Garavanian et al v. JetBlue Airways Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel Garavanian, Katherine R. Arcell, Jose M. Brito, Jan-Marie Brown, Rosemary D'Augusta, Brenda K. Davis, Pamela Faust, Carolyn Fjord, Don Freeland, Donna Fry, Harry Garavanian, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Valerie Jolly, Michael C. Malaney, Len Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Timothy Niebor, Deborah M. Pulfer, Bill Rubinsohn, Sondra K. Russell, June Stansbury, Clyde D. Stensrud, Gary Talewsky, Pamela S. Ward and Christine Whalen
Defendant: Jet Blue Airways Corporation and Spirit Airlines Inc
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2023cv10678
Filed: March 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Referring Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 25 Clayton Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2023 Filing 97 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Order Governing Production of Investigation Materials by Jet Blue Airways Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Stipulated Joint Protective Order and Order Governing Production of Investigation Materials)(Wright, Elizabeth)
May 23, 2023 Filing 96 Judge William G. Young ORDER entered: SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER(Paine, Matthew)
May 18, 2023 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Hafer on behalf of Jet Blue Airways Corporation (Hafer, Zachary)
May 16, 2023 Filing 94 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #78 MOTION Stay of CMO Entry and Status Conference (Paine, Matthew)
May 9, 2023 Filing 93 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #91 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christopher Nedeau. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Paine, Matthew)
May 8, 2023 Filing 92 DECLARATION by Katherine R. Arcell, Jose M. Brito, Jan-Marie Brown, Rosemary D'Augusta, Brenda K. Davis, Pamela Faust, Carolyn Fjord, Don Freeland, Donna Fry, Gabriel Garavanian, Harry Garavanian, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Valerie Jolly, Michael C. Malaney, Len Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Timothy Niebor, Deborah M. Pulfer, Bill Rubinsohn, Sondra K. Russell, June Stansbury, Clyde D. Stensrud, Gary Talewsky, Pamela S. Ward, Christine Whalen. (Alioto, Joseph)
May 8, 2023 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher Nedeau Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9844957 by Katherine R. Arcell, Jose M. Brito, Jan-Marie Brown, Rosemary D'Augusta, Brenda K. Davis, Pamela Faust, Carolyn Fjord, Don Freeland, Donna Fry, Gabriel Garavanian, Harry Garavanian, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Valerie Jolly, Michael C. Malaney, Len Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Timothy Niebor, Deborah M. Pulfer, Bill Rubinsohn, Sondra K. Russell, June Stansbury, Clyde D. Stensrud, Gary Talewsky, Pamela S. Ward, Christine Whalen.(Alioto, Joseph)
May 5, 2023 Filing 90 Response by Jet Blue Airways Corporation, Spirit Airlines Inc to #85 Status Report and Proposed Orders submitted by Non-Party United States of America and Private Plaintiffs. (Wright, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2023 Filing 89 Recommendations for Scheduling Order and Case Management Order With Limited Plaintiffs' Amendments. (Larson, Stephen)
May 4, 2023 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Gregory Herrman on behalf of Katherine R. Arcell, Jose M. Brito, Jan-Marie Brown, Rosemary D'Augusta, Brenda K. Davis, Pamela Faust, Carolyn Fjord, Don Freeland, Donna Fry, Gabriel Garavanian, Harry Garavanian, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Valerie Jolly, Michael C. Malaney, Len Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Timothy Niebor, Deborah M. Pulfer, Bill Rubinsohn, Sondra K. Russell, June Stansbury, Clyde D. Stensrud, Gary Talewsky, Pamela S. Ward, Christine Whalen (Herrman, Scott)
May 4, 2023 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Ruyak on behalf of Katherine R. Arcell, Jose M. Brito, Jan-Marie Brown, Rosemary D'Augusta, Brenda K. Davis, Pamela Faust, Carolyn Fjord, Don Freeland, Donna Fry, Gabriel Garavanian, Harry Garavanian, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Valerie Jolly, Michael C. Malaney, Len Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Timothy Niebor, Deborah M. Pulfer, Bill Rubinsohn, Sondra K. Russell, June Stansbury, Clyde D. Stensrud, Gary Talewsky, Pamela S. Ward, Christine Whalen (Ruyak, Robert)
May 4, 2023 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen G. Larson on behalf of Katherine R. Arcell, Jose M. Brito, Jan-Marie Brown, Rosemary D'Augusta, Brenda K. Davis, Pamela Faust, Carolyn Fjord, Don Freeland, Donna Fry, Gabriel Garavanian, Harry Garavanian, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Valerie Jolly, Michael C. Malaney, Len Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Timothy Niebor, Deborah M. Pulfer, Bill Rubinsohn, Sondra K. Russell, June Stansbury, Clyde D. Stensrud, Gary Talewsky, Pamela S. Ward, Christine Whalen (Larson, Stephen)
May 3, 2023 Filing 85 STATUS REPORT Regarding Case Coordination by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duffy, Edward)
May 3, 2023 Filing 84 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #83 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Stephen Larson, Robert Ruyak, and Gregory Herrman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Paine, Matthew)
May 2, 2023 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Stephen Larson, Robert Ruyak, and Gregory Herrman Filing fee: $ 375, receipt number AMADC-9835193 by Gabriel Garavanian. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Stephen Larson, #2 Exhibit CV of Stephen Larson, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Ruyak, #4 Exhibit CV of Robert Ruyak, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Gregory Herrman, #6 Exhibit CV of Gregory Herrman)(Bonsignore, Robert)
April 27, 2023 Filing 82 RESPONSE to Motion re #78 MOTION Stay of CMO Entry and Status Conference filed by Gabriel Garavanian. (Bonsignore, Robert)
April 26, 2023 Filing 81 Opposition re #78 MOTION Stay of CMO Entry and Status Conference filed by Jet Blue Airways Corporation, Spirit Airlines Inc. (Wright, Elizabeth)
April 25, 2023 Filing 80 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/transcripts.htm (McDonagh, Christina)
April 25, 2023 Filing 79 Transcript of Initial Status Conference held on April 13, 2023, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. Redaction Request due 5/16/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2023. (McDonagh, Christina)
April 25, 2023 Filing 78 MOTION Stay of CMO Entry and Status Conference by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duffy, Edward)
April 25, 2023 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward William Duffy on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Duffy, Edward)
April 24, 2023 Filing 76 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (Joint Proposed Scheduling and Case Management Order) by Jet Blue Airways Corporation.(Wright, Elizabeth)
April 13, 2023 Filing 75 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Status Conference held on 4/13/2023 by video. Counsel are instructed to submit a joint proposed case management schedule within 10 days. If counsel request a further conference a request should be made and the Court will consider it. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Attorneys Alioto, Jr., Alioto and Alioto Sr., Attorneys Glass and Wright for defendant JetBlue; Attorneys Cohen, Dearborn and Rudman for defendant Spirit) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
April 13, 2023 Filing 74 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #68 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Lingel Winters. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Paine, Matthew)
April 13, 2023 Filing 73 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #67 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Lawrence Papale. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Paine, Matthew)
April 13, 2023 Filing 72 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #66 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Josephine Alioto. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Paine, Matthew)
April 13, 2023 Filing 71 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #65 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joseph Alioto, Jr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Paine, Matthew)
April 13, 2023 Filing 70 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #64 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joseph Alioto, Sr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Paine, Matthew)
April 13, 2023 Filing 69 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entries #64 through #68 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Corrected Because: Counsel Bonsignore Filed the Motions, Exhibits, and Proposed Orders for the Motions Pro Hac Vice As One Long Continuous PDF Document in Violation of Court Rules and CM/ECF NextGen Administrative Procedures. (Paine, Matthew)
April 12, 2023 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lingel Winters Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9806138 by Gabriel Garavanian.(Bonsignore, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2023: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 68 replaced on 4/13/2023) (Paine, Matthew).
April 12, 2023 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lawrence Papale Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9806137 by Gabriel Garavanian.(Bonsignore, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2023: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 67 replaced on 4/13/2023) (Paine, Matthew).
April 12, 2023 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Josephine Alioto Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9806135 by Gabriel Garavanian.(Bonsignore, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2023: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 66 replaced on 4/13/2023) (Paine, Matthew).
April 12, 2023 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph Alioto, Jr. Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9806133 by Gabriel Garavanian.(Bonsignore, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2023: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 65 replaced on 4/13/2023) (Paine, Matthew).
April 12, 2023 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph Alioto, Sr. Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number BMADC-9806116 by Gabriel Garavanian.(Bonsignore, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2023: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 64 replaced on 4/13/2023) (Paine, Matthew).
April 11, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Beatriz Mejia on behalf of Jet Blue Airways Corporation (Mejia, Beatriz)
April 11, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Glass on behalf of Jet Blue Airways Corporation (Glass, Ethan)
April 11, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate Wald on behalf of Spirit Airlines Inc (Wald, Kate)
April 11, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Dearborn on behalf of Spirit Airlines Inc (Dearborn, Meredith)
April 11, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Eyitayo St. Matthew-Daniel on behalf of Spirit Airlines Inc (St. Matthew-Daniel, Eyitayo)
April 11, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Finch on behalf of Spirit Airlines Inc (Finch, Andrew)
April 11, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Cohen on behalf of Spirit Airlines Inc (Cohen, Jay)
April 10, 2023 Filing 56 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ethan Glass and Beatriz Mejia. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Paine, Matthew)
April 10, 2023 Filing 55 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #48 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kate Wald. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Paine, Matthew)
April 10, 2023 Filing 54 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Eyitayo St. Matthew-Daniel. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Paine, Matthew)
April 10, 2023 Filing 53 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Meredith R. Dearborn. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Paine, Matthew)
April 10, 2023 Filing 52 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jay Cohen. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Paine, Matthew)
April 10, 2023 Filing 51 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Andrew C. Finch. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Paine, Matthew)
April 10, 2023 Filing 50 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 4/13/2023 at 12:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
April 10, 2023 Filing 49 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ethan Glass and Beatriz Mejia Filing fee: $ 250, receipt number AMADC-9799462 by Jet Blue Airways Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certification of Ethan Glass, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certification of Beatriz Mejia)(Wright, Elizabeth)
April 10, 2023 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kate Wald Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9799440 by Spirit Airlines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certification of Kate Wald For Admission Pro Hac Vice))(Rudman, Samuel)
April 10, 2023 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Eyitayo St. Matthew-Daniel Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9799412 by Spirit Airlines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certification of Eyitayo St. Matthew-Daniel For Admission Pro Hac Vice))(Rudman, Samuel)
April 10, 2023 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Meredith R. Dearborn Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9799402 by Spirit Airlines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certification of Meredith R. Dearborn For Admission Pro Hac Vice))(Rudman, Samuel)
April 10, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jay Cohen Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9799381 by Spirit Airlines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certification of Jay Cohen For Admission Pro Hac Vice))(Rudman, Samuel)
April 10, 2023 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrew C. Finch Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9799313 by Spirit Airlines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certification of Andrew C. Finch For Admission Pro Hac Vice))(Rudman, Samuel)
April 7, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Newland Rudman on behalf of Spirit Airlines Inc (Rudman, Samuel)
April 5, 2023 Filing 42 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge William G. Young added. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
April 5, 2023 Filing 41 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge William G. Young. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
April 5, 2023 Filing 40 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #39 Motion to Relate Case with Previously Filed Action 1:23-cv-10511-WGY. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) Modified docket text on 4/5/2023 (de Oliveira, Flaviana).
March 30, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION to Relate Case with Previously Filed Action by Jet Blue Airways Corporation.(Wright, Elizabeth)
March 30, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth M. Wright on behalf of Jet Blue Airways Corporation (Wright, Elizabeth)
March 29, 2023 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
March 29, 2023 Filing 36 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:22-cv-06841.
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404 by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #33 Stipulation to Transfer. ***Civil Case Terminated. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/17/2023. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)
March 16, 2023 Filing 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 filed by Jet Blue Airways Corporation, Spirit Airlines, Inc. and all plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - Redline Proposed Protective Order)(Glass, Ethan) (Filed on 3/16/2023) Modified on 3/17/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REGARDING 2/27/2023 DISCOVERY LETTERS re: #30 #31 , Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2023)
February 27, 2023 Filing 31 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER (PLAINTIFFS DOCUMENT REQUEST) filed by Katherine R. Arcell, Jose M. Brito, Jan-Marie Brown, Rosemary D'Augusta, Brenda K. Davis, Pamela Faust, Carolyn Fjord, Don Freeland, Donna Fry, Gabriel Garavanian, Harry Garavanian, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Valerie Jolly, Michael C. Malaney, Len Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Timothy Niebor, Deborah M. Pulfer, Bill Rubinsohn, Sondra K. Russell, June Stansbury, Clyde D. Stensrud, Gary Talewsky, Pamela S. Ward, Christine Whalen, Jet Blue Airways Corporation, Spirit Airlines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiffs' Request for Production, #2 Exhibit B: JetBlue Objections to RFP, #3 Exhibit C: Spirit Objections to RFP)(Alioto, Joseph) (Filed on 2/27/2023) Modified on 2/28/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2023 Filing 30 JOINT DISCOVERY DISPUTE LETTER (DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ENTER PROTECTIVE ORDER) filed by Spirit Airlines, Inc., Gabriel Garavanian, Jet Blue Airways Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meredith R. Dearborn, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of Andrew C. Finch, #4 Declaration of Ethan Glass, #5 Exhibit B)(Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 2/27/2023) Modified on 2/28/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Discovery (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2023)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REFERRING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/6/2023. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2023 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 3, 2023 Filing 28 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Katherine R. Arcell, Jose M. Brito, Jan-Marie Brown, Rosemary D'Augusta, Brenda K. Davis, Pamela Faust, Carolyn Fjord, Don Freeland, Gabriel Garavanian, Harry Garavanian, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Valerie Jolly, Michael C. Malaney, Len Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Timothy Niebor, Deborah M. Pulfer, Bill Rubinsohn, Sondra K. Russell, June Stansbury, Clyde D. Stensrud, Gary Talewsky, Pamela S. Ward, Christine Whalen, Donna Fry, Jet Blue Airways Corporation, Spirit Airlines, Inc. (Alioto, Joseph) (Filed on 2/3/2023) Modified on 2/6/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2023 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiffs (Papale, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/28/2023)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #25 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2023 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2023) Modified on 1/20/2023 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2023 #Electronic filing error. In the future please be sure to add all parties you represent when filing documents. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary.< /b< Re: #25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Gabriel Garavanian (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 19, 2023 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Gabriel Garavanian, Katherine R. Arcell, Jose M. Brito, Jan-Marie Brown, Rosemary D'Augusta, Brenda K. Davis, Pamela Faust, Carolyn Fjord, Don Freeland, Donna Fry, Harry Garavanian, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Valarie Ann Jolly, Michael C. Malaney, Len Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Timothy Niebor, Deborah M. Pulfer, Bill Rubinsohn, Sondra K. Russell, June Stansbury, Clyde D. Stensrud, Gary Talewsky, Pamela S. Ward, Christine Whalen, Jetblue Airways Corporation and Spirit Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph M. Alioto Jr.)(Alioto, Joseph) (Filed on 1/19/2023) Modified on 1/20/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2023 Filing 24 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Spirit Airlines, Inc. (Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 1/13/2023)
January 13, 2023 Filing 23 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by JetBlue Airways Corporation (Glass, Ethan) (Filed on 1/13/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint bySpirit Airlines, Inc.. (Finch, Andrew) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 9, 2023 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint byJet Blue Airways Corporation. (Glass, Ethan) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 5, 2023 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Gabriel Garavanian (Papale, Lawrence) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2022)
December 5, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Bonsignore (Bonsignore, Robert) (Filed on 12/5/2022)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/2/2022. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2023 at 11:00 AM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsw Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of all names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent to the CRD at jswcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 2/2/2023 at 12:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Jet Blue Airways Corporation, Spirit Airlines, Inc. and Gabriel Garavanian, et al.. (Glass, Ethan) (Filed on 11/22/2022) Modified on 11/22/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2022 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jet Blue Airways Corporation (Glass, Ethan) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Spirit Airlines Inc. (Finch, Andrew) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Eyitayo St. Matthew-Daniel ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17751564.) filed by Spirit Airlines Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(St. Matthew-Daniel, Eyitayo) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Richardson Dearborn for Defendant Spirit Airlines, Inc. (Dearborn, Meredith) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 22, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Finch for Defendant Spirit Airlines, Inc. (Finch, Andrew) (Filed on 11/22/2022)
November 21, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Beatriz Mejia for Defendant JetBlue Airways Corporation (Mejia, Beatriz) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Glass for Defendant JetBlue Airways Corporation (Glass, Ethan) (Filed on 11/21/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriel Garavanian. Spirit Airlines Inc. served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Alioto, Joseph) (Filed on 11/10/2022)
November 10, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriel Garavanian. Jet Blue Airways Corporation served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Alioto, Joseph) (Filed on 11/10/2022)
November 4, 2022 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2023 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2022)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jet Blue Airways Corporation, Spirit Airlines Inc.. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2022)
November 3, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2022)
November 3, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Alioto, Joseph) (Filed on 11/3/2022)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gabriel Garavanian.. (Alioto, Joseph) (Filed on 11/3/2022)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BCANDC-17695694.). Filed by Gabriel Garavanian, Katherine R. Arcell, Jose M. Brito, Jan-Marie Brown, Rosemary D'Augusta, Brenda K. Davis, Pamela Faust, Carolyn Fjord, Don Freeland, Donna Fry, Harry Garavanian, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Valarie Ann Jolly, Michael C. Malaney, Len Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Timothy Niebor, Deborah M. Pulfer, Bill Rubinsohn, Sondra K. Russell, June Stansbury, Clyde D. Stensrud, Gary Talewsky, Pamela S. Ward, Christine Whalen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alioto, Joseph) (Filed on 11/3/2022) Modified on 11/4/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2022 #Electronic filing error. In the future please be sure to add all parties you represent when filing documents. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re : #1 Complaint filed by Gabriel Garavanian (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garavanian et al v. JetBlue Airways Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Garavanian
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine R. Arcell
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Brito
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan-Marie Brown
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary D'Augusta
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda K. Davis
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Faust
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Fjord
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Freeland
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Fry
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Garavanian
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Jolly
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C. Malaney
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Len Marazzo
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa McCarthy
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Niebor
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah M. Pulfer
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Rubinsohn
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sondra K. Russell
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Stansbury
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde D. Stensrud
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Talewsky
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela S. Ward
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Whalen
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Perkins
Represented By: Joseph M Alioto, Sr
Represented By: Joseph Michelangelo Alioto, Jr
Represented By: Josephine Leticia Alioto
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Robert J. Bonsignore
Represented By: Tatiana V Wallace
Represented By: Theresa Driscoll Moore
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Lingel Hart Winters
Represented By: Robert F. Ruyak
Represented By: Scott Gregory Herrman
Represented By: Stephen G. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jet Blue Airways Corporation
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Represented By: Ethan Glass
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Wright
Represented By: Zachary Hafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirit Airlines Inc
Represented By: Andrew C. Finch
Represented By: Eyitayo St. Matthew-Daniel
Represented By: Meredith Dearborn
Represented By: Jay Cohen
Represented By: Kate Wald
Represented By: Samuel Newland Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Edward William Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?