Hanover Insurance Company v. MARINE ACQUISITION CORP. et al
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Defendant: MARINE ACQUISITION CORP. doing business as Sea Star Solutions and EDGEWATER POWER BOATS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv12401
Filed: October 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Myong J Joun
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2023 Filing 22 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Bromley, John)
November 22, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE by MARINE ACQUISITION CORP. OF JOINT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IN RELATED CASE (Kim, Anne)
November 22, 2023 Filing 20 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Hanover Insurance Company. (Rice, Kyle)
November 22, 2023 Filing 19 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Rice, Kyle)
November 3, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by William Schmidt on behalf of Hanover Insurance Company (Schmidt, William)
October 30, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle B. Rice on behalf of Hanover Insurance Company (Rice, Kyle)
October 27, 2023 Filing 16 Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kyle B. Rice and granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added William J. Schmidt. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha)
October 27, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William J. Schmidt Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10106808 by Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation of William J. Schmidt, Esq.)(Keough, Timothy)
October 27, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kyle B. Rice Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10106761 by Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation of Kyle B. Rice, Esq.)(Keough, Timothy)
October 27, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Bromley on behalf of EDGEWATER POWER BOATS, LLC (Bromley, John)
October 27, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Muzyka on behalf of EDGEWATER POWER BOATS, LLC (Muzyka, Thomas)
October 27, 2023 Filing 11 Defendant Marine Acquisition Corp. DBA Sea Star Solution's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by MARINE ACQUISITION CORP..(Kim, Anne)
October 27, 2023 Filing 10 Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Defendant Marine Acquisition Corp. is to notify counsel for Defendant Edgewater Power Boats, LLC of this conference. (York, Steve)
October 27, 2023 Filing 9 Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER REGARDING MOTION PRACTICE.(York, Steve)
October 27, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. The Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 11/29/2023 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 20 (In person only) before Judge Myong J. Joun. (York, Steve)
October 27, 2023 Filing 7 Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to October 26, 2023 to File Response/Reply to Amended Complaint. (York, Steve)
October 26, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to Cross-Claim of Edgewater Power Boats, LLC) by MARINE ACQUISITION CORP..(Kim, Anne)
October 26, 2023 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 26, 2023 to File Response/Reply to Amended Complaint by MARINE ACQUISITION CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kim, Anne)
October 20, 2023 Filing 4 STATE COURT Record. (Kim, Anne)
October 18, 2023 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Phillips, Sophie)
October 17, 2023 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Myong J. Joun assigned to case. (Horvath, Courtney)
October 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MARINE ACQUISITION CORP. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-10088575 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A (State Court Documents), #4 Exhibit B (State Court Docket), #5 Exhibit C (State Court Notice of Filing Removal))(Kim, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanover Insurance Company v. MARINE ACQUISITION CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Keough
Represented By: Kyle B. Rice
Represented By: William Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINE ACQUISITION CORP. doing business as Sea Star Solutions
Represented By: Anne V. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDGEWATER POWER BOATS, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Muzyka
Represented By: John J. Bromley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?