McGuire v. Commonwealth of Massachusetts Nathan Aliah McGuire Agency et al
Plaintiff: Nathan McGuire
Defendant: Commonwealth of Massachusetts Nathan Aliah McGuire Agency, United States Department of the Treasury, Massachusetts Department of Revenue, Fidelity Investments Board of Trustees and Known and Unknown Nominal Auxiliary Beneficiaries
Case Number: 1:2023cv11872
Filed: August 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION to Strike #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Nathan McGuire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Currie, Haley)
September 29, 2023 Filing 28 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to 10/16/2023 to File Response to Complaint by Massachusetts Department of Revenue (Hourihan, Lisa)
September 28, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/16/2023 to File Response to Complaint by Massachusetts Department of Revenue.(Duron, Angelica)
September 19, 2023 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Fidelity Investments Board of Trustees. (Bruhn, Nathaniel)
September 19, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss by Fidelity Investments Board of Trustees.(Bruhn, Nathaniel)
September 19, 2023 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Strike #14 Notice (Other) filed by United States Department of the Treasury. (Dietz, Isabelle)
September 19, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Strike #14 Notice (Other) by United States Department of the Treasury.(Dietz, Isabelle)
September 19, 2023 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States Department of the Treasury. (Dietz, Isabelle)
September 19, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States Department of the Treasury.(Dietz, Isabelle)
September 13, 2023 Filing 20 STATE COURT Record United States Department of the Treasury summons served on 7/21/2023, answer due 9/19/2023.. (Attachments: #1 1 State Court Complaint, #2 1.5 Additional Filing, #3 Exhibits A - L, #4 Exhibit M, #5 Exhibit N, #6 2 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #7 3 Affidavit, #8 3.5 Attorney Appearance, #9 4 State Return of Service, #10 5 Fidelity Return of Service, #11 6 US Treasury Return of Service, #12 7 Fidelity Notice of Motion to Dismiss, #13 8 Fidelity Motion to Dismiss, #14 9 Fidelity Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #15 10 Notice of Service of State's Motion for Enlargement, #16 11 Motion to Strike Motion to Dismiss, #17 12 Response to Motion to Dismiss, #18 13 State Motion for Enlargement of Time, #19 14 Affidavit, #20 15 Response to Motion to Dismiss and Affidavit, #21 16 Motion to Strike and Affidavit, #22 17 Fidelity Reply, #23 18 Notice of Filing Papers Removing Action)(Dietz, Isabelle)
September 13, 2023 Filing 19 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Fidelity Investments Board of Trustees answer due 9/19/2023. (Hourihan, Lisa)
September 13, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Nathaniel P. Bruhn on behalf of Fidelity Investments Board of Trustees. (Bruhn, Nathaniel)
September 11, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to September 19, 2023 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Fidelity Investments Board of Trustees.(Bruhn, Nathaniel) Modified on 9/12/2023: corrected event type (Kelly, Danielle).
September 6, 2023 Filing 16 Interrogatories - Fidelity Investments, Fidelity Management and Research FMR LLC Board of Trustees by Nathan McGuire (Currie, Haley)
September 6, 2023 Filing 15 Interrogatories - Massachusetts Department of Revenue by Nathan McGuire (Currie, Haley)
September 6, 2023 Filing 14 Interrogatories - US Department of the Treasury by Nathan McGuire (Currie, Haley)
September 6, 2023 Filing 13 Rule 15(e) Supplemental Pleading as a Matter of Course in Response by Nathan McGuire to #1 Notice of Removal. (Currie, Haley)
September 6, 2023 Filing 12 Rule 201(e) Federal Rules of Evidence NOTICE - Opportunity to be Heard by Nathan McGuire (Attachments: #1 Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Facts)(Currie, Haley)
August 31, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE by Fidelity Investments Board of Trustees of Superior Court Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 6/20/23 Fidelity's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - 6/20/23 Fidelity's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit C - 6/20/23 Fidelity's Notice of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit D - 7/12/23 Fidelity's Affidavit of Compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A, #5 Exhibit E - 7/12/23 Fidelity's Superior Court Rule 9A Notice of Filing, #6 Exhibit F - 8/8/23 Plaintiffs Response to Fidelity Investments Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum, #7 Exhibit G - 8/8/23 Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Motion to Dismiss and Affidavit in Support, #8 Exhibit H - 8/16/23 Fidelity's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike, #9 Exhibit I - 8/16/23 Fidelity's Superior Court Rule 9A Notice of Filing)(Bruhn, Nathaniel)
August 24, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel P. Bruhn on behalf of Fidelity Investments Board of Trustees (Bruhn, Nathaniel)
August 24, 2023 Filing 9 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 State Defendant's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/2/2023 to File Answer - Massachusetts Department of Revenue answer due October 2, 2023. (Currie, Haley)
August 24, 2023 Filing 8 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/19/2023 to File Answer/Respond to Complaint - United States Department of the Treasury answer due September 19, 2023. (Currie, Haley)
August 23, 2023 Filing 7 State Defendant's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/2/2023 to File Answer by Massachusetts Department of Revenue. (Attachments: #1 McGuire Superior Court docket, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Assistant Attorney General Angelica L. Duron)(Duron, Angelica)
August 23, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Angelica L. Duron on behalf of Massachusetts Department of Revenue (Duron, Angelica)
August 22, 2023 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/19/2023 to File Answer /Respond to Complaint filed by United States Department of the Treasury. (Dietz, Isabelle)
August 22, 2023 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/19/2023 to File Answer /Respond to Complaint by United States Department of the Treasury.(Dietz, Isabelle)
August 16, 2023 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Cook, Savannah)
August 16, 2023 Filing 2 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
August 16, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Department of the Treasury ( Fee Status: US Government) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 State Court Complaint and Summons, #4 Attachments to Complaint A-D, #5 Attachments to Complaint E-N)(Dietz, Isabelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGuire v. Commonwealth of Massachusetts Nathan Aliah McGuire Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Massachusetts Nathan Aliah McGuire Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Isabelle Dietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Department of Revenue
Represented By: Angelica L. Duron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Investments Board of Trustees
Represented By: Nathaniel P. Bruhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Known and Unknown Nominal Auxiliary Beneficiaries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?