Skole et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Matthew Skole, Marc Chambers, David Diersen, Peter Adduci, Chris Meredith and Terry Abbate
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv12335
Filed: October 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2023 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
October 10, 2023 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:23-cv-04130.
October 4, 2023 Filing 15 TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court District of Massachusetts the electronic record. (daj, )
August 18, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant's unopposed motion to transfer venue #8 is granted. The Clerk's Office is directed to transfer this matter to the District of Massachusetts forthwith. No appearance necessary on 8/23/2023. Defendant's unopposed motion to stay proceedings #11 is stricken as moot. Status hearing set for 9/8/2023 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ym)
August 18, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Mark Howard Boyle for presentment of motion to stay #11 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/23/2023 at 10:00 AM. (Boyle, Mark)
August 18, 2023 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in support of motion to stay #11 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Mark H. Boyle, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Unpublished or WL Authorities)(Boyle, Mark)
August 18, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Ford Motor Company to stay Ford's Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings (Boyle, Mark)
August 18, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Mark Howard Boyle for presentment of motion to transfer case,, #8 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/23/2023 at 10:00 AM. (Boyle, Mark)
August 18, 2023 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Ford Motor Company in support of motion to transfer case,, #8 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue (Boyle, Mark)
August 18, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Ford Motor Company to transfer case Agreed Motion to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Mark H. Boyle, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - O'Connor Consolidated Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - McCabe Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Boggan Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Vangel Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - McCabe FAC, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Vangel FAC, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - August 4 & 8 Emails, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Fed Management Statistics, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Unpublished and WL Authorities)(Boyle, Mark)
August 18, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ford Motor Company by Mark Howard Boyle (Boyle, Mark)
July 3, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Terry Abbate, Peter Adduci, Marc Chambers, David Diersen, Chris Meredith, Matthew Skole by Mitchell M Breit (Breit, Mitchell)
June 30, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Terry Abbate, Matthew Skole, Peter Adduci, David Diersen, Marc Chambers, Chris Meredith. Ford Motor Company waiver sent on 6/27/2023, answer due 8/28/2023. (Belew, Leland)
June 28, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Terry Abbate, Peter Adduci, Marc Chambers, David Diersen, Chris Meredith, Matthew Skole by Leland Belew (Belew, Leland)
June 28, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Terry Abbate, Peter Adduci, Marc Chambers, David Diersen, Chris Meredith, Matthew Skole by Mark Richard Miller (Miller, Mark)
June 28, 2023 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing is set for 9/8/2023 at 10:45 AM as an in-person hearing. Plaintiff(s) is directed to advise the defendant(s) of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. If the parties agree to consent jurisdiction before the Magistrate Judge, all parties must sign the consent form and electronically file the signed form on the case docket. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym,)
June 28, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, )
June 28, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (exr, )
June 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Terry Abbate, Matthew Skole, Peter Adduci, David Diersen, Marc Chambers, Chris Meredith; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20778386. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skole et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Skole
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Represented By: Mark Richard Miller
Represented By: Mitchell Mark Breit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Chambers
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Represented By: Mark Richard Miller
Represented By: Mitchell Mark Breit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Diersen
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Represented By: Mark Richard Miller
Represented By: Mitchell Mark Breit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Adduci
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Represented By: Mark Richard Miller
Represented By: Mitchell Mark Breit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Meredith
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Represented By: Mark Richard Miller
Represented By: Mitchell Mark Breit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Abbate
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Represented By: Mark Richard Miller
Represented By: Mitchell Mark Breit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Mark Howard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?