BitSight Technologies, Inc. v. NormShield Inc.
Plaintiff: BitSight Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: NormShield Inc. doing business as Black Kite Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv12055
Filed: September 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Jennifer C Boal
Referring Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2023 Filing 34 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time with Respect to Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule and to Exceed Page Limits by NormShield Inc. (Deadline to amend the Complaint or oppose motion to dismiss December 11, 2023. Reply due on December 21, 2023.) (Alba, Robert)
October 25, 2023 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time with Respect to Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule and to Exceed Page Limits by NormShield Inc..(Wolkoff, Eric)
September 29, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Andrew Hamstra on behalf of NormShield Inc. (Hamstra, Nathaniel)
September 29, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Elihu on behalf of NormShield Inc. (Elihu, David)
September 27, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J Bramhall on behalf of NormShield Inc. (Bramhall, Andrew)
September 27, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin PB Johnson on behalf of NormShield Inc. (Johnson, Kevin)
September 27, 2023 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Horvath, Courtney) Modified on 9/27/2023 (Horvath, Courtney).
September 27, 2023 Filing 27 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Kline, Douglas)
September 21, 2023 Filing 26 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to November 13, 2023 to File Answer re #1 Complaint; NormShield Inc. answer due 11/13/2023. (Warnock, Douglas)
September 21, 2023 Filing 25 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Nathan Hamstra. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Warnock, Douglas)
September 21, 2023 Filing 24 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Elihu. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Warnock, Douglas)
September 21, 2023 Filing 23 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew Bramhall. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Warnock, Douglas)
September 21, 2023 Filing 22 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin P.B. Johnson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Warnock, Douglas)
September 20, 2023 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NormShield Inc.. (Wolkoff, Eric)
September 20, 2023 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to November 13, 2023 to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by NormShield Inc..(Wolkoff, Eric)
September 20, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nathan Hamstra Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10045959 by NormShield Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Nathan Hamstra)(Wolkoff, Eric)
September 20, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David M. Elihu Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10045958 by NormShield Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of David M. Elihu)(Wolkoff, Eric)
September 20, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrew Bramhall Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10045955 by NormShield Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Andrew Bramhall)(Wolkoff, Eric)
September 20, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kevin P.B. Johnson Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10045951 by NormShield Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Kevin P.B. Johnson)(Wolkoff, Eric)
September 20, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Wolkoff on behalf of NormShield Inc. (Wolkoff, Eric)
September 19, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Keegan on behalf of BitSight Technologies, Inc. (Keegan, Timothy)
September 19, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Naomi Birbach on behalf of BitSight Technologies, Inc. (Birbach, Naomi)
September 15, 2023 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Timothy Keegan. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Warnock, Douglas)
September 15, 2023 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Naomi Birbach. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Warnock, Douglas)
September 14, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Timothy Keegan Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10037309 by BitSight Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certification of Timothy Keegan)(Kline, Douglas)
September 14, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Naomi L. Birbach Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10037290 by BitSight Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certification of Naomi L. Birbach)(Kline, Douglas)
September 11, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed NormShield Inc. served on 9/7/2023, answer due 9/28/2023. (Carroll, Robert)
September 6, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to NormShield Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
September 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Cook, Savannah)
September 5, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Carroll on behalf of BitSight Technologies, Inc. (Carroll, Robert)
September 5, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J. Kline on behalf of BitSight Technologies, Inc. (Kline, Douglas)
September 5, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BitSight Technologies, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Moody's Overseas Holdings Inc. for BitSight Technologies, Inc... (Kline, Douglas)
September 5, 2023 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Kline, Douglas)
September 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NormShield Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-10023521 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by BitSight Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15)(Kline, Douglas) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/6/2023 - document replaced with corrected version from counsel) (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BitSight Technologies, Inc. v. NormShield Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BitSight Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J. Kline
Represented By: Robert D. Carroll
Represented By: Naomi Birbach
Represented By: Timothy Keegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NormShield Inc. doing business as Black Kite Inc.
Represented By: Nathaniel Andrew Hamstra
Represented By: Andrew J Bramhall
Represented By: David M Elihu
Represented By: Eric D. Wolkoff
Represented By: Kevin PB Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?