Elizabeth Grady School of Esthetics and Massage Therapy et al v. Cardona
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Grady School of Esthetics and Massage Therapy, Elizabeth Grady Face First, Inc. and EGFF Holding Corp.
Defendant: Secretary Miguel Cardona
Case Number: 1:2023cv12461
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1156 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Filing 20 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction, [ECF No. #4 ], is DENIED.SO ORDERED.(McManus, Caetlin)
November 20, 2023 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Elizabeth Grady School of Esthetics and Massage Therapy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Nabulsi, Sammy)
November 20, 2023 Filing 18 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2023 re #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Elizabeth Grady School of Esthetics and Massage Therapy. Motion for leave to file #16 is granted. Oral arguments by the parties. Court takes matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Nabulsi, Doty, Fitzgerald, Farqhar) (Folan, Karen)
November 20, 2023 Filing 17 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
November 20, 2023 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Reply Brief by Elizabeth Grady School of Esthetics and Massage Therapy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nabulsi, Sammy)
November 17, 2023 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Miguel Cardona. (Fitzgerald, Michael)
November 16, 2023 Filing 14 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #13 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (McManus, Caetlin)
November 16, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Miguel Cardona.(Fitzgerald, Michael)
November 16, 2023 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing reset for 11/20/2023 01:00 PM in Courtroom 17 (In person only) before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. NOTICE IS FOR TIME CHANGE ONLY. (Folan, Karen)
November 13, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/transcripts.htm (McDonagh, Christina)
November 13, 2023 Filing 10 Transcript of Status Conference held on November 3, 2023, before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com. Redaction Request due 12/4/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2024. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 7, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Fitzgerald on behalf of Miguel Cardona (Fitzgerald, Michael)
November 3, 2023 Filing 8 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 11/3/2023, Set Hearing as to #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2023 12:00 PM in Courtroom 17 (In person only) before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Court Reporter: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: AUSA Farquar, Mangold, Doty) (Folan, Karen)
November 2, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Wilson Doty on behalf of Elizabeth Grady School of Esthetics and Massage Therapy (Doty, Meredith)
October 31, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 11/3/2023 09:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Plaintiffs' counsel is to notify defendant and their counsel of the hearing. (Folan, Karen)
October 27, 2023 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Elizabeth Grady School of Esthetics and Massage Therapy. (Nabulsi, Sammy)
October 27, 2023 Filing 4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Elizabeth Grady School of Esthetics and Massage Therapy.(Nabulsi, Sammy)
October 23, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Barbosa, Nilsa)
October 23, 2023 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Cook, Savannah)
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Miguel Cardona Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-10097203 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Elizabeth Grady School of Esthetics and Massage Therapy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Category Form Category Form)(Nabulsi, Sammy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elizabeth Grady School of Esthetics and Massage Therapy et al v. Cardona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Grady School of Esthetics and Massage Therapy
Represented By: Sammy S. Nabulsi
Represented By: Meredith Wilson Doty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Grady Face First, Inc.
Represented By: Sammy S. Nabulsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EGFF Holding Corp.
Represented By: Sammy S. Nabulsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Miguel Cardona
Represented By: Michael Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?