MURRAY v. EMS MANAGEMENT & CONSULTANTS, INC.
Plaintiff: JASMINE MURRAY
Defendant: EMS MANAGEMENT & CONSULTANTS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2023cv12863
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Filing 23 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The pending motion at ECF No. #7 is denied without prejudice and with leave to renew in accordance with any existing orders and/or future orders in 23-md-03082. (McManus, Caetlin)
December 6, 2023 Filing 22 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Pro Hac Vice motions at ECF Nos. #16 and #17 are DENIED. Counsel are referred to and must comply with MDL Order Nos. 2 and 6, [23-md-03083, ECF Nos. #12 and 263 ].(McManus, Caetlin)
December 6, 2023 Filing 21 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Claudia D. McCarron. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (McManus, Caetlin)
November 30, 2023 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC NOTICE: Remote access to todays hearing will be made available to the media and public for viewing purposes only. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact #media@mad.uscourts.gov.Status Conference set for 11/30/2023 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17 (In person only with remote viewing available) before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Associated Cases: 1:23-md-03083-ADB et al.(McManus, Caetlin)
November 29, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Claudia D. McCarron Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10151752 by EMS MANAGEMENT & CONSULTANTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Admission Pro Hac)(McCarron, Claudia)
November 29, 2023 Filing 18 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 1 (General Provisions) (McManus, Caetlin)
November 28, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Amanda N. Harvey Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10149755 by EMS MANAGEMENT & CONSULTANTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Harvey, Amanda)
November 28, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kayleigh J. Watson Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10149670 by EMS MANAGEMENT & CONSULTANTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Watson, Kayleigh)
November 27, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number 10 entered in MDL No. 3083, Middle District of South Carolina case number 1:23-cv-00860-TDS-JLW has been transferred to the District of Massachusetts and assigned civil action number: 1:23-cv-12863-ADB. In Re: MOVEit Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL 3083 (Belpedio, Lisa)
November 27, 2023 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. (Belpedio, Lisa)
November 27, 2023 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle; Case Number 1:23-cv-00860.
November 15, 2023 Filing 12 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual court and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order transferring this action to District of Massachusetts. (sh)
November 14, 2023 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-10) Re: MDL 3083 transferring this action to the District of Massachusetts for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2023. Received on 11/14/2023 and filed on 11/15/2023. (sh)
October 25, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney EDWARD CIOLKO on behalf of Plaintiff JASMINE MURRAY ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3682740.) (CIOLKO, EDWARD)
October 25, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JENNIFER SARAH CZEISLER on behalf of Plaintiff JASMINE MURRAY ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3682732.) (CZEISLER, JENNIFER)
October 18, 2023 Filing 8 BRIEF re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (HYLARIDES, DONAVAN)
October 18, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by EMS MANAGEMENT & CONSULTANTS, INC.. Response to Motion due by 11/8/2023 (HYLARIDES, DONAVAN)
October 18, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (HYLARIDES, DONAVAN)
October 11, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Jurisdiction) (Garland, Leah)
October 11, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to EMS MANAGEMENT & CONSULTANTS, INC. (State Court document filed in Forsyth Superior Court, case number 23CVS4223, issued 8/21/2023, filed as Exhibit B to #2 Notice of Removal) (Garland, Leah)
October 11, 2023 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against EMS MANAGEMENT & CONSULTANTS, INC., filed by JASMINE MURRAY. (State Court document originally filed in Forsyth Superior Court, case number 23CVS4223, filed as Exhibit A to #1 Petition for Removal) (Garland, Leah)
October 11, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Garland, Leah)
October 10, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL PURSUANT TO 28. U.S.C. 1441 AND 1453 re #1 Petition for Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Forsyth County Summons)(HYLARIDES, DONAVAN) Modified on 10/11/2023 to include complete title of document. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 10, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against EMS MANAGEMENT & CONSULTANTS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3669429.)(Related Case # 23-cv-738), filed by EMS MANAGEMENT & CONSULTANTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in Forsyth County)(HYLARIDES, DONAVAN)
October 10, 2023 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Lee, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURRAY v. EMS MANAGEMENT & CONSULTANTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASMINE MURRAY
Represented By: EDWARD CIOLKO
Represented By: JENNIFER SARAH CZEISLER
Represented By: JOEL ROBERT RHINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMS MANAGEMENT & CONSULTANTS, INC.
Represented By: DONAVAN J. HYLARIDES
Represented By: Amanda Nicole Harvey
Represented By: Claudia D. McCarron
Represented By: Kayleigh J. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?