Britton et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Randy A. Britton, Carolyn P. Britton, Pro Se Party Randy Britton and Pro Se Party Carolyn Britton
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation, PHH Mortgage Services Corporation, NewRez, LLC, New Residential Mortgage LLC and Korde & Associates, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2023cv12358
Filed: October 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2023 Filing 30 Opposition re #29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #14 MOTION to Dismiss , #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by New Residential Mortgage LLC, NewRez, LLC. (Guaetta, Peter)
December 8, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #14 MOTION to Dismiss , #12 MOTION to Dismiss by Carolyn Britton, Randy Britton.(Britton, Randy)
December 6, 2023 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by New Residential Mortgage LLC, NewRez, LLC. (Guaetta, Peter)
December 6, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE by New Residential Mortgage LLC, NewRez, LLC Supplement Regarding Removal Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Guaetta, Peter)
December 5, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter V. Guaetta on behalf of New Residential Mortgage LLC, NewRez, LLC (Guaetta, Peter)
December 5, 2023 Filing 25 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER allowing #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #12 MOTION to Dismiss, #14 MOTION to Dismiss, #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Responses due by December 8, 2023. The court does not anticipate granting further extensions of this deadline. (Kelly, Danielle)
December 1, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #14 MOTION to Dismiss , #12 MOTION to Dismiss by Carolyn Britton, Randy Britton.(Britton, Randy)
November 21, 2023 Filing 23 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Defendants' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline #19 . Defendants seek to file a consolidated response to Plaintiffs' First Motion to Remand #17 and Plaintiffs' anticipated Second Motion to Remand, see First Motion at 1 ("In the days that follow, we intend to file a Second Motion to Remand limited to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction"). Good cause shown, absent further court order, Defendants shall file a consolidated response to Plaintiffs' First Motion to Remand #17 and Plaintiffs' anticipated Second Motion to Remand no later than 14 days after the Second Motion to Remand is filed (or if it is filed on a weekend or holiday on the next business days following 14 days after such filing). (Kelly, Danielle)
November 21, 2023 Filing 22 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time #18 . Plaintiffs seek to file "a single response" to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #12 , #14 , and #20 . Good cause shown, Plaintiffs' Response to these motions shall be filed no later than December 1, 2023. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 17, 2023 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation, PHH Mortgage Services Corporation. (Lake, Hale)
November 17, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PHH Mortgage Corporation, PHH Mortgage Services Corporation.(Lake, Hale)
November 17, 2023 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 First MOTION to Remand to State Court limited to Procedural defect in violation of 28 U.S.C. s 1446(a) by Korde & Associates, P.C..(Calandrelli, Joseph)
November 16, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to December 1, 2023 to File Response/Reply [DE # 12] and [DE # 14] by Carolyn Britton, Randy Britton.(Britton, Randy)
November 13, 2023 Filing 17 First MOTION to Remand to State Court limited to Procedural defect in violation of 28 U.S.C. s 1446(a) by Carolyn Britton, Randy Britton.(Britton, Randy)
November 3, 2023 Filing 16 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Motion for an Extension of Time until 28 Days after the Court Decides the Brittons' Motion to Remand #15 . Plaintiffs state that they intend to file a motion to remand. But regardless of whether the motions to dismiss will be addressed here or in state court, they will need to be addressed. Accordingly, the court finds no cause for an extension of time to respond to the motions to dismiss.As a courtesy, the court extends the time for Plaintiffs to respond to the pending Motions to Dismiss [ #12 , #14 ] to November 16, 2023. (Kelly, Danielle)
November 2, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to All of the Defendants Motions to Dismiss until 28 days after the Court decides the Brittons' formal Motion to Remand by Carolyn Britton, Randy Britton.(Britton, Randy)
October 30, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Korde & Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Calandrelli, Joseph)
October 19, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by New Residential Mortgage LLC, NewRez, LLC. (Dungan, Robert)
October 19, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by New Residential Mortgage LLC, NewRez, LLC.(Dungan, Robert)
October 19, 2023 Filing 11 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Motion to Extend Deadline #10 . Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' complaint no later than November 17, 2023. (Kelly, Danielle)
October 18, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to November 17, 2023 to Respond to the Complaint by PHH Mortgage Corporation, PHH Mortgage Services Corporation.(Lake, Hale) Modified on 10/18/2023:corrected event type (Kelly, Danielle).
October 18, 2023 Filing 9 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER allowing #8 Motion for leave to electronically file Pro Se. Pro se litigants must have an individual PACER account to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at #https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro se e-filing account Instructions #https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-se.htm.If you already have a PACER account with E-Filing access as a pro se litigant, you do not need to register again. Please email tracy_mclaughlin@mad.uscourts.gov. (Kelly, Danielle)
October 17, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by Carolyn P. Britton, Randy A. Britton.(Kelly, Danielle)
October 16, 2023 Filing 7 STATE COURT Record. (Lake, Hale) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/16/2023 - removed blank pages from document) (Kelly, Danielle).
October 13, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Calandrelli on behalf of Korde & Associates, P.C. (Calandrelli, Joseph)
October 13, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David B Mack on behalf of Korde & Associates, P.C. (Mack, David)
October 13, 2023 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Kelly, Danielle)
October 13, 2023 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Cowan, Nicole)
October 12, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan E. Ryan on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation, PHH Mortgage Services Corporation (Ryan, Megan)
October 12, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PHH Mortgage Corporation, PHH Mortgage Services Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-10082076 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Lake, Hale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Britton et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy A. Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn P. Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro Se Party Randy Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro Se Party Carolyn Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Megan E. Ryan
Represented By: Hale Yazicioglu Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Services Corporation
Represented By: Megan E. Ryan
Represented By: Hale Yazicioglu Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez, LLC
Represented By: Robert Martin Dungan
Represented By: Peter V. Guaetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Residential Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Robert Martin Dungan
Represented By: Peter V. Guaetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korde & Associates, P.C.
Represented By: David B Mack
Represented By: Joseph P. Calandrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?