Musikar-Rosner v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Plaintiff: Rhonda Musikar-Rosner
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv11746
Filed: July 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Filing 23 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 and #20 , Motiosn for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark A. Neubauer and Steven B. Weisburd. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause.(McManus, Caetlin)
September 28, 2023 Filing 22 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #21 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 20, 2023 to File Answer to #1 Complaint. Answer due 10/20/2023. (McManus, Caetlin)
September 28, 2023 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 20, 2023 to File Answer by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(Seltzer, Mark)
September 28, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Steven B. Weisburd Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10058250 by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Steven B. Weisburd in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing of Steven B. Weisburd (TX), #3 Certificate of Good Standing of Steven B. Weisburd (CA))(Seltzer, Mark)
September 28, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark A. Neubauer Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10058221 by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Mark A. Neubauer in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificates of Good Standing of Mark A. Neubauer)(Seltzer, Mark)
September 28, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna A. Portu on behalf of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Portu, Brianna)
September 28, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Seltzer on behalf of Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Seltzer, Mark)
September 13, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Ann Whitener on behalf of Rhonda Musikar-Rosner (Whitener, Virginia)
September 13, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Mark Breit on behalf of Rhonda Musikar-Rosner (Breit, Mitchell)
September 12, 2023 Filing 14 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mitchell M. Breit. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McManus, Caetlin)
September 11, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mitchell M. Breit Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10031119 by Rhonda Musikar-Rosner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Mitchell M. Breit ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - COGS Appellate Division of the Supreme Court of NY, #3 Exhibit B - COGS - Supreme Court of New Jersey)(Breit, Mitchell)
September 8, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William A Ladnier on behalf of Rhonda Musikar-Rosner (Ladnier, William)
September 8, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam A. Edwards on behalf of Rhonda Musikar-Rosner (Edwards, Adam)
September 7, 2023 Filing 10 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added William A. Ladnier. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McManus, Caetlin)
September 7, 2023 Filing 9 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Virginia A. Whitener. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McManus, Caetlin)
September 7, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William A. Ladnier Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10026621 by Rhonda Musikar-Rosner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of William A Ladnier ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 EXHIBIT A - COGS Supreme Court of TN, #3 EXHIBIT B - COGS Supreme Court of CA)(Straus, Alex)
September 7, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Virginia A. Whitener Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10026490 by Rhonda Musikar-Rosner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Virginia A Whitener ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 EXHIBIT A - COGS Supreme Court of TN, #3 EXHIBIT B - COGS Supreme Court of IL, #4 EXHIBIT C - COGS Supreme Court of NJ)(Straus, Alex)
August 24, 2023 Filing 6 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Adam A. Edwards. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McManus, Caetlin)
August 24, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Adam A. Edwards Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10006287 by Rhonda Musikar-Rosner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Adam A Edwards ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 COGS Supreme Court of TN)(Straus, Alex)
August 4, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rhonda Musikar-Rosner. Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. waiver sent on 8/2/2023, answer due 10/2/2023. (Straus, Alex)
August 1, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Quilter, Madison)
August 1, 2023 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Cook, Savannah)
July 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9971128 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Rhonda Musikar-Rosner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Straus, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Musikar-Rosner v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Musikar-Rosner
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: William A Ladnier
Represented By: Mitchell Mark Breit
Represented By: Virginia Ann Whitener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Mark D. Seltzer
Represented By: Brianna A. Portu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?