Dalton et al v. Hao et al
Plaintiff: Brian Dalton, New England Firearms Academy, New England Firearms Academy, Inc., John Trioisi and Big Jack's Auto Repair and Towing
Defendant: Yvonne Hao, Massachusetts Growth Capital Corporation and Lawrence D. Andrews
Intervenor Defendant: Black Economic Council of Massachusetts and Amplify Latinx
Case Number: 1:2023cv11216
Filed: May 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2023 Filing 34 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entry #31 Motion to Intervene Corrected Because: Counsel Davis Incorrectly Attached the Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motion to Intervene in Violation of CM/ECF NextGen Administrative Procedures Section (G)(4). (Paine, Matthew)
July 26, 2023 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support re #31 MOTION to Intervene filed by Amplify Latinx, Black Economic Council of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Obi Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Roman Declaration)(Paine, Matthew)
July 25, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Tasheena M. Davis on behalf of Amplify Latinx, Black Economic Council of Massachusetts (Davis, Tasheena)
July 25, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION to Intervene by Black Economic Council of Massachusetts, Amplify Latinx.(Davis, Tasheena) Modified on 7/26/2023 to Correct Docket Text, Remove, and Refile Memorandum of Law in Support as Separate Docket Entry. (Paine, Matthew).
July 6, 2023 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Dalton, John Trioisi, New England Firearms Academy, Inc., Big Jack's Auto Repair and Towing. Yvonne Hao waiver sent on 6/5/2023, answer due 8/4/2023. (Quinio, Andrew)
July 6, 2023 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Dalton, John Trioisi, New England Firearms Academy, Inc., Big Jack's Auto Repair and Towing. Massachusetts Growth Capital Corporation waiver sent on 6/5/2023, answer due 8/4/2023. (Quinio, Andrew)
July 6, 2023 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Dalton, John Trioisi, New England Firearms Academy, Inc., Big Jack's Auto Repair and Towing. Lawrence D. Andrews waiver sent on 6/5/2023, answer due 8/4/2023. (Quinio, Andrew)
June 20, 2023 Filing 27 Judge William G. Young: ORDER for Closure entered. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
June 20, 2023 Filing 26 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #12 Motion to Certify Class; #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; #15 Motion for TRO. Motions are withdrawn without prejudice per Stipulation #22 to be refiled upon lifting of stay. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
June 20, 2023 Filing 25 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #22 Joint Stipulation and Motion to Stay Proceedings. The case is ordered administratively closed for 60 days and may be reopened upon motion of any party after 60 days. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
June 16, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle L. Sandals on behalf of Lawrence D. Andrews, Massachusetts Growth Capital Corporation (Sandals, Michelle)
June 16, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Felicia H. Ellsworth on behalf of Lawrence D. Andrews, Massachusetts Growth Capital Corporation (Ellsworth, Felicia)
June 16, 2023 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Stay Case by All Parties and Stipulation by Yvonne Hao.(Casey, Timothy)
June 16, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy James Casey on behalf of Yvonne Hao (Casey, Timothy)
June 9, 2023 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #17 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #18 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #19 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #16 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #15 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by Attention Matthew Paine - Docket Clerk - Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
June 8, 2023 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Andrew R. Quinio in Support re #15 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Big Jack's Auto Repair and Towing, Brian Dalton, New England Firearms Academy, Inc., John Trioisi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Program Overview, #2 Exhibit B - Program Application, #3 Exhibit C - Email Quinio to MGCC re timeline)(Quinio, Andrew)
June 8, 2023 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #15 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order of Pltaintiff John Troisi, filed by Big Jack's Auto Repair and Towing, Brian Dalton, New England Firearms Academy, Inc., John Trioisi. (Houghton, Jonathan)
June 8, 2023 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #15 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Brian Dalton, filed by Big Jack's Auto Repair and Towing, Brian Dalton, New England Firearms Academy, Inc., John Trioisi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email thread, Pltf to Kristin Ryan, Mass. St. Police)(Houghton, Jonathan)
June 8, 2023 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Big Jack's Auto Repair and Towing, Brian Dalton, New England Firearms Academy, Inc., John Trioisi. (Houghton, Jonathan)
June 8, 2023 Filing 15 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ( Responses due by 6/22/2023) by Big Jack's Auto Repair and Towing, Brian Dalton, New England Firearms Academy, Inc., John Trioisi.(Houghton, Jonathan)
June 8, 2023 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #12 MOTION to Certify Class : Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2023 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 (In person only) before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
June 7, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Big Jack's Auto Repair and Towing, Brian Dalton, New England Firearms Academy, Inc., John Trioisi. (Houghton, Jonathan)
June 7, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Certify Class by Big Jack's Auto Repair and Towing, Brian Dalton, New England Firearms Academy, Inc., John Trioisi.(Houghton, Jonathan)
June 7, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Quinio on behalf of Big Jack's Auto Repair and Towing, Brian Dalton, New England Firearms Academy, Inc., John Trioisi (Quinio, Andrew)
June 5, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua P. Thompson on behalf of Big Jack's Auto Repair and Towing, Brian Dalton, New England Firearms Academy, Inc., John Trioisi (Thompson, Joshua)
June 4, 2023 Filing 9 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Joshua P. Thompson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Paine, Matthew)
June 4, 2023 Filing 8 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Andrew R. Quinio. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Paine, Matthew)
June 2, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joshua P. Thompson Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9886019 by Big Jack's Auto Repair and Towing, Brian Dalton, New England Firearms Academy, John Trioisi.(Houghton, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2023: #1 Attorney Certification) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/4/2023) (Paine, Matthew).
June 2, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrew R. Quinio Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-9885922 by Big Jack's Auto Repair and Towing, Brian Dalton, New England Firearms Academy, John Trioisi.(Houghton, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2023: #1 Attorney Certification) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 6 replaced on 6/4/2023) (Paine, Matthew).
June 2, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brian Dalton, New England Firearms Academy, John Trioisi, Big Jack's Auto Repair and Towing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Program Overview, #2 Exhibit B - Program Application)(Houghton, Jonathan)
May 31, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lawrence D. Andrews, Yvonne Hao, Massachusetts Growth Capital Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin)
May 31, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brian Dalton, New England Firearms Academy. (Houghton, Jonathan)
May 31, 2023 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Finn, Mary)
May 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Nominal Damages against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9879998 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Brian Dalton, New England Firearms Academy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A - Program Overview, #4 Exhibit B - Program Application)(Houghton, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalton et al v. Hao et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Dalton
Represented By: Jonathan Houghton
Represented By: Joshua P. Thompson
Represented By: Andrew Quinio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New England Firearms Academy
Represented By: Jonathan Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New England Firearms Academy, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua P. Thompson
Represented By: Andrew Quinio
Represented By: Jonathan Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Trioisi
Represented By: Joshua P. Thompson
Represented By: Jonathan Houghton
Represented By: Andrew Quinio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Jack's Auto Repair and Towing
Represented By: Joshua P. Thompson
Represented By: Andrew Quinio
Represented By: Jonathan Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne Hao
Represented By: Timothy James Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Growth Capital Corporation
Represented By: Felicia H. Ellsworth
Represented By: Michelle L. Sandals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence D. Andrews
Represented By: Michelle L. Sandals
Represented By: Felicia H. Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Black Economic Council of Massachusetts
Represented By: Tasheena M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Amplify Latinx
Represented By: Tasheena M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?