truck Company and Peterbilt Truck Company, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, successor to EIS Automotive Corporation, Pneumo Abex LLC, successor-in-interest to Abex Corporation, Standard Motor Products, Inc., successor-in-interest to EIS Automotive Corporation, Strick Trailers, LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest to Strick Corporation f/k/a Strick Trailer Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Western Star Truck Sales, Inc., ZF Active Safety US Inc., f/k/a Kelsey-Hayes Company, individually and as successor-in-interest to Fruehauf Corporation, Redco Corporation, Valves and Controls US, Inc., CRA Trailers, Inc., Daimler Truck North America LLC, Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, Honeywell International Inc., Meritor, Inc., Morse TEC LLC and Paccar, Inc. d/b/a KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY and PETERBILT TRUCK COMPANY
Cross Claimant: Cummins Inc., Alfa Laval Inc., IMO Industries Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, inc., DCo LLC, Genuine Parts Company d/b/a NAPA, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pneumo Abex LLC, Standard Motor Products, Inc., Strick Trailers, LLC., ZF Active Safety US Inc and Paccar Inc.
Cross Defendant: General Electric Company, ITT LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Caterpillar Inc., Detroit Diesel Corporation, Eaton Corporation, McCord Corporation, Scan-Pac Mfg., Inc., The Timken Company, Volvo Group North America, LLC, Cameron International Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., FMC Corporation, Paramount Global, Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation, Lipe Automation Corporation, Mack Trucks, Inc. and Navistar, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv10496
Filed: March 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Filing 218 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Gibbons on behalf of Navistar, Inc.(C, f/k/a BORG WARNER MORSE TEC LLC, successor-by-merger to BORG-WARNER CORPORATION ) (Gibbons, Brian)
October 2, 2023 Filing 217 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: SCHEDULING ORDER entered. (Simeone, Maria)
October 2, 2023 Filing 216 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #214 Motion for Extension of Time. (Bowler, Marianne)
September 26, 2023 Filing 215 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 9/26/2023.1:17-cv-11004-DJC Laporte Case -This case has resolved. Sixty Day Settlement Order of Dismissal entered on September 21, 2023. (Entry No. 616).1:19-cv-10282-NMG McIsaac Case -The one remaining defendant is General Electric Company. The case is being returned back from Alternative Dispute Resolution. Parties are discussing a schedule.1:19-cv-11284-ADB Lee Case -2 remaining defendants. Assigned to Trial Group N. Plaintiff has communicated settlement demands to the two remaining defendants. Parties to schedule settlement conference.1:22-cv-10243-FDS Callahan Case -Mr. Callahans depo was completed prior to passing. The complaint has been amended to reflect the passing. The Parties seeking referral to Alternative Dispute Resolution.1:23-cv-10327-LTS King Case -Mr. Kings depo has been concluded. Case is proceeding on the group U deadlines.1:23-cv-10866-FDS Morgan Case -The parties have filed a joint motion to assign group V doc. no. 976 pending. Upon approval a joint motion to transfer the case to trial group v will be filed.1:20-cv-10964-DJC Chamberlain case -4 defendants remaining in the case. Parties are continuing to engage in settlement discussions.1:22-cv-11733-NMG Gillis case -Mediation held, 11 remaining defendants. Plaintiffs expert report has been filed. Ongoing negotiations continuing.1:23-cv-10496-RWZ Wright case -Joint Motion to Extend Pre-Trial Deadlines filed September 25, 2023 (Entry No. 214) with Modified Pre-Trial Preparation Schedule attached as Exhibit B (Entry No. 214-2). Pending for Judge Bowlers review. The next Status Conference has been set for 11/28/2023 02:30 PM in Courtroom 7 (In person with remote access provided) before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/Audio.html. For a transcript of this proceeding, contact mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11532-RWZ et al.(Simeone, Maria)
September 25, 2023 Filing 214 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Pre-Trial Deadlines by Bruce S Wright, Louise K Wright. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Pre-Trial Preparation Schedule for Cases in Group U, #2 Ex. B - Modified Pre-Trial Preparation Schedule for Wright)(Duffy, Christopher)
September 5, 2023 Filing 213 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by John F. Rooney on behalf of Defendant Lipe Automation Corporation (Rooney, John)
September 5, 2023 Filing 212 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by John F. Rooney on behalf of Defendant, Valves and Controls US, Inc. (Rooney, John)
September 5, 2023 Filing 211 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by John F. Rooney on behalf of Defendant, Superior Ligerwood Mundy Corp., as successor-in-interest to M.T. Davidson (Rooney, John)
August 30, 2023 Filing 210 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Robbie on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Robbie, Eric)
August 17, 2023 Filing 209 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER entered as to UMass Memorial Medical Center.(Simeone, Maria)
August 17, 2023 Filing 208 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: PROTECTIVE ORDER entered as to Backus Hospital, Pathology Department.(Simeone, Maria)
August 17, 2023 Filing 207 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #206 Motion to Compel. (Bowler, Marianne)
August 4, 2023 Filing 206 Assented to MOTION to Compel Production of All Original Pathology Materials by Bruce S Wright, Louise K Wright. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Backus Hospital Cytology Report, #2 Ex. 2 - UMass Memorial Med Ctr Pathology Report, #3 Ex. 3 - Letter and Authorization Requesting Pathology from UMass, #4 Ex. 4 - Letter and Authorization Requesting Cytology from Backus, #5 Ex. 5 - UMass Refusal to Release Pathology to Plaintiffs, #6 Ex. 6 - Backus Refusal to Release Pathology to Plaintiffs, #7 Ex. 7 - Scannell Order for UMass to Release Pathology to Plaintiff)(Duffy, Christopher)
July 25, 2023 Filing 205 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 7/25/2023. Counsel state the status of each case as stated in the agenda docket no. 974. 17-11004-DJC Laporte Case - one remaining defendant. Counsel are discussing experts. Expert reports due 10/13/23. Continuing to discuss resolution by settlement. 17-12237-RGS Studebaker case - Resolved, 60 day settlement order was entered. The case can be removed from the asbestos docket. 19-10282-NMG McIsaac Case - General Electric is the only remaining defendant in the case. Counsel are discussing a schedule. 19-11284-ADB Lee Case - 2 remaining defendants. The parties are discussing settlement. 19-12456-ADB Turner Case - This case is resolved. An Order dismissing the case will be entered and this case can be removed from the asbestos docket. 20-10964-DJC Chamberlain Case - case has 5 remaining defendants they are negotiating in settlement negotiations. 22-10243-FDS Callahan case - Mr. Callahans deposition has been completed before he passed away. Amended complaint has been filed to include the substitution of parties. The parties will be seeking a referral to ADR. 22-11733-NMG Gillis case - Referred to ADR before DLC. 23-10327- LTS King Case - Mr. Kings deposition is under way. 23-10496-RWZ Wright case - Assigned to trial group U. Parties are in fact discovery until November. 23-10866-FDS Morgan Case - The parties are proceeding forward with discovery and depositions. The next Status Conference has been set for 9/26/2023 02:30 PM in Courtroom 7 (In person with remote access provided) before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler.). This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/Audio.html. For a transcript of this proceeding, contact mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Atty Landry; Atty McCann; Atty Duffy; Atty Armato) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11532-RWZ et al.(Simeone, Maria)
June 30, 2023 Filing 204 NOTICE by Bruce S Wright, Louise K Wright Plaintiffs' Disclosure of Product Identification Information (Duffy, Christopher)
June 13, 2023 Filing 203 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bruce S Wright, Louise K Wright (Duffy, Christopher)
June 13, 2023 Filing 202 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Alfa Laval Inc.. (Schwindt, Jordan)
June 1, 2023 Filing 200 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.. (Felice, John)
June 1, 2023 Filing 199 Acknowledgment of Service in Lieu of ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Felice, John)
June 1, 2023 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad W. Graham on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Graham, Brad) (Main Document 198 replaced on 6/2/2023 to reflect corrected title) (Warnock, Douglas).
June 1, 2023 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Felice on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Felice, John)
May 25, 2023 Filing 196 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re ECF Nos. #191 , #192 , #193 : Please note that the "Notice of Appearance" filing event is to be used when an attorney is filing an appearance into a case. Any other document should be used with it's proper filing event. Counsel is reminded to review the local rules and the attorney handbook when filing documents with the Court by accessing our web page, at www.mad.uscourts.gov under CM/ECF E-Filing. (Warnock, Douglas)
May 22, 2023 Filing 195 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Detroit Diesel Corporation. (Sbarra, Anthony)
May 22, 2023 Filing 194 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Daimler Truck North America LLC. (Sbarra, Anthony)
May 22, 2023 Filing 193 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE AND ADOPTION OF MODEL CROSS-CLAIM AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DAIMLER TRUCK NORTH AMERICA LLC (Sbarra, Anthony) Modified docket text on 5/25/2023 as it was inaccurately identifying the filing as a Notice of Appearance (Warnock, Douglas).
May 22, 2023 Filing 192 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE AND ADOPTION OF MODEL CROSS-CLAIM AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DETROIT DIESEL CORPORATION (Sbarra, Anthony) Modified docket text on 5/25/2023 as it was inaccurately identifying the filing as a Notice of Appearance (Warnock, Douglas).
May 22, 2023 Filing 191 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE AND ADOPTION OF MODEL CROSS-CLAIM AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF NAVISTAR (Polglase, Holly) Modified docket text on 5/25/2023 as it was inaccurately identifying the filing as a Notice of Appearance (Warnock, Douglas).
May 22, 2023 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah P. Kelly on behalf of Hollingsworth & Vose Company (Kelly, Sarah)
May 22, 2023 Filing 189 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Brake on behalf of Hollingsworth & Vose Company (Brake, Stephen)
May 22, 2023 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariel T. Smith on behalf of Hollingsworth & Vose Company (Smith, Mariel)
May 15, 2023 Filing 187 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McCord Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Kautex Inc. for McCord Corporation.. (Kelly, Nancy)
May 15, 2023 Filing 186 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by McCord Corporation.(Kelly, Nancy)
May 15, 2023 Filing 185 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ZF Active Safety US Inc. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 184 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint and Model Asbestos, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by DCo LLC( f/k/a DANA COMPANIES LLC). (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 183 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint and Model Asbestos, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Scan-Pac Mfg., Inc.. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 182 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint and Model Asbestos, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pneumo Abex LLC(successor-in-interest to ABEX CORPORATION ). (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 181 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint and Model Asbestos, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ZF Active Safety US Inc(f/k/a KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY, individually and as successor-in-interest to FRUEHAUF CORPORATION). (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 180 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint and Model Asbestos, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Standard Motor Products, Inc.(successor-in-interest to EIS AUTOMOTIVE CORPORATION). (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 179 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint and Model Asbestos, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 178 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strick Trailers, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Diamatrix, Inc. for Strick Trailers, LLC... (Martin, Adam)
May 15, 2023 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam C. Martin on behalf of Strick Trailers, LLC. (Martin, Adam)
May 15, 2023 Filing 176 Short Form Acknowledgement of Service in Lieu of ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Model Asbestos, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Strick Trailers, LLC..(Martin, Adam)
May 15, 2023 Filing 175 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Standard Motor Products, Inc.. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 174 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford V. Pascarella on behalf of McCord Corporation (Pascarella, Clifford)
May 15, 2023 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn B. Coffin, Jr on behalf of McCord Corporation (Coffin, Glenn)
May 15, 2023 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Kelly on behalf of McCord Corporation (Kelly, Nancy)
May 15, 2023 Filing 170 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 169 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scan-Pac Mfg., Inc.. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 168 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DCo LLC. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Armato, Stephen)
May 15, 2023 Filing 166 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Standard Motor Products, Inc.(successor-in-interest to EIS AUTOMOTIVE CORPORATION) (Armato, Stephen)
May 15, 2023 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Scan-Pac Mfg., Inc. (Armato, Stephen)
May 15, 2023 Filing 164 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of ZF Active Safety US Inc(f/k/a KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY, individually and as successor-in-interest to FRUEHAUF CORPORATION) (Armato, Stephen)
May 15, 2023 Filing 163 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC(successor-in-interest to ABEX CORPORATION ) (Armato, Stephen)
May 15, 2023 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of DCo LLC( f/k/a DANA COMPANIES LLC) (Armato, Stephen)
May 15, 2023 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Standard Motor Products, Inc.(successor-in-interest to EIS AUTOMOTIVE CORPORATION) (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Scan-Pac Mfg., Inc. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of ZF Active Safety US Inc(f/k/a KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY, individually and as successor-in-interest to FRUEHAUF CORPORATION) (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC(successor-in-interest to ABEX CORPORATION ) (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of DCo LLC( f/k/a DANA COMPANIES LLC) (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 155 Short Form Acknowledgement of Service in Lieu of ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Model Asbestos, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Parker-Hannifin Corporation(successor to EIS AUTOMOTIVE CORPORATION).(Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 154 Short Form Acknowledgement of Service in Lieu of ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Model Asbestos, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Scan-Pac Mfg., Inc..(Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 153 Short Form Acknowledgement of Service in Lieu of ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Model Asbestos, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Standard Motor Products, Inc.(successor-in-interest to EIS AUTOMOTIVE CORPORATION).(Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 152 Short Form Acknowledgement of Service in Lieu of ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Model Asbestos, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ZF Active Safety US Inc(f/k/a KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY, individually and as successor-in-interest to FRUEHAUF CORPORATION).(Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 151 Short Form Acknowledgement of Service in Lieu of ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Model Asbestos, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Pneumo Abex LLC(successor-in-interest to ABEX CORPORATION ).(Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 15, 2023 Filing 150 Short Form Acknowledgement of Service in Lieu of ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Model Asbestos, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by DCo LLC( f/k/a DANA COMPANIES LLC).(Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 8, 2023 Filing 149 Acknowledgment of Service in Lieu of ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Hollingsworth & Vose Company.(Bhakhri, Ritika)
May 8, 2023 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Honeywell International Inc.(f/k/a ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., as successor-in-interest to THE BENDIX CORPORATION ) (Armato, Stephen)
May 8, 2023 Filing 147 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Honeywell International Inc.. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 8, 2023 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Honeywell International Inc.(f/k/a ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., as successor-in-interest to THE BENDIX CORPORATION ) (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 8, 2023 Filing 145 Short Form Acknowledgment of Service in Lieu of ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Model Asbestos, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International Inc.(f/k/a ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., as successor-in-interest to THE BENDIX CORPORATION ).(Cetrulo, Lawrence)
April 27, 2023 Filing 144 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Morse TEC LLC.(DeLuzio, Maria)
April 27, 2023 Filing 143 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Warren Pumps LLC.(DeLuzio, Maria)
April 27, 2023 Filing 142 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by IMO Industries Inc..(DeLuzio, Maria)
April 27, 2023 Filing 141 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Cummins Inc..(DeLuzio, Maria)
April 27, 2023 Filing 140 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Caterpillar Inc..(Hoover, Mark)
April 24, 2023 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon M. O'Neil on behalf of Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation (O'Neil, Shannon)
April 24, 2023 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon M. O'Neil on behalf of Lipe Automation Corporation (O'Neil, Shannon)
April 24, 2023 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon M. O'Neil on behalf of Valves and Controls US, Inc. (O'Neil, Shannon)
April 18, 2023 Filing 136 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation.(Rooney, John)
April 18, 2023 Filing 135 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation. (Rooney, John)
April 18, 2023 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Rooney on behalf of Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation (Rooney, John)
April 18, 2023 Filing 133 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Lipe Automation Corporation.(Rooney, John)
April 18, 2023 Filing 132 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lipe Automation Corporation. (Rooney, John)
April 18, 2023 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Rooney on behalf of Lipe Automation Corporation (Rooney, John)
April 18, 2023 Filing 130 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Valves and Controls US, Inc..(Rooney, John)
April 18, 2023 Filing 129 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Valves and Controls US, Inc.. (Rooney, John)
April 18, 2023 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Rooney on behalf of Valves and Controls US, Inc. (Rooney, John)
April 18, 2023 Filing 127 Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/23/2023 02:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11532-RWZ et al.(Simeone, Maria)
April 13, 2023 Filing 126 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Chadwick, Tierney)
April 13, 2023 Filing 125 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Volvo Group North America, LLC identifying Other Affiliate VNA Holding, Inc. for Volvo Group North America, LLC.. (Chadwick, Tierney)
April 13, 2023 Filing 124 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Mack Trucks, Inc.. (Chadwick, Tierney)
April 13, 2023 Filing 123 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mack Trucks, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Volvo Group North America, LLC for Mack Trucks, Inc... (Chadwick, Tierney)
April 12, 2023 Filing 122 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 on behalf of Cummins Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
April 12, 2023 Filing 121 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cummins Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
April 12, 2023 Filing 120 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. court apologies (Urso, Lisa)
April 11, 2023 Filing 119 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Bradley, Audrey)
April 11, 2023 Filing 118 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Bradley, Audrey)
April 11, 2023 Filing 117 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 on behalf of Caterpillar Inc. (Hoover, Mark)
April 11, 2023 Filing 116 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caterpillar Inc.. (Hoover, Mark)
April 7, 2023 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford V. Pascarella on behalf of CRA Trailers, Inc.(f/k/a GREAT DANE TRAILERS, INC. ) (Pascarella, Clifford)
April 6, 2023 Filing 114 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
April 6, 2023 Filing 113 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IMO Industries Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
April 6, 2023 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. McVinney on behalf of Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust(as successor to FELT PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING CO. and/or the former VELLUMOID DIVISION OF FEDERAL-MOGUL CORPORATION) (McVinney, Michael)
April 6, 2023 Filing 111 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust(as successor to FELT PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING CO. and/or the former VELLUMOID DIVISION OF FEDERAL-MOGUL CORPORATION). (Schwindt, Jordan)
April 6, 2023 Filing 110 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , affirmative defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust(as successor to FELT PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING CO. and/or the former VELLUMOID DIVISION OF FEDERAL-MOGUL CORPORATION).(Schwindt, Jordan)
April 6, 2023 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Schwindt on behalf of Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust(as successor to FELT PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING CO. and/or the former VELLUMOID DIVISION OF FEDERAL-MOGUL CORPORATION) (Schwindt, Jordan)
April 5, 2023 Filing 108 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Volvo Group North America, LLC.(Chadwick, Tierney)
April 5, 2023 Filing 107 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Mack Trucks, Inc..(Chadwick, Tierney)
April 5, 2023 Filing 106 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #39 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Asbestos Docket by Defendants' Liaison Counsel. (Warnock, Douglas)
April 5, 2023 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Tierney M. Chadwick on behalf of Mack Trucks, Inc., Volvo Group North America, LLC (Chadwick, Tierney)
April 4, 2023 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey Schoenike on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Schoenike, Audrey)
April 4, 2023 Filing 103 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Ford Motor Company. Acknowledgment filed by Ford Motor Company. (Keough, Timothy)
April 4, 2023 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Keough on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Keough, Timothy)
April 3, 2023 Filing 101 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ITT LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco Inc. for ITT LLC.. (George, Wayne)
April 3, 2023 Filing 100 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Elliott Company identifying Corporate Parent Ebara Corporation, a Japanese Public Corporation, Corporate Parent Elliott Group Holdings, Inc for Elliott Company.. (George, Wayne)
April 3, 2023 Filing 99 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carrier Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Carrier Global Corporation for Carrier Corporation.. (George, Wayne)
April 3, 2023 Filing 98 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by ITT LLC.(George, Wayne)
April 3, 2023 Filing 97 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Elliott Company.(George, Wayne)
April 3, 2023 Filing 96 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Carrier Corporation.(George, Wayne)
April 3, 2023 Filing 95 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
April 3, 2023 Filing 94 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Warren Pumps LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 31, 2023 Filing 93 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Genuine Parts Company. (Vellucci, Margreta)
March 31, 2023 Filing 92 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 on behalf of Morse TEC LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 31, 2023 Filing 91 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Morse TEC LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 31, 2023 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn B. Coffin, Jr on behalf of Meritor, Inc.(f/k/a ARVINMERITOR, INC., successor-in-interest to ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION ) (Coffin, Glenn)
March 31, 2023 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Kelly on behalf of Meritor, Inc.(f/k/a ARVINMERITOR, INC., successor-in-interest to ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION ) (Kelly, Nancy)
March 31, 2023 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford V. Pascarella on behalf of Meritor, Inc.(f/k/a ARVINMERITOR, INC., successor-in-interest to ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION ) (Pascarella, Clifford)
March 31, 2023 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Robinson on behalf of Meritor, Inc.(f/k/a ARVINMERITOR, INC., successor-in-interest to ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION ) (Robinson, John)
March 31, 2023 Filing 86 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Meritor, Inc.(f/k/a ARVINMERITOR, INC., successor-in-interest to ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION ). (Robinson, John)
March 31, 2023 Filing 85 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Meritor, Inc.(f/k/a ARVINMERITOR, INC., successor-in-interest to ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION ).(Robinson, John)
March 30, 2023 Filing 84 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Redco Corporation.(Goldman, David)
March 30, 2023 Filing 83 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Redco Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Redco Corporation f/k/a Crane Co. for Redco Corporation.. (Goldman, David)
March 30, 2023 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn B. Coffin, Jr on behalf of CRA Trailers, Inc.(f/k/a GREAT DANE TRAILERS, INC. ) (Coffin, Glenn)
March 30, 2023 Filing 81 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paramount Global. (Moccia, Anthony)
March 30, 2023 Filing 80 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CRA Trailers, Inc.(f/k/a GREAT DANE TRAILERS, INC. ). (Robinson, John)
March 30, 2023 Filing 79 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CRA Trailers, Inc.(f/k/a GREAT DANE TRAILERS, INC. ).(Robinson, John)
March 30, 2023 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Robinson on behalf of CRA Trailers, Inc.(f/k/a GREAT DANE TRAILERS, INC. ) (Robinson, John)
March 30, 2023 Filing 77 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 30, 2023 Filing 76 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IMO Industries Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 29, 2023 Filing 75 Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Redco Corporation.(Goldman, David)
March 29, 2023 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Goldman on behalf of Redco Corporation (Goldman, David)
March 29, 2023 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R. Nelson on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Nelson, Monica)
March 29, 2023 Filing 72 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Paramount Global.(Moccia, Anthony)
March 29, 2023 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M. Moccia on behalf of Paramount Global (Moccia, Anthony)
March 28, 2023 Filing 70 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paccar Inc.. (Schwindt, Jordan)
March 28, 2023 Filing 69 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Paccar Inc..(Schwindt, Jordan)
March 28, 2023 Filing 68 ANSWER to Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Paccar Inc..(Schwindt, Jordan)
March 28, 2023 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Schwindt on behalf of Paccar, Inc. (Schwindt, Jordan)
March 28, 2023 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan F. Tabasky on behalf of Paccar, Inc. (Tabasky, Jonathan)
March 28, 2023 Filing 65 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Genuine Parts Company. (Vellucci, Margreta)
March 28, 2023 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Margreta Vellucci on behalf of Genuine Parts Company (Vellucci, Margreta)
March 28, 2023 Filing 63 Genuine Parts Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Genuine Parts Company.(Vellucci, Margreta)
March 28, 2023 Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fleetpride, Inc.. (Adams, Kip)
March 28, 2023 Filing 61 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Fleetpride, Inc..(Adams, Kip)
March 28, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip J. Adams on behalf of Fleetpride, Inc. (Adams, Kip)
March 28, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip J. Adams on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Adams, Kip)
March 28, 2023 Filing 58 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Brown, Timothy)
March 28, 2023 Filing 57 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation.. (Brown, Timothy)
March 28, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Brown on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Brown, Timothy)
March 28, 2023 Filing 55 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Union Carbide Corporation.(Brown, Timothy)
March 28, 2023 Filing 54 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Bradley, Audrey)
March 28, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey Lewchik Bradley on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Bradley, Audrey)
March 26, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne E. George on behalf of Carrier Corporation, Elliott Company, ITT LLC (George, Wayne)
March 26, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Yasmin Tayyab on behalf of Carrier Corporation, Elliott Company, ITT LLC (Tayyab, J.)
March 23, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Stesha A. Emmanuel on behalf of Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, inc.(f/k/a MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC.) (Emmanuel, Stesha)
March 23, 2023 Filing 48 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc.. (Mohan, Catherine)
March 23, 2023 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, inc.(f/k/a MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC.) identifying Corporate Parent Carlisle Companies, Incorporated, a publicly traded company, Corporate Parent Carlisle, LLC for Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, inc... (Mohan, Catherine)
March 23, 2023 Filing 46 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, inc.(f/k/a MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC.).(Mohan, Catherine)
March 23, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Mohan on behalf of Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, inc.(f/k/a MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES, INC.) (Mohan, Catherine)
March 22, 2023 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alfa Laval Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval Inc. AB for Alfa Laval Inc... (Schwindt, Jordan)
March 22, 2023 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Alfa Laval Inc..(Schwindt, Jordan)
March 22, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. McCarthy on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc. (McCarthy, Daniel)
March 22, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Schwindt on behalf of Alfa Laval Inc. (Schwindt, Jordan)
March 22, 2023 Filing 40 Acknowledgment of Service Response by Navistar, Inc.(C, f/k/a BORG WARNER MORSE TEC LLC, successor-by-merger to BORG-WARNER CORPORATION ) . (Sbarra, Anthony)
March 21, 2023 Filing 50 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Status Conference held on 3/21/2023.The court hears counsel on the 961 agenda regarding the status of the cases. The Michael Laporte matter tremendous progress made, one defendant remaining in the case. All other defendants have been resolved. Have been in mediation with remaining defendant and continuing to have discussions before they enter the expert witness discovery phase. King Case Newly removed, motion to have it assigned to the asbestos docket has been filed. Will need to have it formerly assigned to a trial group. Counsel should file the motion to assign to a trial group. Studebaker case has been to mediation and has fully resolved and awaiting dismissal paperwork.McIsaac case Resolved with all defendants except 2. Have been discussing resolution and making progress with GE. Aaron liquid systems is still in ADR phase, has filed S/J and have opposed as premature.Lee case- down to 3 defendants and have discussed settlement and expects the case to be resolved.Turner case - has been to mediation and has fully resolved and awaiting dismissal paperwork for last remaining defendant and will seek dismissal in full. Callahan case - Callahan has completed discovery deposition and videotaped trial preservation deposition testimony. Product ID discovery phase has been completed. Mr. Callahan has passed away. Counsel are seeking a probate appointment to continue with the suit. Chamberlain cases There are 5 remaining defendants, the parties are engaged in settlement discussions. Gillis case - Joint motion to establish Trial group T motion allowed in open court. Counsel request oral argument on the motion to amend, the court sets the oral argument for 3/28 at 2:30pm. Via zoom. Duffy Cases -Right plaintiffs new case filed 3/3. Motion to establish a trial group U filed. The motion is allowed in open court. Will be filing a joint motion to transfer to asbestos docket and trial group u. The court sets the next status conference for 5/23/23 at 2:30PM via Zoom. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/Audio.html . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact the Clerk's office by email at mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11532-RWZ et al.(Simeone, Maria)
March 21, 2023 Filing 39 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Asbestos Docket by Defendants' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order, #2 Pre-Trial Preparation Schedule for Cases in Group U)(Armato, Stephen)
March 21, 2023 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Navistar, Inc.(C, f/k/a BORG WARNER MORSE TEC LLC, successor-by-merger to BORG-WARNER CORPORATION ) identifying Corporate Parent Navistar for Navistar, Inc... (Sbarra, Anthony)
March 20, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Perritano, Judith)
March 20, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of IMO Industries Inc. (Perritano, Judith)
March 20, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Cummins Inc. (Perritano, Judith)
March 20, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Caterpillar Inc. (Perritano, Judith)
March 20, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Morse TEC LLC (Perritano, Judith)
March 20, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Riordan, Meghan)
March 20, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of IMO Industries Inc. (Riordan, Meghan)
March 20, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Cummins Inc. (Riordan, Meghan)
March 20, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Caterpillar Inc. (Riordan, Meghan)
March 20, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Morse TEC LLC (Riordan, Meghan)
March 20, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Morse TEC LLC (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 20, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 20, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of IMO Industries Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 20, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Cummins Inc. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 20, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Hoover on behalf of Caterpillar Inc. (Hoover, Mark)
March 20, 2023 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cameron International Corporation. (Schwindt, Jordan)
March 20, 2023 Filing 21 Answer, Affirmatives Defenses, ANSWER to Crossclaim to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Cameron International Corporation.(Schwindt, Jordan)
March 20, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. McCarthy on behalf of Cameron International Corporation (McCarthy, Daniel)
March 20, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Schwindt on behalf of Cameron International Corporation (Schwindt, Jordan)
March 20, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joni K. Mackler on behalf of Flowserve US Inc. (Mackler, Joni)
March 20, 2023 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flowserve US Inc.. (Claflin, Mark)
March 20, 2023 Filing 16 Flowserve US, Inc., solely as successor to Edward Valves, Inc.'s acknowledgement of service ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Flowserve US Inc..(Claflin, Mark)
March 20, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Claflin on behalf of Flowserve US Inc. (Claflin, Mark)
March 17, 2023 Filing 14 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Dwyer, Paul)
March 17, 2023 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FMC Corporation(individually and as successor-in-interest to NORTHERN PUMPS ). (Dwyer, Paul)
March 17, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FMC Corporation.(Dwyer, Paul)
March 17, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of FMC Corporation (Dwyer, Paul)
March 13, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Defendants' Liaison Counsel (Armato, Stephen)
March 13, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Defendants' Liaison Counsel (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
March 10, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stesha A. Emmanuel on behalf of General Electric Company (Emmanuel, Stesha)
March 10, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
March 10, 2023 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
March 10, 2023 Filing 5 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Mohan, Catherine)
March 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
March 3, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Phillips, Sophie)
March 3, 2023 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
March 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9743366 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Bruce S Wright, Louise K Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Duffy, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright et al v. Cummins Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce S Wright
Represented By: Christopher P. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise K Wright
Represented By: Christopher P. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Cummins Inc.
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Alfa Laval Inc.
Represented By: Daniel P. McCarthy
Represented By: Jordan L. Schwindt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Brad W. Graham
Represented By: John R. Felice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, inc.
Represented By: Catherine Mohan
Represented By: Stesha A. Emmanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: DCo LLC
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Stephen T. Armato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Genuine Parts Company d/b/a NAPA
Represented By: Margreta Vellucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Stephen T. Armato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Stephen T. Armato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Standard Motor Products, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Strick Trailers, LLC.
Represented By: Adam C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: ZF Active Safety US Inc
Represented By: Stephen T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Paccar Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Jordan L. Schwindt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron International Corporation f/k/a Cooper Cameron Corporation, individually and as successor-in-interest to The Cooper-Bessemer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: J. Yasmin Tayyab
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: J. Yasmin Tayyab
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc. individually and as successor-in-interest to Edward Valves, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation individually and as successor-in-interest to Northern Pumps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenkins Bros.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global, f/k/a ViacomCBS Inc., f/k/a Viacom Inc., f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation f/k/a Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corp., a/k/a Lidgerwood Manufacturing Co., individually and as successor to M.T. Davidson Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valves and Controls US, Inc. f/k/a Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc., f/k/a Motion Control Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRA Trailers, Inc. f/k/a Great Dane Trailers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Truck North America LLC f/k/a Daimler Trucks North America LLC f/k/a Freightliner LLC f/k/a Freightliner Corporation, individually and as successor to Western Star Trucks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCo LLC f/k/a Dana Companies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, as successor to Felt Products Manufacturing Co. and/or the former Vellumoid Division of Federal-Mogul Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleetpride, Inc.
Represented By: Kip J. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Keough
Represented By: Audrey Schoenike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company, d/b/a NAPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollingsworth & Vose Company
Represented By: Mariel T. Smith
Represented By: Sarah P. Kelly
Represented By: Stephen J. Brake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., as successor-in-interest to The Bendix Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lipe Automation Corp. f/k/a Lipe-Rollway Corporation, a dissolved New York corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Trucks, Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to Brockway Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritor, Inc., f/k/a ArvinMeritor, Inc., successor-in-interest to Rockwell International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse TEC LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc., successor to International Truck and Engine Company f/k/a International Harvester Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar Inc., d/b/a Kenworth Truck Company and Peterbilt Truck Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation, successor to EIS Automotive Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC, successor-in-interest to Abex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Motor Products, Inc., successor-in-interest to EIS Automotive Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strick Trailers, LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest to Strick Corporation f/k/a Strick Trailer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Timothy Brown
Represented By: Kip J. Adams
Represented By: Monica R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Star Truck Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF Active Safety US Inc., f/k/a Kelsey-Hayes Company, individually and as successor-in-interest to Fruehauf Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valves and Controls US, Inc.
Represented By: John F. Rooney
Represented By: Shannon M. O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRA Trailers, Inc.
Represented By: John J. Robinson
Represented By: Glenn B. Coffin, Jr.
Represented By: Clifford V. Pascarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Truck North America LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. Sbarra, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal-Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust
Represented By: Jordan L. Schwindt
Represented By: Michael F. McVinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Stephen T. Armato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritor, Inc.
Represented By: Clifford V. Pascarella
Represented By: Nancy Kelly
Represented By: Glenn B. Coffin, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse TEC LLC
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar, Inc. d/b/a KENWORTH TRUCK COMPANY and PETERBILT TRUCK COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Stesha A. Emmanuel
Represented By: Catherine Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: ITT LLC
Represented By: J. Yasmin Tayyab
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Audrey Lewchik Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Mark J. Hoover
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Detroit Diesel Corporation
Represented By: Anthony J. Sbarra, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Eric J. Robbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: McCord Corporation
Represented By: Nancy Kelly
Represented By: Clifford V. Pascarella
Represented By: Glenn B. Coffin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Scan-Pac Mfg., Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Stephen T. Armato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: The Timken Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Volvo Group North America, LLC
Represented By: Tierney M. Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Cameron International Corporation
Represented By: Jordan L. Schwindt
Represented By: Daniel P. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Represented By: Mark J. Claflin
Represented By: Joni K. Mackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Paul E. Dwyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Paramount Global
Represented By: Anthony M. Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation
Represented By: John F. Rooney
Represented By: Shannon M. O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Lipe Automation Corporation
Represented By: John F. Rooney
Represented By: Shannon M. O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Mack Trucks, Inc.
Represented By: Tierney M. Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Represented By: Holly M. Polglase
Represented By: Brian M. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?