Watts et al v. Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Diane Watts, Anthony Watts and Adam Pizzitola
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc. and Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv12845
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Filing 20 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Stephanie L. Denker Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10220979 by LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Mott, Bridgitte)
January 16, 2024 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James A. Morsch Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10220876 by LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Mott, Bridgitte)
December 19, 2023 Filing 18 Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered ALLOWED re #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,. ANSWER DUE BY 02/02/2024.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 18, 2023 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company. (Mott, Bridgitte)
December 18, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/02/2024 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company.(Mott, Bridgitte)
December 18, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridgitte E. Mott on behalf of LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company (Mott, Bridgitte)
December 14, 2023 Filing 14 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Yechiel Michael Twersky. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 14, 2023 Filing 13 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John G. Albanese. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 14, 2023 Filing 12 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Shanon J. Carson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 12, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Yechiel Michael Twersky Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10172859 by Adam Pizzitola, Anthony Watts, Diane Watts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Selesnick, Julie)
December 12, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John G. Albanese Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10172833 by Adam Pizzitola, Anthony Watts, Diane Watts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Selesnick, Julie)
December 12, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Shanon J. Carson Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10172813 by Adam Pizzitola, Anthony Watts, Diane Watts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Selesnick, Julie)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc. served on 11/28/2023, answer due 12/19/2023. (Selesnick, Julie)
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company served on 11/28/2023, answer due 12/19/2023. (Selesnick, Julie)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc. served on 11/28/2023, answer due 12/19/2023. (Selesnick, Julie)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. served on 11/28/2023, answer due 12/19/2023. (Selesnick, Julie)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dore, Samantha)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Horvath, Courtney)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, Compilation of Exhibits A-H by Adam Pizzitola, Anthony Watts, Diane Watts. (Selesnick, Julie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2023: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H) (Dore, Samantha). (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/22/2023) (Dore, Samantha).
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-10143803 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Adam Pizzitola, Anthony Watts, Diane Watts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Selesnick, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts et al v. Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Watts
Represented By: Julie S. Selesnick
Represented By: John G. Albanese
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: Yechiel Michael Twersky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Watts
Represented By: Julie S. Selesnick
Represented By: John G. Albanese
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: Yechiel Michael Twersky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Pizzitola
Represented By: Julie S. Selesnick
Represented By: John G. Albanese
Represented By: Shanon J. Carson
Represented By: Yechiel Michael Twersky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company
Represented By: Bridgitte E. Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.
Represented By: Bridgitte E. Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Bridgitte E. Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc.
Represented By: Bridgitte E. Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?