Niazi v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States
Plaintiff: Kamran Niazi
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States
Case Number: 1:2023cv11397
Filed: June 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Jennifer C Boal
Referring Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2023 Filing 24 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #23 Motion to Seal Document."Courts have long recognized that public monitoring of the judicial system fosters the important values of quality, honesty and respect for our legal system." United States v. Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., 69 F.4th 1, 15 (1st Cir. 2023), quoting United States v. Kravetz, 706 F.3d 47, 52 (1st Cir. 2013); accord Nixon v. Warner Commc'ns, Inc., 435 U.S. 589, 597 (1978) ("It is clear that the courts of this country recognize a general right to inspect and copy public records and documents, including judicial records and documents."). There is a strong common law presumption favoring public access to judicial records. In re Salem Suede, Inc., 268 F.3d 42 (1st Cir. 2001). Accordingly, a party seeking to seal a judicial record must meet a "compelling reasons" standard. Kamakana v. City & Cnty. of Honolulu, 447 F.3d 1172, 1178 (9th Cir. 2006). That is, "the party must articulate compelling reasons supported by specific factual findings... that outweigh the general history of access and public policies favoring disclosure, such as the public interest in understanding the judicial process." Id. at 1178-1179 (internal quotations omitted). When determining whether this standard is met, it is the court's duty to "conscientiously balance the competing interests of the public and the party who seeks to keep certain judicial records secret." Id. at 1179 (internal quotations omitted); accord Depuy Orthopaedics, 2023 WL 3746534, at *9 (in deciding whether to seal documents, the court must "weigh the presumptively paramount right of the public to know against the competing private interests at stake") (internal quotation marks and citations omitted). "[I]f the court decides to seal certain judicial records, it must base its decision on a compelling reasons and articulate the factual basis for its ruling, without relying on hypothesis or conjecture." Kamakana, 447 F.3d at 1179; see also Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2 (a), (b), (d-h). Here, the parties jointly move to seal certain portions of the First Amended Complaint. They have not, however, identified any specific proposed redactions, let alone articulated compelling reasons to support adopting each of these proposed redactions (generically stating, without further elaboration, that all client names in the document "are protected by the Confidentiality and Non-Disclosure provision" of plaintiff's employment contract does not suffice, see Mot. [Dkt # 23] at para. 3). The court accordingly will deny the motion, without prejudice to renew by August 25, 2023. Should the parties fail to file a renewed motion proposing specific redactions and explaining the need for those specific redactions by this date, the court will unseal the First Amended Complaint in its entirety. (RGS, law3)
August 18, 2023 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #22 Amended Complaint by Kamran Niazi.(Davis, John)
August 16, 2023 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, filed by Kamran Niazi.(Davis, John) Modified on 8/16/2023 to temporarily seal entry at parties' request. (Pacho, Arnold).
August 15, 2023 Filing 21 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 23, 2023 to File Amended Complaint. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 9, 2023 Filing 20 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/23/23 to Amend Complaint by Kamran Niazi.(Davis, John)
July 19, 2023 Filing 19 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting #7 Motion to Dismiss. This dismissal is without prejudice, and the court will allow plaintiff twenty-one days to file a proposed Amended Complaint. (RGS, law3)
July 11, 2023 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States. (Rigby, Katherine)
July 8, 2023 Filing 17 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Leave to File a Reply brief. The Reply must be filed no later than Tuesday July 11, 2023, as the court is currently considering the motion to dismiss. (Zierk, Marsha)
July 7, 2023 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States.(Rigby, Katherine)
July 6, 2023 Filing 15 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (Pacho, Arnold)
July 6, 2023 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
July 5, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE by Kamran Niazi of Refusal (Davis, John)
July 5, 2023 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (York, Steve)
July 5, 2023 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kamran Niazi. (Davis, John)
July 5, 2023 Filing 10 Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kamran Niazi. (Davis, John)
June 29, 2023 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (Rigby, Katherine)
June 29, 2023 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States. (Rigby, Katherine)
June 29, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States.(Rigby, Katherine)
June 22, 2023 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Kelly, Danielle)
June 22, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
June 22, 2023 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKinsey & Company, Inc. (Rigby, Katherine)
June 22, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine G. Rigby on behalf of McKinsey & Company, Inc (Rigby, Katherine)
June 22, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McKinsey & Company, Inc ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9915043 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rigby, Katherine)
June 22, 2023 Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by McKinsey & Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Category Form)(Rigby, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niazi v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamran Niazi
Represented By: John W. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States
Represented By: Katherine G. Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?