Strucke et al v. Midland Financial Co et al
Plaintiff: Darryl Strucke
Defendant: Midland Financial Co, Ipswitch Inc and Progress Software Corporation
Case Number: 1:2023cv12771
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason K. Fagelman on behalf of Midland Financial Co (Fagelman, Jason)
November 30, 2023 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC NOTICE: Remote access to todays hearing will be made available to the media and public for viewing purposes only. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact #media@mad.uscourts.gov.Status Conference set for 11/30/2023 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17 (In person only with remote viewing available) before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03083-ADB et al.(McManus, Caetlin)
November 15, 2023 Filing 22 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 1 (General Provisions) (McManus, Caetlin)
November 15, 2023 Filing 21 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion to Stay. (McManus, Caetlin)
November 15, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number 1 entered in MDL No. 3083, Western District of Oklahoma case number 5:23-cv-00782 has been transferred to the District of Massachusetts and assigned civil action number: 1:23-cv-12771. In Re: MOVEit Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL 3083 (Danieli, Chris)
November 15, 2023 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
November 15, 2023 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Western; Case Number 5:23-cv-00782.
November 2, 2023 Filing 17 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of District of Massachusetts for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (naa)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jason K. Fagelman. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/1/2023. (jee)
November 1, 2023 ***Staff notes re #16 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice mailed to Tyler J BeanFederman & Sherwood10205 N Pennsylvania AveOklahoma City, OK 73201 (jee)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Defendant Midland Financial Co.s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Answer or Response due 12/1/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/31/2023. (jee)
October 31, 2023 ***Staff notes re #15 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File mailed to Tyler J BeanFederman & Sherwood10205 N Pennsylvania AveOklahoma City, OK 73120 (jee)
October 30, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason Fagelman Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AOKWDC-4283299 by Midland Financial Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - JKF Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rother, Timila)
October 27, 2023 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Anthony J Hendricks on behalf of Midland Financial Co (Hendricks, Anthony)
October 27, 2023 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Timila S Rother on behalf of Midland Financial Co (Rother, Timila)
October 27, 2023 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition by Midland Financial Co. (Hoch, William)
October 27, 2023 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by William H Hoch, III on behalf of Midland Financial Co (Hoch, William)
October 25, 2023 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Ipswitch Inc, Progress Software Corporation . (Ottaway, Larry)
October 25, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Case Responsive Pleading Deadline by Ipswitch Inc, Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2-CTO-1)(Ottaway, Larry)
October 25, 2023 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Amy Sherry Fischer on behalf of Ipswitch Inc, Progress Software Corporation (Fischer, Amy)
October 25, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Larry D Ottaway on behalf of Ipswitch Inc, Progress Software Corporation (Ottaway, Larry)
October 10, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Summons served on Defendant Progress Software Corporation on October 5, 2023, filed by Plaintiff Darryl Strucke. (Bean, Tyler)
October 10, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Summons served on Defendant Ipswitch, Inc. on October 5, 2023, filed by Plaintiff Darryl Strucke. (Bean, Tyler)
October 10, 2023 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Summons served on Defendant Midland Financial Co. on October 6, 2023, filed by Plaintiff Darryl Strucke. (Bean, Tyler)
September 12, 2023 ***Staff notes Received in the Court Clerk's Office and scanned to K Drive > Case Administrators > MDL > 3083: Copies of MDL 3083 Notice of Related Actions, Schedule of Actions, Exhibit 1: Docket Sheet and Complaint for Strucke v. Midland Financial Co., et al., No. 5:23-cv-00782-D (USDC for WDOK), Exhibit 2: Docket Sheet and Complaint for Tucker v. Progress Software Corp., No. 2:23-cv-04980 (USDC for ED of Louisiana), and Proof of Service. Paper copies will be maintained at EKW's desk. (ekw)
September 8, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ipswitch Inc, Midland Financial Co, Progress Software Corporation. (ekw)
September 7, 2023 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4244981. (Bean, Tyler)
September 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ipswitch Inc, Midland Financial Co, Progress Software Corporation filed by Darryl Strucke(individually), Darryl Strucke(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ekw)
September 6, 2023 ***Staff notes Emailed apena@sirillp.com re: civil filing fee (ekw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strucke et al v. Midland Financial Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Strucke
Represented By: Tyler J Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Financial Co
Represented By: Anthony J Hendricks
Represented By: Timila S Rother
Represented By: William H Hoch, III
Represented By: Jason K. Fagelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ipswitch Inc
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Represented By: Larry D Ottaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progress Software Corporation
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Represented By: Larry D Ottaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?